Jureidini et al v. Morrison
Plaintiff: John A. Jureidini and The Rug Life, LLC
Defendant: John Morrison
Case Number: 3:2023cv00647
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss without Prejudice to Plaintiffs' Rule 41 Motion for Dismissal of the Amended Complaint without Prejudice filed by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 29, 2023 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss without Prejudice filed by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
November 29, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss without Prejudice by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
November 29, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE that His Motions to Dismiss #17 , #21 and Motion for Relief under Virginia Code 8.01-271.1 #27 are Unopposed by John Morrison (Putbrese, Cortland) Modified to edit docket text to reflect full title of document on 11/30/2023 (Kat).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER It is ORDERED that the 21-day safe harbor period shall begin on November 15, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/15/2023. (Kat)
November 14, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions, #2 Exhibit B - Text Messages, #3 Exhibit C - Terms and Conditions on Rug Life's website, #4 Exhibit D - Email)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION for Relief under Virginia Code 8.01-271.1 filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Relief under Virginia Code 8.01-271.1 by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 26 Declaration re #23 MOTION for Sanctions of Ralph Jenkins in Support of Defendant's Rule 11 Motion and Exhibits 1-2 by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 25 Declaration re #23 MOTION for Sanctions of John Morrison, M.D. in Support of His Rule 11 Motion and Exhibit 1 by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Sanctions by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 20 Declaration re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Ralph Jenkins in Support of Defendant's Rule 12(B)(2) Motion and Exhibits 1-2 by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of John Morrison, M.D. in Support of His Rule 12(B)(2) Motion and Exhibit 1 by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION Requesting Guidance Regarding the Court's November 6, 2023 Order's Effect on the Rule 11 Timeline re #15 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and (6) And For Relief Under Virginia Code 8.01-271.1 #2 , #5 , and #7 , is denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Amended Complaint by November 14, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/3/2023. (Kat)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (McLaughlin, Henry)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Morrison, filed by John A. Jureidini, The Rug Life, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Terms and Conditions)(McLaughlin, Henry)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 Declaration re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of John Morrison by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 Declaration re #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees of John Morrison by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under Virginia Code 8.01-271.1 filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Fees by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 Declaration re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of John Morrison by John Morrison. (Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Putbrese, Cortland)
October 11, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (Kat)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9163775.), filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Putbrese, Cortland) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/11/2023 to separate exhibits; #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Kat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jureidini et al v. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Jureidini
Represented By: Henry W. McLaughlin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rug Life, LLC
Represented By: Henry W. McLaughlin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morrison
Represented By: Cortland Christopher Putbrese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?