McCray v. Ardelle Associates Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Sheryl McCray
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2014cv00158
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Newport News Office
County: Hampton City
Presiding Judge: Robert G. Doumar
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 48 and 54 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 5/25/2018. (jrin)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION AND ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denying 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 9/15/17. Copies distributed to all parties 9/15/17. (ldab, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTED the Notice of Demurrer and Plea in Bar, CONVERTED Ardelle's Demurrer and Plea in Bar into a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), GRANTED the Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, and DISMISSED all of Plaintiffs claims against Ardelle.. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 6/23/15. Copies distributed to all parties 6/23/15. (ldab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Ardelle Associates Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?