Woie et al v. Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Ian Woie, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Daniel Boehling and Traffic Tech, Inc.
Defendant: Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00637
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Matheson, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., Ian Woie. (Molster, Charles)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Daniel DiMuro for Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/1/2022. (asho, )
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ronald Giller for Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/1/2022. (asho, )
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Matheson, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration), #2 Exhibit (Exs. A thru I to Decl.))(Matheson, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Transfer Case by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Matheson, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel DiMuro and Certification of Local Counsel Michael G. Matheson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8626707. by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Matheson, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Giller and Certification of Local Counsel Michael G. Matheson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8626700. by Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC. (Matheson, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gordon Matheson on behalf of Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC (Matheson, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: re #9 Affidavit of Service. Filing attorney notified of proper filing event for summons returned executed. Clerk set answer deadlines. (asho, )
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed served on Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC on October 3, 2022, answer due 10/24/2022 (Molster, Charles) Modified to correct docket text and set answer deadline on 10/11/2022 (asho, ).
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Lukas S. Boehning for Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., and Ian Woie. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/28/2022. (adun, )
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Pamela Abbate-Dattilo for Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., and Ian Woie. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/28/2022. (adun, )
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lukas S. Boehning and Certification of Local Counsel Charles B. Molster, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8587702. by Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., Ian Woie. (Molster, Charles)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Pamela Abbate-Dattilo and Certification of Local Counsel Charles B. Molster, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8587689. by Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., Ian Woie. (Molster, Charles)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (asho, )
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Daniel Boehling, Ryan Breeden, Donald Morrow, Traffic Tech, Inc., Ian Woie. (Molster, Charles)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Traffic Tech, Inc.. (Molster, Charles)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8586091.), filed by Ian Woie, Daniel Boehling, Donald Morrow, Ryan Breeden, Traffic Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Molster, Charles) (Main Document 1 replaced to include civil case number on 9/26/2022) (asho, ).
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: Filing user notified that the civil case number was omitted from the complaint and to include on all future filings. The clerk corrected the error and no further action is required. Filing user reminded to electronically file proposed summonses or waiver of service. (asho, )
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woie et al v. Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Woie
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Lukas S. Boehning
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Breeden
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Lukas S. Boehning
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Morrow
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Lukas S. Boehning
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Boehling
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Lukas S. Boehning
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traffic Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Lukas S. Boehning
Represented By: Pamela Abbate-Dattilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue-Grace Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Daniel DiMuro
Represented By: Ronald Giller
Represented By: Michael Gordon Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?