Sroufe, Ed.D. v. Scripps Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.
Defendant: Scripps Media, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00548
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.. (Hawkins, Richard)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #13 is granted. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file, by October 25, 2023, his response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/17/2023. (Kat)
October 16, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Richard) Modified to edit text on 10/16/2023 (Kat).
October 5, 2023 Exhibit 4 received on a flash drive; placed in brown expandable on the Civil Filing Shelf re: #11 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Kat)
October 4, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Scripps Media, Inc..(Fogerty, Bethany)
October 4, 2023 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Scripps Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Fogerty, Bethany)
October 4, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Scripps Media, Inc.. (Fogerty, Bethany)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings #8 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by October 4, 2023. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 9/21/2023. (Kat)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Scripps Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fogerty, Bethany)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Scripps Media, Inc.. (Fogerty, Bethany)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Jean Fogerty on behalf of Scripps Media, Inc. (Fogerty, Bethany)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Alexander Spain on behalf of Scripps Media, Inc. (Spain, Brett)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William D. Sroufe, Ed.D. Scripps Media, Inc. served on 8/30/2023, answer due 9/20/2023 (Hawkins, Richard)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scripps Media, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Please electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Kat, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.. (Hawkins, Richard)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9099551.), filed by William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (September 12, 2022 Letter), #2 Exhibit B (October 5, 2022 Letter), #3 Exhibit C (Story with Orginial "Oust" Headling), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Richard)
August 29, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (Kat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sroufe, Ed.D. v. Scripps Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Sroufe, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard F. Hawkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps Media, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Jean Fogerty
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?