Kiser v. EQT Production Company et al
Plaintiff: Eva Mae Adkins and Julie A Kiser
Defendant: EQT Production Company, ACIN LLC, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Black Diamond Coal Company LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Clinchfield Coal Company, Harrison-Wyatt LLC, Lambert Land LLC, LBR Holdings LLC, Levisa Coal Company, Motivation Coal Company, Paramont Coal Corporation, Pyxis Resources Company, Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc, Standard Banner Coal Corporation and John Does A-Z
Case Number: 1:2011cv00031
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Filing 351 Declaration re #349 MOTION to Certify Class by Julie A Kiser (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (Part 1 of 5), #10 Exhibit I (Part 2 of 5), #11 Exhibit I (Part 3 of 5), #12 Exhibit I (Part 4 of 5), #13 Exhibit I (Part 5 of 5), #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O)(Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 350 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #349 MOTION to Certify Class . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 349 MOTION to Certify Class by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #347 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/19/15. (flc)
March 16, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION for Extension of Time to File renewed Motion for Class Certification / Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order by Julie A Kiser.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - House Bill 2058, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffett, Larry)
March 4, 2015 Filing 346 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/15 before Judge Jmes P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2015. (bad)
March 2, 2015 Filing 345 NOTICE of Hearing:Renewed Motions for Class Certification Hearing set for 9/8/2015 thru 9/10/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/2/15. (flc)
February 27, 2015 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Scheduling Conference held on 2/27/2015. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER in re: Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/18/15. (flc)
February 18, 2015 Filing 340 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference via Teleconference set for 2/27/2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/6/15. (ejs)
November 18, 2014 Filing 338 Response re #336 Brief/Memorandum / REPLY CONCERNING ADDITIONAL PRE-CERTIFICATION DISCOVERY. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 11, 2014 Filing 337 Response re #336 Brief/Memorandum Concerning Additional Pre-Certification Discovery. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 28, 2014 Filing 336 Brief/Memorandum Plaintiffs' Submission Concerning Pre-Certification Discovery. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER the plaintiff must file within 14 days the specific subject matter and method of any further discovery requested as to class certification, taking into account (1) the importance of any such discovery and (2) whether its burden and expense on the opposing party outweighs its likely benefits. The opposing party must respond within 14 days of service and the plaintiff may reply within 7 days of service. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/14/14. (ejs)
October 2, 2014 Filing 334 USCA ORDER directing petitioners to pay $505.00 filing fee to the district court for filing and docketing the appeal when the petition for permission to appeal was granted. (ejs)
September 29, 2014 Filing 333 Letter for Response to letters from CNX and EQT this relates to Docket No. 330 by Julie A Kiser (Seltz, Daniel)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying without prejudice to later assertion #299 Motion for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions; denying #309 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #311 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #263 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #266 Motion for Summary Judgment; it is further ordered that the clerk shall revise the docket to show that Julie A. Kiser is substituted as the plt. in this action and Eva Mae Adkins is terminated; the style of the case is hereafter to be as set forth in this order and used by the parties. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 26, 2014 Filing 331 MANDATE by Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals filed on 9/26/14. (flc)
September 22, 2014 Filing 330 Letter for response to September 15, 2014 letter from plaintiffs by EQT Production Company (Massie, Wade)
September 16, 2014 Filing 329 Memorandum to Counsel setting deadline for defendants to reply to #328 Letter to Judge Jones by September 22, 2014.. (ejs)
September 15, 2014 Filing 328 Letter for Judge Jones dated 9-15-2014 Re Scheduling Issues by Julie A Kiser (Seltz, Daniel)
August 27, 2014 Filing 327 Letter to Judge Jones from David Stellings (ejs)
August 19, 2014 Filing 326 USCA Judgment entered on 8/19/14; VACATED and REMANDED District Court's decision. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Judgment)(flc)
August 19, 2014 Filing 325 USCA Memorandum Opinion decided on 8/19/14.(flc)
July 25, 2014 Filing 324 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 1/6/14 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2014. (bad)
May 5, 2014 Filing 323 REPLY to Response to Motion re #311 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John A. Bergonzi)(Massie, Wade)
May 5, 2014 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
April 23, 2014 Filing 321 RESPONSE in Opposition re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2014 Filing 320 AFFIDAVIT re #311 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations by Julie A Kiser (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seltz, Daniel)
April 23, 2014 Filing 319 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #311 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #317 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/21/14. (ejs)
April 18, 2014 Filing 317 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Eva Mae Adkins, Julie A Kiser.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 316 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions Declaration of Tore Hodne. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 315 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions Declaration of Shannon D. Wheatman. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 314 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions by Larry D. Moffett. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2014 Filing 313 RESPONSE in Support re #299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2014 Filing 312 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #311 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adair's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Adair's Second Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Adkins's Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5 - Adkins Dep. Ex. 12)(Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 311 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Statute of Limitations by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 310 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oil and Gas Lease dated October 4, 1989, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adair's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Adkins' Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kiser's Responses to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 5 - Adair's Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories)(Massie, Wade)
April 4, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Tort and Unjust Enrichment Claims by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #307 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/19/14. (flc)
March 19, 2014 Filing 307 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #306 Response to Motion, by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaver, Jennifer) Modified on 3/19/2014 to remove docket text(flc).
