The Premier Companies, Inc. et al v. J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc. and The Premier Companies, Inc.
Defendant: J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc., Katherine E Forker, Harold J Forker and Shane Duchaine
Case Number: 4:2020cv00065
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc.. (Sparks, Randy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc. by Shane Duchaine, Harold J Forker, J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc., Katherine E Forker.(Sparks, Randy)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shane Duchaine, Harold J Forker, Katherine E Forker, J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc., filed by The Premier Companies, Inc., Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 1-C, #4 Exhibit 1-D, #5 Exhibit 1-E, #6 Exhibit 1-F, #7 Exhibit 2-A, #8 Exhibit 2-B, #9 Exhibit 2-C, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit 15)(Reed, Benjamin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Kerk Reyes on behalf of Shane Duchaine, Harold J Forker, Katherine E Forker, J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. (Reyes, Sharon)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and a Response to the Amended Complaint. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 6/9/2020. (clou )
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and a Response to the Amended Complaint by Shane Duchaine, Harold J Forker, Katherine E Forker, J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Randy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Premier Companies, Inc., Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc. Shane Duchaine served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020; Harold J Forker served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020; Katherine E Forker served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020; J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 (Reed, Benjamin)
June 1, 2020 Clerk's NOTICE : Responsive pleadings have not been filed by the defendants. Plaintiffs' counsel is requested to file a status report electronically within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. Reasonable extensions of time to answer the complaint will be granted, but the party seeking an extension must obtain court approval. If an extension is requested, counsel should submit an endorsed order. If a party is in default, counsel should electronically file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (clou)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Shane Duchaine, Harold J Forker, Katherine E Forker, J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Shane Duchaine by Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc., The Premier Companies, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Katherine E. Forker by Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc., The Premier Companies, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Harold J. Forker by Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc., The Premier Companies, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. by Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc., The Premier Companies, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc., The Premier Companies, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7192419.), filed by The Premier Companies, Inc., Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 2-A, #9 Exhibit 2-B, #10 Exhibit 2-C, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12)(Reed, Benjamin)
May 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Premier Companies, Inc. et al v. J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & K Rentals of Bridgman, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Kerk Reyes
Represented By: Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine E Forker
Represented By: Sharon Kerk Reyes
Represented By: Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold J Forker
Represented By: Sharon Kerk Reyes
Represented By: Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Duchaine
Represented By: Sharon Kerk Reyes
Represented By: Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Rental-Purchase, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Boyce Reed
Represented By: James C. Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Premier Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Boyce Reed
Represented By: James C. Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?