Khattab et al v. Janowski et al
Plaintiff: Sara Khattab and Kaiya Crump
Defendant: Mark T. Janowski, Christopher J. Brown, City of Richmond, VA, Mark Janowski, Christopher Brown and The City of Richmond
Case Number: 3:2023cv00737
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The City of Richmond. (Brown, John)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before District Judge Roderick C. Young. See Order for further details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 12/18/23. (juljon)
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kaiya Crump, Sara Khattab. (Criner, Justin)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Christopher Brown's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Christopher Brown.(Fisher, Maurice)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Mark Janowski's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mark Janowski.(Fisher, Maurice)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr on behalf of Christopher Brown, Mark Janowski (Fisher, Maurice)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The City of Richmond. (Brown, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The City of Richmond. (Brown, John)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christopher Brown, Mark Janowski, The City of Richmond, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Please electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Kat, )
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kaiya Crump, Sara Khattab. (Criner, Justin)
November 3, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (adun, )
November 3, 2023 Notice of Correction re #1 : Civil action number should be on all pleadings prior to filing. Clerk has corrected the document. Filing attorney also reminded to file proposed summons. (adun, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9201789.), filed by Sara Khattab, Kaiya Crump. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Criner, Justin) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/3/2023) (adun, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khattab et al v. Janowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Khattab
Represented By: Justin Criner
Represented By: Daniel Vall-llobera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiya Crump
Represented By: Justin Criner
Represented By: Daniel Vall-llobera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Janowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond, VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Janowski
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Brown
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Richmond
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?