Fox v. DCO LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Eldon Fox, Jr.
Defendant: DCO LLC, Eaton Corporation, Henkel Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Eaton Aeroquip Corp, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Dexter Hysol Aerospace, Inc., Hexcel Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation Individually and as Successor by Merger to UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION doing business as Pratt & Whitney Co., Inc. doing business as UTC Aerospace Systems, Shell Oil Company, The Boeing Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Waco, Inc. and Wyeth Holdings Corporation
Case Number: 4:2022cv00120
Filed: November 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 46 Rule 26 Disclosure by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Greene, Kevin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 45 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kari Halbrook and Certification of Local Counsel Dennis Chong Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8752967. by Henkel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Chong, Dennis)
January 3, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE by Henkel Corporation DEFENDANT DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE, LLC, INCORRECTLY PLED AS HENKEL CORPORATIONS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Chong, Dennis)
January 3, 2023 Filing 43 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Waco, Inc.. (Voyles, Shawn)
January 3, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Ashley Voyles on behalf of Waco, Inc. (Voyles, Shawn)
December 30, 2022 Filing 41 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Turner, Alexander)
December 22, 2022 Filing 40 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Union Carbide Corporation. (Smoot, Benjamin)
December 22, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Smoot, II on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Smoot, Benjamin)
December 22, 2022 Refer for 16(b) (afar)
December 20, 2022 Filing 38 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Henkel Corporation. (Chong, Dennis)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Quigg as certified by local counsel R. Thomas Radcliffe for Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/16/2022. (Allen, Arenda)
December 16, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Ellen Simonsen on behalf of Henkel Corporation (Simonsen, Jan)
December 16, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Hexcel Corporation under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Charles Eldon Fox, Jr (Harty, William)
December 14, 2022 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Henkel Corporation.(Chong, Dennis)
December 14, 2022 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Charles Eldon Fox, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harty, William)
December 9, 2022 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Quigg and Certification of Local Counsel R. Thomas Radcliffe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8702723. by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Form)(Radcliffe, Richard)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie U. Eaton as certified by local counsel Alexander L. Turner for Defendant Wyeth Holdings LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/07/2022. (Allen, Arenda)
December 6, 2022 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie U. Eaton and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander L. Turner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8696796. by Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Application to Qualify as a Foreign Attorney Under Local Civil Rule 83.1(D) and Local Criminal Rule 57.4)(Turner, Alexander)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #16 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan P. Phillips as certified by local counsel William W.C. Harty for Plaintiff Charles Eldon Fox, Jr. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/05/2022. (Allen, Arenda)
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Radcliffe, Richard)
December 1, 2022 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCO LLC. (Radcliffe, Richard)
December 1, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Thomas Radcliffe, Jr on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Radcliffe, Richard)
December 1, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Thomas Radcliffe, Jr on behalf of DCO LLC (Radcliffe, Richard)
November 30, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2022 Filing 22 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Honeywell International Inc.. (Brugh, Lynn)
November 30, 2022 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Eaton Corporation. (Brugh, Lynn)
November 30, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Brugh, Lynn)
November 30, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Brugh, Lynn)
November 30, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company. (Harvey, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Alan Harvey on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Harvey, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan P. Phillips and Certification of Local Counsel William W.C. Harty Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8683814. by Charles Eldon Fox, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harty, William)
November 29, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL re: service/responsive pleading on behalf of Henkel Corporation and Hexcel Corporation (afar)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Goodrich Corporation. (Nanov, Peter)
November 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Christopher Nanov on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Nanov, Peter)
November 28, 2022 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Reeves, Eric)
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric George Reeves on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Reeves, Eric)
November 22, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by General Electric Company. (Joss, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Devins Joss on behalf of General Electric Company (Joss, Matthew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brunick on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Brunick, Timothy)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Brunick, Timothy)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Greene, Kevin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Raytheon Technologies Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal Joinder in Boeing Company's Notice of Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Greene, Kevin)
November 18, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The Boeing Company, DCO LLC, Eaton Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Shell Oil Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Waco, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC. (epri, )
November 18, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
November 18, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Boeing Company. (Hundley, Matthew)
November 18, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BVAEDC-8668431.), filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hundley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. DCO LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Radcliffe, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent James Palmiotto
Represented By: David James Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Represented By: Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV
Represented By: William Delaney Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Danh Duc Chong
Represented By: Jan Ellen Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC
Represented By: Alexander Laszlo Turner
Represented By: Alexander L. Turner
Represented By: Stephanie Underwood Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Radcliffe, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent James Palmiotto
Represented By: David James Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip Corp
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Represented By: Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV
Represented By: William Delaney Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anthony Berardo Taddeo, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Devins Joss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Peter Christopher Nanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Hysol Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Danh Duc Chong
Represented By: Jan Ellen Simonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexcel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Represented By: Lynn Kanaga Brugh, IV
Represented By: William Delaney Bayliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Richard Thomas Radcliffe, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent James Palmiotto
Represented By: David James Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation Individually and as Successor by Merger to UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION doing business as Pratt & Whitney Co., Inc. doing business as UTC Aerospace Systems
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Greene
Represented By: Michele Britton Dallman
Represented By: Bruce Taylor Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Patrick Alan Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Laura May Hooe
Represented By: Martin Andrew Conn
Represented By: Matthew James Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Martin Andrew Conn
Represented By: Laura May Hooe
Represented By: Matthew James Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: James Guy Kennedy
Represented By: Benjamin C. Smoot, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waco, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Robert Theodore Keikil Schmeding
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Alexander Laszlo Turner
Represented By: Alexander L. Turner
Represented By: Stephanie Underwood Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eldon Fox, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Represented By: Ryan P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?