Thorson v. The City of Hampton, Virginia

Plaintiff: Michael E. Thorson
Defendant: The City of Hampton, Virginia
Case Number: 4:2019cv00066
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The City of Hampton, Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin)
July 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Michael E. Thorson. (Gaynor, Todd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:19cv840. (afar)
June 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against The City of Hampton, Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6705651.), filed by Michael E. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaynor, Todd) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorson v. The City of Hampton, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Thorson
Represented By: Todd Michael Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Hampton, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?