Hayes v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rose Hayes
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00787
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9275738. by Stephanie Rose Hayes. (Floyd, Lee)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Adair Floyd on behalf of Stephanie Rose Hayes (Floyd, Lee)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Christopher Scott McRae to appear Pro hac vice for Sanofi US Services, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/13/2023. (Kat)
December 6, 2023 (MOOT due to resolution of the technical difficulty that occurred when payment of fee was processed. Fee received on 12/5/2023. See #12 for receipt information.) Notice of Correction re #12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice - Filing party is directed to pay the $75 fee to appear Pro Hac Vice. This can be done by using the event, "Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice". Civil Event--> Other Filings --> Other Documents --> Electonic Fee Payment. (Kat) Modified to update text regarding fee payment on 12/11/2023 (Kat).
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Olivia Houston Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9249798. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Houston, Olivia)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Houston, Olivia)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12383. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 22, 2023 Notification of transfer of civil case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 2:19cv12383 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (ss) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (ss) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7832480) filed by Stephanie Rose Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC)Attorney Jerry E. Martin added to party Stephanie Rose Hayes(pty:pla).(Martin, Jerry) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (ss). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rose Hayes
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Seth Marcus Hyatt
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?