March 14, 2014 Filing 306 RESPONSE to Motion re #299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Publication Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Individual Notice for Adkins, #3 Exhibit 3 - Individual Notice for Adair, Kiser, Hale and Addison)(Massie, Wade)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER denying #300 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/12/2014. (lml)
March 12, 2014 Filing 304 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2014 re #300 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
March 10, 2014 Filing 303 RESPONSE in Opposition re #300 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals Opposition to Second Motion to Stay Proceedings. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 10, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference (No Interpreter requested) #300 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2014 at 1:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED*(flc)
March 7, 2014 Filing 301 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #300 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 7, 2014 Filing 300 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeals by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 28, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION for Approval of Class Notices and Notice Program and Amendment of Class Definitions by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wheatman Declaration)(Alexander, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #284 Motion to Amend/Correct Class Definitions. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/16/2014. (flc)
January 6, 2014 Filing 297 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2014 re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment < filed by Julie A Kiser, #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Julie A Kiser, #284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions filed by EQT Production Company (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
November 26, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions (No Interpreter requested) #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions : Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2014 at 2:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
November 26, 2013 Filing 295 REPLY to Response to Motion re #284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 22, 2013 Filing 294 REPLY to Response to Motion re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Accounting. filed by Julie A Kiser. (McMullan, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 293 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seltz, Daniel)
November 22, 2013 Filing 292 RESPONSE in Support re #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Ownership. filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 19, 2013 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 10/16/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014. (bad)
November 19, 2013 Filing 290 RESPONSE to Motion re #284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Barrett, Richard)
November 14, 2013 Filing 289 USCA Order consolidating cases as noted.(flc)
November 12, 2013 Filing 288 USCA Order denying motion for stay pending appeal. (flc)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting re #286 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply Briefs Responses due by 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/12/13. (ejs)
November 11, 2013 Filing 286 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Reply Briefs by Julie A Kiser.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 5, 2013 Filing 285 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 5, 2013 Filing 284 MOTION to Amend/Correct Class Definitions by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade) Modified on 11/25/2013 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc).
November 5, 2013 Filing 283 Response re #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #264 Brief / Memorandum in Support on Ownership. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett)(Massie, Wade)
November 5, 2013 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment for an Accounting. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James Perkins, #2 Exhibit 2 - Abstracts of plaintiffs' requests for production in Adair, #3 Exhibit 3 - Abstracts of plaintiffs' requests for production in Adkins 10 (Legard), #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition in Adair, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition in Adkins 10 (Legard), #6 Errata 6 - Declaration of John A. Bergonzi)(Massie, Wade)
October 21, 2013 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 10/16/2013 reported by Court Reporter Bridget Dickert before Judge Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 10/28/2013. (Massie, Wade)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying #271 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part re #273 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Motions for Summary Judgment] ( Responses due by 11/5/2013). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/17/13. (ejs)
October 16, 2013 Filing 278 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2013 re #271 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal filed by EQT Production Company, #273 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Motions for Summary Judgment]filed by EQT Production Company. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert.) (lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 277 Notification by the 4CCA of Docketing re: Petition for permission to appeal case; USCA # 13-418; Case Manager: Cathy Poulsen (Attachments: #1 Petition for permission to appeal case to 4CCA, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - Part 1, #4 Exhibit B - Part 2)(lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 276 Letter to the Court re: Courtesy copy of pleadings by Julie A Kiser (lml)
October 16, 2013 Filing 275 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 9/12/13 before Judge James P. Jones. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (bad)
October 15, 2013 Filing 274 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion via Teleconference (No Interpreter requested) #271 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal, #273 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Motions for Summary Judgment] : Motion Hearing via Teleconference set for 10/16/2013 at 4:00 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. *COURT REPORTER REQUIRED*(flc)
October 14, 2013 Filing 273 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [to Suspend or Extend the Briefing Schedule on the Motions for Summary Judgment] by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
October 11, 2013 Filing 272 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #271 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
October 11, 2013 Filing 271 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Petitions for Appeal by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 10/15/2013 to remove referral text from docket entry(flc).
