Lewis, et al. v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Tommy Lewis and Janet S. Lewis
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., A.W. Chesterton Company, Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, QUAIL INDUSTRIES, INC., Redco Corporation, Schutte & Koerting, Inc., Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, WARREN PUMPS LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Northrop Gruman Shipbuilding, Inc., Newport News Shipbuilding And Dry Dock Company, ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom, Inc., successor by merger with CBS Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Beard Industries, Inc., Riley-Beard, Inc., Crane Co., Tate Andale, Inc., Tate Temco, Inc. and Temco Machine Works, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00076
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 63 Request for Hearing by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Paramount Global, Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #23 Memorandum in Support, #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) Rule 7(E) Notice and Request for Hearing (Reeves, Eric)
August 30, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Paramount Global (Mullins, Maurice)
August 25, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry N. Ware, Jr on behalf of Paramount Global (Ware, Henry)
August 24, 2022 Filing 60 Reply to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
August 22, 2022 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Paramount Global, Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC. (Reeves, Eric)
August 19, 2022 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report in Response to Clerk's Notice ECF 44 by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Harty, William)
August 18, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Harty, William)
August 16, 2022 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) filed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Harty, William)
August 15, 2022 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (bpet, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. The Answer filed as Exhibit 2 to Defendant's motion is FILED as of this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/15/22. (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 53 Brief in Support to #52 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Ries, Kenneth) Modified docket text on 8/12/2022 (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Ries, Kenneth) Modified docket text on 8/12/2022 (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 Notice of Correction re #50 Answer to Complaint: The time for Metropolitan Life to file an answer to the complaint has expired. The filing user is directed to file a motion for leave to file their answer out of time, with a brief in support filed separately and linked back to the motion. A proposed order should be included as an attachment, as well as the answer proposed to be filed. (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 Notice of Correction re #51 Answer to Complaint: This document was filed using the "Answer" filing event rather than the "Financial Disclosure Statement" filing event. The Clerk's Office will correct same, and no further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 Notice of Correction re #52 Answer to Complaint, #53 Answer to Complaint: The filing user has once again used the "Answer" filing event to file documents which are not in fact Answers. The Clerk's Office will correct the entries on the docket to reflect that they are in fact a motion for leave and the corresponding brief in support. The filer is directed to please consult the ED/VA eFiling Policies and Procedures Manual for guidance on filing in CM/ECF. (bpet, )
August 12, 2022 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard: #52 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time (bpet, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 51 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ries, Kenneth) Modified text on 8/12/2022 (bpet, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 50 Metropolitan Life Insurance ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Ries, Kenneth)
August 5, 2022 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis Tate Andale, LLC served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
August 5, 2022 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis FMC Corporation served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
August 5, 2022 Filing 47 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff's Notice of Suggestion of Death of Tommy Lewis by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Jewell, Erin)
August 5, 2022 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Kraus, Peter)
August 5, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Merideth Snow Daly on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Daly, Merideth)
August 5, 2022 Filing 44 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel: Status report or request for entry of default to be filed by Plaintiffs within 15 days. (bpet, )
August 5, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra B. Cunningham on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Cunningham, Alexandra)
August 4, 2022 Filing 42 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
August 4, 2022 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
August 4, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (McGraw, Wendy)
August 4, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Cohen McGraw on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (McGraw, Wendy)
August 3, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brunick on behalf of WARREN PUMPS LLC (Brunick, Timothy)
August 3, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brunick on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Brunick, Timothy)
August 3, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Bugg Turner on behalf of PARAMOUNT GLOBAL (Turner, Patricia)
August 3, 2022 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation. (Scotti, Brian)
August 3, 2022 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL. (Turner, Patricia)
August 3, 2022 Notice of Correction re #32 Financial Disclosure Statement, #30 Financial Disclosure Statement: The filing user neglected to associate themselves as counsel for the parties when they made these filings. The Clerk's Office will correct same, and no further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
August 3, 2022 Notice of Correction re #33 Financial Disclosure Statement: The filing user neglected to associate themself as counsel for the party when they made this filing. The Clerk's Office will correct same, and no further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
August 3, 2022 Notice of Correction re #35 Corporate Disclosure Statement: The filing user neglected to associate themself as counsel for the party when they made this filing. The Clerk's Office will correct same, and no further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
August 3, 2022 Notice of Correction re #28 Financial Disclosure Statement, #29 Financial Disclosure Statement: The filing user neglected to associate themselves as counsel for the parties when they made these filings. The Clerk's Office will correct same, and no further action is required at this time. (bpet, )
August 2, 2022 Filing 33 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tate Andale, LLC. (Bean, Gregory)
August 2, 2022 Filing 32 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Brunick, Timothy)
August 2, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Devins Joss on behalf of General Electric Company (Joss, Matthew)
August 2, 2022 Filing 30 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (Brunick, Timothy)
August 2, 2022 Filing 29 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FMC Corporation. (Cook, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Filing 28 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cummins Inc.. (Cook, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Filing 27 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by General Electric Company. (Joss, Matthew)
August 2, 2022 Filing 26 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2022 Filing 24 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by John Crane, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Paramount Global, Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, and Warren Pumps LLC. (Reeves, Eric) Modified text on 8/4/2022 (bpet, )
August 2, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Paramount Global, Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, and Warren Pumps LLC. (Reeves, Eric) Modified text on 8/4/2022 (bpet, )
August 2, 2022 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Redco Corporation. (Wiemken, Christopher)
August 2, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Redco Corporation.(Wiemken, Christopher)
July 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc. without prejudice by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis (Kraus, Peter)
July 27, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis Velan Valve Corporation served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis QUAIL INDUSTRIES, INC. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis PARAMOUNT GLOBAL served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis Schutte & Koerting, Inc. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis Redco Corporation served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 20, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis Cummins Inc. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis John Crane, Inc. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis IMO Industries, Inc. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis General Electric Company served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis WARREN PUMPS LLC served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022 (Kraus, Peter)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Kraus on behalf of Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis (Kraus, Peter)
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A.W. Chesterton Company, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, QUAIL INDUSTRIES, INC., Redco Corporation, Schutte & Koerting, Inc., Tate Andale, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, WARREN PUMPS LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar)
July 8, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen. (afar)
July 8, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Proposed Summonses for all Defendants by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Jewell, Erin)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8466020.), filed by Janet S. Lewis, Tommy Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Jewell, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis, et al. v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Lewis
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S. Lewis
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Eric David Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Eric David Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Matthew Devins Joss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Alexandra B. Cunningham
Represented By: Merideth Snow Daly
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth John Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUAIL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Christopher John Wiemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS LLC
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Gruman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra B. Cunningham
Represented By: Merideth Snow Daly
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport News Shipbuilding And Dry Dock Company
Represented By: Alexandra B. Cunningham
Represented By: Merideth Snow Daly
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc., successor by merger with CBS Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley-Beard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Christopher John Wiemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Temco, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temco Machine Works, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?