Champ v. Kinsale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela M Champ
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00099
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Bowles, George)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleadings and Kinsale shall have through and including 12/18/19 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/4/19. (afar)
December 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Miller. #10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (afar)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Bowles, George)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Kinsale's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File responsive pleadings and Kinsale shall have through and including 12/4/2019 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/19/19. (afar)
November 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (clou )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bowles, George)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Pamela M Champ as to Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(bboy, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pamela M Champ. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(dcou, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Pamela M Champ. (Haddad, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Kinsale Insurance Company (Peck and Kehoe). NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Pamela M Champ. (Haddad, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Pamela M Champ. (Haddad, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6889404.), filed by Pamela M Champ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Haddad, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champ v. Kinsale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M Champ
Represented By: Robert John Haddad
Represented By: Andrew Mitchell Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By: George H. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?