October 10, 2013 Filing 270 Letter Re: Mediation by Eva Mae Adkins, Julie A Kiser (ejs)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER setting response deadline as to #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment :(Defendant's Responses due by 10/25/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/10/13. (ejs)
October 10, 2013 Filing 268 Notice of Correction re #267 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment Entries initially docketed as to wrong plaintiff, per request of counsel entry has been corrected to reflect Julie A. Kiser as the filer instead of Eva Mae Adkins (ejs)
October 10, 2013 Filing 267 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Julie A. Kiser. (McMullan, David) Modified on 10/10/2013 - Per request of counsel entry corrected filer to reflect Julie A. Kiser instead of Eva Mae Adkins (ejs).
October 10, 2013 Filing 266 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Julie A. Kiser. (McMullan, David) Modified on 10/10/2013 - Per request of counsel entry corrected filer to reflect Julie Kiser instead of Eva Mae Adkins(ejs).
October 9, 2013 Filing 265 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
October 9, 2013 Filing 264 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #263 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 9, 2013 Filing 263 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Julie A Kiser. (Seltz, Daniel)
October 4, 2013 Filing 262 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 9/12/13 reported by Court Reporter Bridget Dickert before Judge James P. Jones. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 10/11/2013. (Massie, Wade)
October 3, 2013 Filing 261 Letter from Judge Sargent to counsel regarding her availability for settlement conference. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER denying #235 objections; granting #236 objections to #299 Report and Recommendations; adopting #229 Report and Recommendations re: #168 Motion to Certify Class; granting #168 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/30/2013. (lml)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #214 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/27/13. (ejs)
September 27, 2013 Filing 258 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/27/13. (ejs)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER rescinding referral and granting #247 Motion to substitute class representative. Julie A Kiser added. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/19/2013. (lml)
September 18, 2013 Filing 256 REPLY to Response to Motion re #247 MOTION to Substitute Party . filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
September 18, 2013 Filing 255 Letter to the Court in re: Disbursement of Funds by Eva Mae Adkins. (flc)
September 16, 2013 Filing 254 Letter regarding proposed class definitions by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
September 13, 2013 Filing 253 RESPONSE to Motion re #247 MOTION to Substitute Party . filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
September 12, 2013 Filing 252 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James P. Jones: Oral Argument Hearing held on 9/12/2013. Matters were taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (flc)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER of Final Judgment of EQT'S lntemleader Claim #103 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b); Terminating #246 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Terminating Range Resources as a party to this action. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/4/2013. (lml)
September 4, 2013 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (COPY *Only applies if original transcript has been ordered Service) by Eva Mae Adkins for proceedings held on 7/18/13 reported by Court Reporter Ella Surber before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: (Barrett, Charles)
August 30, 2013 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2013. (jw)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #247 MOTION to Substitute Party :(Defendant's Responses due by 9/13/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/28/13. (ejs)
August 27, 2013 Filing 247 MOTION to Substitute Party by Eva Mae Adkins.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease)(Shaver, Jennifer) Modified on 9/19/2013 to remove referral text; Referral of Motion rescinded per order dated 9/19/2013 (lml).
