Bates v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Alice M. Bates
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC and Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Rushmore Loan Management or Rushmore and as a successor in interest to Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00060
Filed: January 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2024 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Cournoyer, Kelly)
March 5, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC.(Cournoyer, Kelly)
March 5, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cournoyer, Kelly)
March 5, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Cournoyer, Kelly)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time) that the Motion for Extension of Time #9 , is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including March 5, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/28/2024. (jenjones, )
February 27, 2024 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Cournoyer, Kelly)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cournoyer, Kelly)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE Return of Service from State Court Summons for Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC by Alice M. Bates. (Pittman, Dale) Modified docket text on 2/5/2024 (jenjones, ).
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE Return of Service from State Court Summons for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC by Alice M. Bates. (Pittman, Dale) Modified docket text on 2/5/2024 (jenjones, ).
February 2, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hodge, Jason)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Phillip Rease Robinson to appear Pro hac vice for Alice M. Bates. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/1/2024. (jenjones, )
January 30, 2024 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Phillip Robinson and Certification of Local Counsel Dale W. Pittman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9335397. by Alice M. Bates. (Pittman, Dale)
January 26, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jenjones, )
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hodge, Jason)
January 26, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hodge, Jason)
January 26, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9329793.), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodge, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/29/2024 to include civil action number.) (jenjones, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M. Bates
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Phillip Rease Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jason Ryan Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Kelly Anne Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Rushmore Loan Management or Rushmore and as a successor in interest to Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Kelly Anne Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?