Powers v. Equitable Production Company
Plaintiff: Leonard O. Powers
Defendant: Equitable Production Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00055
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Presiding Judge: Glen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/31/12. (sc)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Leonard O. Powers. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on February 23, 2010. (aec)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 36 Report and Recommendations and denying 7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Equitable Production Company. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on February 9, 2010. (aec)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equitable Production Company. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/26/10. (eps)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 21 Report and Recommendations, denying 13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Leonard O. Powers. Signed by Judge Glen M. Williams on 11/13/09. (eps)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Leonard O. Powers. Objections to R&R due by 11/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/26/09. (Bordwine, Robin)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Equitable Production Company. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/8/09. (Bordwine, Robin)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Equitable Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard O. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?