August 16, 2013 Filing 246 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) and Brief in Support by Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Waskom, Thomas)
August 13, 2013 Filing 245 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #240 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Eva Mae Adkins.(Barrett, Charles)
July 31, 2013 Filing 244 AFFIDAVIT re #235 Objection to Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge on the Motions for Class Certification by Eva Mae Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2013 Filing 243 Response re #235 Objection to Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge on the Motions for Class Certification. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 31, 2013 Filing 242 Response re #229 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel filed by Eva Mae Adkins . filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Lease 1 for Exhibit 1, #3 Lease 2 for Exhibit 1, #4 Lease 3 for Exhibit 1, #5 Lease 4 for Exhibit 1, #6 Lease 5 for Exhibit 1, #7 Lease 6 for Exhibit 1, #8 Lease 7 for Exhibit 1, #9 Lease 8 for Exhibit 1, #10 Lease 9 for Exhibit 1, #11 Lease 10 for Exhibit 1, #12 Lease 11 for Exhibit 1, #13 Lease 12 for Exhibit 1)(Massie, Wade)
July 31, 2013 Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on July 18, 2013 reported by Court Reporter Ella Surber before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Transcript due by 8/30/2013. (Massie, Wade)
July 23, 2013 Filing 240 AMENDED ANSWER to #139 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Eva Mae Adkins by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Amend Answer; party shall file amended answer within 7 days of date of entry of this order; plt. shall file responsive pleading to the counterclaim within 21 days of the date of filing of the amended answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/22/13. (flc)
July 18, 2013 Filing 238 FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Abingdon Division held before Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/18/13. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Ella Surber (ejs)
July 18, 2013 Filing 237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2013 re #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims filed by EQT Production Company, #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
July 3, 2013 Filing 236 OBJECTION to #229 Report and Recommendations on Motions for Class Certification by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 19, 2013 Filing 235 OBJECTION to #229 Report and Recommendations by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
June 17, 2013 Filing 234 NOTICE of Hearing on #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims, #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs : Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 7/18/2013 01:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 232 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing set for 9/12/2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 CONSENT ORDER extending deadlines as to #229 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel filed by Eva Mae Adkins :( Objections to R&R due by 7/3/2013; Replies due by 7/31/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/10/13. (flc)
June 5, 2013 Filing 230 Letter from Magistrate Judge Sargent to counsel regarding pending motions. (PMS)
June 5, 2013 Filing 229 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel filed by Eva Mae Adkins. Objections to R&R due by 6/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/5/13. (Bordwine, Robin)
March 21, 2013 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Support re #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Answer and Counterclaim)(Massie, Wade)
March 14, 2013 Filing 227 RESPONSE to Motion re #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (McMullan, David)
March 6, 2013 Filing 226 Response re #222 Letter. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 4, 2013 Filing 225 AFFIDAVIT re #224 Response in Support of Motion REPLY DECLARATION OF DANIEL E. SELTZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Eva Mae Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seltz, Daniel)
March 4, 2013 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Support re #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims :(Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/15/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/1/13. (ejs)
February 28, 2013 Filing 222 Letter for Submitting United States Supreme Court Authority by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 221 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
February 27, 2013 Filing 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers and to Add Counterclaims by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim of EQT Production Company)(Massie, Wade)
February 25, 2013 Filing 219 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin-Barrett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Portions of Deposition of Nicole Atkison, #3 Exhibit 3 - Portions of Deposition of Michael Lancaster)(Massie, Wade)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs :(Defendant EQT Responses due by 2/26/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/12/13. (ejs)
February 12, 2013 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions Hearing held on 11/30/12 before Judge Pamela M. Sargent. Court Reporter: Bridget A. Dickert, OCR, Telephone number: bridgetd@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2013. (bad)
February 8, 2013 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Atkison amended priv log, #2 Exhibit B - Crites amended priv log, #3 Exhibit C - Heflin priv log, #4 Exhibit D - Barrett priv log, #5 Exhibit E - Richey priv log, #6 Exhibit F - Minyard priv log, #7 Exhibit G - Bugna priv log, #8 Exhibit H - Kirk priv log, #9 Exhibit I - Seltz 1-20-12 email to Massie, #10 Exhibit J - Massie 12-31-12 email to Seltz, #11 Exhibit K - Seltz 1-8-13 ltr to Massie, #12 Exhibit L - Massie 1-14-13 ltr to Seltz, #13 Exhibit M - Seltz 1-23-13 email to Massie, #14 Exhibit N - Massie 1-25-13 email to Seltz, #15 Exhibit O - FN 7 - March 13 Transcript section, #16 Exhibit P - FN 8 - Sept 18 Transcript section, #17 Exhibit Q - EQT Response to 7-20-11 ROGS, #18 Exhibit R - EQT Response to 9-30-11 ROGS, #19 Exhibit S - EQT Response to 9-30-11 RFP in Adair, #20 Exhibit T - EQT Response to 9-30-11 RFP in Legard, #21 Exhibit U - Michael Lancaster depo excerpts)(Seltz, Daniel)
February 8, 2013 Filing 215 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
February 8, 2013 Filing 214 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Listed on Defendant EQT Production Company's Privilege Logs by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
December 18, 2012 Filing 213 Response re #211 Response in Opposition to Motion. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 212 Response re #209 Additional Evidence. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
December 14, 2012 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel [Additional Argument]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
December 11, 2012 Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by EQT Production Company for proceedings held on 11/30/2012 before Judge Sargent. Following Transcript due date is an estimated deadline pending deposit, if required by Court Reporter: Bridget Dickert. Transcript due by 1/10/2013. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 12/11/2012-added Bridget Dickert as reporter(slt).
