Riley et al v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allan J Riley and Amy Riley
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance also known as Liberty Mutual Group also known as Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc, Liberty Mutual Group, Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc and Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00113
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Ruling Based upon the Briefs Alone (Without Oral Argument) is Desired (Stephens, Edwin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 22, 2021 Filing 21 Request for Hearing by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Stephens, Edwin)
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, C.)
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 Reply to #13 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Brown, C.)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Add Party or in the Alternative to Find that Liberty Insurance Corporation has been Properly Added in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 Brief in Support to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Stephens, Edwin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Brown, C.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Add Party or in the Alternative to Find that Liberty Insurance Corporation has been Properly Added in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Brown, C.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Add Party or in the Alternative to Find that Liberty Insurance Corporation has been Properly Added in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Brown, C.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., filed by Amy Riley, Allan J Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Amended Complaint (Redlined))(Brown, C.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, C.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Allan J Riley, Amy Riley. (Brown, C.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc..(Stephens, Edwin)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Brief in Support to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7985203.), filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Demurrers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Edwin)
September 8, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley et al v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. doing business as Liberty Mutual Insurance also known as Liberty Mutual Group also known as Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan J Riley
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Brown
Represented By: Erik Broch Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Riley
Represented By: C. Thomas Brown
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Brown
Represented By: Erik Broch Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?