Fedynich v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fedynich
Defendant: Yvonne Farmer, Anton Shaw, Vonnie, Dee Smith, Betty Newbury, Margie Himes, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr., Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency, Virginia Housing Agency, Tammy Neale and Susan Dewey
Case Number: 3:2023cv00229
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Redpath on behalf of Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Tammy Neale, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Virginia Housing Agency (Redpath, Elizabeth)
May 25, 2023 Filing 14 Brief in Support to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency, Margie Himes, Betty Newbury. (Capps, Jeremy)
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. by Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency, Margie Himes, Betty Newbury. (Capps, Jeremy)
May 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick H Schutt on behalf of Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Tammy Neale, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Virginia Housing Agency (Schutt, Frederick)
May 18, 2023 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Virginia Housing Agency. (Siegmund, Heidi)
May 18, 2023 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Tammy Neale, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Virginia Housing Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siegmund, Heidi)
May 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Tammy Neale, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Virginia Housing Agency. (Siegmund, Heidi)
May 9, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Elizabeth Fedynich as to Dee Smith. (jenjones, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2023: #1 USM 285 Form) (jenjones, ).
May 9, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Fedynich as to Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023; Margie Himes served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023; and Betty Newbury served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023. (jenjones, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2023: #1 USM 285 Forms) (jenjones, ).
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Fedynich. Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr. served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (jenjones, )
April 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Fedynich Susan Dewey served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Yvonne Farmer served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Tammy Neale served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Anton Shaw served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Virginia Housing Agency served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023. (jenjones, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency, Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Margie Himes, Tammy Neale, Betty Newbury, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Dee Smith, and Virginia Housing Agency. Summonses for Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency and Virgina Housing Agency issued as directed per chambers. Placed in USM box for service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms)(jenjones, )
April 25, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency, Susan Dewey, Yvonne Farmer, Margie Himes, Tammy Neale, Betty Newbury, Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr, Anton Shaw, Dee Smith, and Virginia Housing Agency, filed by Elizabeth Fedynich.(jenjones, )
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Dismissing Claims Two, Four, Six and Eight, and Directing Service) - that the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 and DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to docket Plaintiffs Proposed Complaint, (ECF No. 1-1). For the reasons stated below, the Court hereby DISMISSES Claims Two, Four, Six and Eight for failure to state a claim. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(B). The Court will direct service on the remaining Defendants as to the remaining claims. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 4/25/23. Clerk placed summons in USM box for service and mailed a copy of Order to Plaintiff as directed. (jenjones, )
April 5, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Fedynich. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jenjones, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedynich v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Farmer
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Shaw
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonnie
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Newbury
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Himes
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godfrey T. Pinn, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Virginia Housing Coalition Agency
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Housing Agency
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Neale
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Dewey
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Frederick H Schutt
Represented By: Heidi Siegmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fedynich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?