December 7, 2012 Filing 209 Additional Evidence by Eva Mae Adkins Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 30, 2012 Filing 208 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2012 re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Court Reporter Bridget Dickert, OCR.) (ejs)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 11/21/2012. (lml)
November 16, 2012 Filing 206 Additional Argument by Eva Mae Adkins Affidavit of Eva Mae Adkins re: Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class. (Seltz, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2012 - text corrected at the direction of Judge Sargent to reflect Additional Argument instead of Additional Evidence (ejs).
November 16, 2012 Filing 205 Response re #204 Additional Evidence. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
November 9, 2012 Filing 204 Additional Evidence by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
November 7, 2012 Filing 203 MOTION for Protective Order [Amended] by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Re: Procedure for hearing set on November 30, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/16/12. (ejs)
September 21, 2012 Filing 201 Letter for Magistrate Judge Sargent regarding email production by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting in part and taking under advisement in part #189 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/14/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 14, 2012 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/14/12. (Bordwine, Robin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones and Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
September 7, 2012 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Barrett, Don (John))
September 4, 2012 Filing 196 Letter for Class Certification Issues by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 30, 2012 Filing 195 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #189 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 26, 2009 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Affidavit of John Kevin West, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Privilege Log)(Massie, Wade)
August 20, 2012 Filing 194 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel ISO Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Seltz, Daniel)
August 20, 2012 Filing 193 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
August 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OPINION AND ORDER denying #146 Motion to Dismiss; denying Objections #144 #145 #147 to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/18/12. (sc)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER setting response deadline as to #189 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails (Defendant's Responses due by 8/30/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/16/12. (ejs)
August 15, 2012 Filing 190 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #189 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Fourth Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit West Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Atkins Deposition)(Barrett, Don (John))
August 15, 2012 Filing 189 MOTION to Compel Kevin West Emails by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Barrett, Don (John))
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel. Plt's Reply Memorandum in Support is due by 8/20/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/26/2012. (flc)
July 26, 2012 Filing 187 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 19, 2012 Filing 186 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (lmh)
July 19, 2012 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Abbott, #2 Exhibit 2 - Portions of Deposition of Nicole Atkison, #3 Exhibit 3 - Portions of Deposition of Rita McGlothlin Barrett, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Rita McGlothlin Barrett, #5 Exhibit 5 - Portions of Deposition of Kenneth C. Kirk, #6 Exhibit 6 - Portions of Deposition of John Bergonzi, #7 Exhibit 7 - Portions of Deposition of Elizabeth Anne Cox, #8 Exhibit 8 - Portions of Deposition of Eva Mae Adkins, #9 Exhibit 9 - Portions of Deposition of William G. Baker, Jr., #10 Exhibit 10 - Portions of Deposition of Charles S. Bartlett, Jr., Ph.D., #11 Exhibit 11 - Portions of Transcript of Hearing on 5/01/12)(Massie, Wade)
July 9, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eva Mae Adkins by EQT Production Company.(Hodges, Stephen)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/9/12. (ejs)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/9/12. (ejs)
July 6, 2012 Filing 181 MOTION for Protective Order [s] by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel; EQT Production Company's Response due by 7/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/3/2012. (flc)
July 3, 2012 Filing 179 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
July 2, 2012 Filing 178 AFFIDAVIT re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Seltz, Daniel)
July 2, 2012 Filing 177 Brief/Memorandum Memorandum of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 22, 2012 Filing 176 Notice of Correction - At request of counsel, Jennifer Shaver, DE 169 & 170 deleted by Clerk as several of the documents contain information that they want to file under seal. Counsel to file a motion and proposed order to seal, and the docket entries will be refiled. (ejs)
June 21, 2012 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel -- Declaration of Jackson S. White, Jr. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2012 Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel -- Affidavit of Peter G. Glubiak. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2012 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel -- Affidavit of John W. (Don) Barrett. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2012 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel -- Declaration of Larry D. Moffett. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2012 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel Declaration of David S. Stellings and Exhibit A. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2012 Filing 168 MOTION to Certify Class and Appointment of Class Representative and Class Counsel by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
May 16, 2012 Filing 167 Response in Support of Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order Entered on March 28, 2012. filed by Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
May 16, 2012 Filing 166 Response in Support of its Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order Entered March 28, 2012. filed by LBR Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney General Opinion #10-035)(Moore, Harris)
May 16, 2012 Filing 165 Response re #138 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #137 Memorandum Opinion [Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Objections]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Minute Order. Leave is granted to Defendant EQT Production Company, Defendant LBR Holdings, LLC, and Amici Commonweaalth Coal Company, Buckhorn Coal Company, LLLP, and Harrison-Wyatt, LLC, to file Replies to Plaintiff's Responses to Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order of March 28, 2012, PROVIDED that such Replies are filed no later than May 16, 2012. No further briefing shall occur and the Objections shall be deemed submitted to the court for decision upon the expiration of that date. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/9/2012. (JPJ)
May 9, 2012 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Support re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Reply Memorandum]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 8/20/2012 - corrected text to reflect Amended Complaint (ejs).
