PHC Industrial, LLC v. Monahan et al

Plaintiff: PHC Industrial, LLC
Defendant: Richard P. Monahan, Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc. and Kristin Monahan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00019
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Robert J Krask
1 Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (dcou, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc..(Rohani-Shukla, Darius)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File: Defendant Coast to Coast is DIRECTED to file the answer, which is attached to the motion for leave, ECF No. 15-1, by April 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 4/10/2019. (dcou, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Rohani-Shukla, Darius)
March 20, 2019 Notice of Correction re 12 Answer to Complaint: Unfortunately, when you filed document 12 you needed leave of court to file the document regarding the Defendant, Coast to Coast Consulting and Contracting, Inc., The proposed document should have been an attachment to a motion for leave to file. Please file a motion with the proposed document as an attachment to the motion. (dcou, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Bertini on behalf of Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc., Kristin Monahan, Richard P. Monahan (Bertini, Lisa)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc., Kristin Monahan, Richard P. Monahan. (Rohani-Shukla, Darius)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc., Kristin Monahan, Richard P. Monahan.(Rohani-Shukla, Darius)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHC Industrial, LLC: Richard P. Monahan and Kristin Monahan served on 2/15/2019. (dcou, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHC Industrial, LLC Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc. served on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dcou, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Harold Arthur Bolick as to PHC Industrial, LLC. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 3/5/19. (tlev, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Dena Beth Langley as to PHC Industrial, LLC. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 03/5/19. (tlev, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by H. Arthur Bolick, II and Certification of Local Counsel John S. Buford Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6521497. by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application)(Buford, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Beth Langley and Certification of Local Counsel John S. Buford Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6521477. by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application)(Buford, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc., Kristin Monahan, Richard P. Monahan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
February 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc. by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Buford, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Kristin Monahan by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Buford, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Richard P. Monahan by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Buford, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Buford, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6496495.), filed by PHC Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buford, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHC Industrial, LLC v. Monahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P. Monahan
Represented By: Lisa Ann Bertini
Represented By: Darius Rohani-Shukla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast to Coast Consulting & Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Ann Bertini
Represented By: Darius Rohani-Shukla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Monahan
Represented By: Lisa Ann Bertini
Represented By: Darius Rohani-Shukla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHC Industrial, LLC
Represented By: John Stanfield Buford
Represented By: Dena Beth Langley
Represented By: Harold Arthur Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?