Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Maritime Administration et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Maritime Administration, Pete Buttigieg and Lucinda Lessley
Case Number: 4:2021cv00132
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Maggie Baker Smith as to Pete Buttigieg, Lucinda Lessley and United States Maritime Administration. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 12/9/21. (tlev, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Maggie Baker Smith and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb by Pete Buttigieg, Lucinda Lessley, United States Maritime Administration. (Hartlieb, Garry)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 Certificate Reporting Service by Lucinda Lessley, Pete Buttigieg, United States Maritime Administration. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hartlieb, Garry)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Connor, Hannah)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jared Michael Margolis as to Center for Biological Diversity. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 10/15/21. (tlev, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Michael Margolis and Certification of Local Counsel Hannah Connor by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 13, 2021 Notice of Correction re #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Michael Margolis and Certification of Local Counsel Hannah Connor Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8041791. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. The party represented by the applicant should be listed on the motion. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant and the party represented. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Five (5) Summonses Issued as to Pete Buttigieg, Lucinda Lessley, United States Maritime Administration, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Civil Cover Sheet by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Michael Margolis and Certification of Local Counsel Hannah Connor Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8041791. by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons US Attorney, EDVA by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons USAG by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons U.S. Maritime Admin. by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Lucinda Lessley by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Pete Buttigieg by Center for Biological Diversity. (Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8041631.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Hannah)
October 12, 2021 Notice of Correction re [1-1 ] Civil Cover Sheet. Document number [1-1 ] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. (epri, )
October 12, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Maritime Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Hannah Mary Margaret Connor
Represented By: Jared Michael Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Maritime Administration
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda Lessley
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Represented By: Maggie Baker Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?