David D. Denton v. JPMorgan Chase & CO. et al
Plaintiff: David D. Denton
Defendant: Langley Federal Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & CO., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Chase Bank USA, N.A. and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00114
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
2 Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brendan Cosgrove Ballou-Kelley and Certification of Local Counsel David M. Gettings Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7014363. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gettings, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Gettings on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gettings, David)
December 19, 2019 Filing 39 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Montgomery, John)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Langley Federal Credit Union's answer is due by 1/10/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/17/19. (bpet, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File. Equifax's answer shall be refiled by the Defendant within 5 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/17/19. Entered as modified by the Court. (bpet, )
December 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (bpet, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Langley Federal Credit Union. (Kelly, Lindsey)
December 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement: The filing user has been notified that document 32 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (bpet, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum in Support re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Langley Federal Credit Union. (Kelly, Lindsey)
December 16, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Langley Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Lindsey)
December 16, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Langley Federal Credit Union. (Kelly, Lindsey)
December 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer To Complaint Out of Time. (bpet, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer To Complaint Out of Time filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's Answer and Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint)(Montgomery, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC Answer To Complaint Out of Time by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting the Consent Motion For Leave For Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC to Respond to Complaint Out of Time)(Montgomery, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel for Answer Status. (bpet, )
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall file its response to the Complaint by 1/13/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/12/19. (bpet, )
December 11, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (bpet, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Anthony, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 23 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by TransUnion LLC. (Wright, Gibson)
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by TransUnion LLC.(Wright, Gibson)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Chase defendants to file a response to the #1 Complaint by 1/10/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/9/19. (bpet, )
December 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for the Chase Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (bpet, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for the Chase Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for the Chase Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Smith, Colleen)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & CO.. (Smith, Colleen)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Rosannah Smith on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & CO. (Smith, Colleen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton Langley Federal Credit Union served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton Chase Bank USA, N.A. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton JPMorgan Chase & CO. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis. District Judge Robert G. Doumar no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David D. Denton TransUnion LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019 (Rotkis, Susan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (bpet, )
November 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Robert G. Doumar. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (clou )
November 15, 2019 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:19cv1432. (afar)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/15/2019. (choy, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by David D. Denton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotkis, Susan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & CO., Langley Federal Credit Union, TransUnion LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
November 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for TransUnion LLC by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Equifax Information Services, LLC by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Langley Federal Credit Union by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Chase Bank USA, N.A. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for JPMorgan Chase & CO. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6932035.), filed by David D. Denton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotkis, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David D. Denton v. JPMorgan Chase & CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Lindsey Corliss Neef Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Gettings
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & CO.
Represented By: Colleen Rosannah Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Colleen Rosannah Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D. Denton
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?