Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
Plaintiff: Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Superstore # 3265, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart US and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2020cv00119
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 9/15/2020. (ptom, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Brief in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc., Walmart Superstore # 3265, Walmart US. (Wright, Gibson)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION to Strike #9 Brief in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased. (Wilson, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #9 Brief in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased. (Wilson, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Brief in Support to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc., Walmart Superstore # 3265, Walmart US. (Beck, Donald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc., Walmart Superstore # 3265, Walmart US. (Beck, Donald)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk Remote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask & filed on 8/10/20. (ptom, )
August 3, 2020 Refer for 16(b) (mrees, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc., Walmart Superstore # 3265, Walmart US.(mrees, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
July 24, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Walmart Inc.. (Wright, Gibson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Gibson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Wright, Gibson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7318339.), filed by Walmart Superstore # 3265, Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart US. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Wright, Gibson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Superstore # 3265
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart US
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dellajean Murlene McCray, Administrator of the Estate of Jean Lanette Bryant, Deceased
Represented By: John Stephen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?