Gilstrap v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Plaintiff: Jerry S. Gilstrap, Aaron Todd Gilstrap, James Scott Gilstrap, Erik Gilstrap, Dawn Gilstrap and Christopher Gilstrap
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and John Does 1-450 (Inclusive)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00068
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Response to Defendant Huntington Ingalls Incorporateds Motion to Dismiss filed by Erik Gilstrap. (George, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Erik Gilstrap re #12 Amended Complaint, Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Counts I through III (George, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McGraw, Wendy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Erik Gilstrap, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jerry S. Gilstrap, Deceased; Christopher Gilstrap; James Scott Gilstrap; Dawn Gilstrap; Aaron Todd Gilstrap.(George, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (clou).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jerry S. Gilstrap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel to Defense Counsel)(George, Jonathan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gibbs Henderson as certified by local counsel Jonathan George for Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/17/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gibbs Henderson and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan George Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6741565. Application to Qualify as a Foreign Attorney by Jerry S. Gilstrap. (George, Jonathan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Marie Steffan on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Steffan, Taylor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGraw, Wendy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Merideth Bryant Snow Daly on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Daly, Merideth)
July 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (afar)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Cohen McGraw on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (McGraw, Wendy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Cunningham, Alexandra)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal (Cunningham, Alexandra)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6717661.), filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilstrap v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Alexandra Brisky Cunningham
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Represented By: Taylor Marie Steffan
Represented By: Merideth Bryant Snow Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-450 (Inclusive)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry S. Gilstrap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Todd Gilstrap
Represented By: Gibbs Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scott Gilstrap
Represented By: Gibbs Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Gilstrap
Represented By: Gibbs Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Gilstrap
Represented By: Gibbs Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gilstrap
Represented By: Gibbs Henderson
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?