Daniels v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Elsie P Daniels
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma, S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv00134
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Jamar K Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The request to stay proceedings (ECF No. 18) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines in this case shall be STAYED until May 24, 2024. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint report on or before April 24, 2024. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 12/6/2023. (dbra, )
December 5, 2023 Telephone Conference before District Judge Jamar K. Walker held on 12/5/2023. (ptom, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/21/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Barth Menzies and Certification of Local Counsel Adam James Ward Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9229478. by Elsie P Daniels. (Ward, Adam)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam James Ward on behalf of Elsie P Daniels (Ward, Adam)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/7/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Olivia Houston Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9205709. by Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Houston, Olivia).
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Houston, Olivia)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Wayne, Charles)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement mailed to foreign counsel. (dbra, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-07890. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2023 Notification of transfer of civil case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 2:17cv7890 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6311079) filed by Elsie P Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Karen Barth Menzies added to party Elsie P Daniels(pty:pla).(Menzies, Karen) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie P Daniels
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Amy M Zeman
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Adam James Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?