Lewis et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Janet S. Lewis and Jennifer Kahl
Defendant: Paramount Global, Tate Andale, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cummins, Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., CBS Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Tate Andale, Inc., Tate Temco, Inc., Temco Machine Works, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation and Warren Pumps LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00048
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Jamar K Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Filing 50 Memorandum in Support re #49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Harty, William)
June 16, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis. (Harty, William)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 6/15/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
June 14, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Kraus on behalf of Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis (Kraus, Peter)
June 14, 2023 Filing 46 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leila E. Mustafa and Certification of Local Counsel William W.C. Harty Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8981058. by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application)(Harty, William)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 6/14/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
June 13, 2023 Filing 44 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J. Wigle and Certification of Local Counsel William W.C. Harty Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8980044. by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application)(Harty, William)
June 8, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis of Change of Address (Harty, William)
May 31, 2023 Refer for 16(b) (dbra, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 42 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 41 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by John Crane, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Paramount Global (Mullins, Maurice)
May 26, 2023 Filing 38 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cummins, Inc.. (Cook, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by Cummins, Inc..(Cook, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Cook on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Cook, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 35 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FMC Corporation. (Cook, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Cook, Eric)
May 26, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Cook on behalf of FMC Corporation (Cook, Eric)
May 25, 2023 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation. (Woodward, Gordon)
May 25, 2023 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tate Andale, LLC. (Bean, Gregory)
May 25, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Tate Andale, LLC.(Bean, Gregory)
May 25, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by Velan Valve Corporation.(Woodward, Gordon)
May 25, 2023 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Poretz, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Poretz on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Poretz, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2023 Filing 26 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2023 Filing 25 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Paramount Global. (Hoare, Kasey)
May 23, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Paramount Global.(Hoare, Kasey)
May 22, 2023 Filing 23 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Warren Pumps LLC. (Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brunick on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Brunick, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Brunick on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Brunick, Timothy)
May 19, 2023 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by General Electric Company. (Joss, Matthew)
May 18, 2023 Filing 15 Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Joss, Matthew)
May 15, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Warren Pumps LLC served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Velan Valve Corporation served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Tate Andale, LLC served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Paramount Global served on 5/4/2023, answer due 5/25/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis John Crane, Inc. served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis IMO Industries, Inc. served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis General Electric Company served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis FMC Corporation served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Cummins, Inc. served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis Air & Liquid Systems Corporation served on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023 (Harty, William)
May 12, 2023 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(jhie, )
April 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Jewell on behalf of Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis (Jewell, Erin)
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jennifer Kahl, Janet S. Lewis. (Harty, William)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8899574.), filed by Janet S. Lewis, Jennifer Kahl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet with attachment)(Harty, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S. Lewis
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Represented By: Leila Eld Mustafa
Represented By: Patrick Wigle
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kahl
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Jewell
Represented By: William Wesley Coleman Harty
Represented By: Leila Eld Mustafa
Represented By: Patrick Wigle
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Kasey Leigh Hoare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Eric David Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Eric David Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Matthew Devins Joss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Kasey Leigh Hoare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Kasey Leigh Hoare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Kasey Leigh Hoare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Temco, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temco Machine Works, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Gordon Samuel Woodward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?