May 7, 2012 Filing 162 Notice of Correction re #157 Scheduling Conference - deleted incorrect minutes and attached corrected minutes of hearing held on 5/1/2012. (ejs)
May 2, 2012 Filing 161 Response re #144 Objections by Defendant EQT. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Herrington, Brian)
May 2, 2012 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant EQT. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Herrington, Brian) Modified on 8/20/2012 - corrected docket text to reflect Amended Complaint (ejs).
May 2, 2012 Filing 159 Response re #145 Objections,. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Herrington, Brian)
May 2, 2012 Filing 158 Response re #147 Objections,. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Herrington, Brian)
May 1, 2012 Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2012. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs) (Main Document 157 replaced on 5/7/2012) (ejs). Modified on 5/7/2012 - deleted incorrect pdf with updated minutes of hearing held (ejs).
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER resetting response deadline as to Objections #144 filed by EQT Production Company, Objections, #147 filed by Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt LLC, Objections, #145 filed by LBR Holdings LLC, MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #146 filed by EQT Production Company (Responses due by 5/2/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/27/12. (ejs)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint #144 Objections; #147 Objections Responses due by 4/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/26/12. (ejs) Modified on 8/20/2012 corrected docket text to reflect Amended Complaint (ejs).
April 25, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #144 Objections, #147 Objections, #145 Objections, #146 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Herrington, Brian) Modified on 8/20/2012 Corrected docket text to reflect amended omplaint (ejs).
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER holding in abeyance #140 Motion to Dismiss pending a ruling from the court on the objections to the March 28, 2012 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/25/12. (ejs)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #140 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 4/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/18/12. (ejs)
April 17, 2012 Filing 151 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #140 MOTION to Dismiss by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed order granting extension of time)(Herrington, Brian)
April 11, 2012 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EQT Production Company re #144 Objections (Massie, Wade)
April 11, 2012 Filing 149 ANSWER to #139 Amended Complaint by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
April 11, 2012 Filing 148 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #146 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
April 11, 2012 Filing 147 Objections by Amicus Parties Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt LLC re #138 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #137 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint)(Gardner, Blair)
April 11, 2012 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade) Modified on 8/20/2012 - corrected docket text to reflect Amended Complaint (ejs).
April 11, 2012 Filing 145 Objections by Defendant LBR Holdings LLC re #138 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #137 Memorandum Opinion. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Gossett case, #2 Supplement JCC case, #3 Supplement Skinner Case, #4 Supplement Louers case)(Moore, Harris)
April 11, 2012 Filing 144 Objections by Defendant EQT Production Company re #138 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #137 Memorandum Opinion. (Massie, Wade)
April 5, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2012 at 2:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (flc)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #133 Motion for Protective Order; and all other directives as noted in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 4/5/2012. (flc)
April 3, 2012 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC. (Scott, Thomas)
March 28, 2012 Filing 139 AMENDED COMPLAINT against EQT Production Company, filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through D, #2 Exhibit E through G)(ejs) . Modified on 8/20/2012 corrected docket text to reflect Amended Complaint(ejs).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/28/12. (ejs)
March 28, 2012 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/28/12. (ejs)
March 20, 2012 Filing 136 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #133 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition [Reply]. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
March 14, 2012 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Setting Response Deadline as to #133 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/13/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/28/12. (ejs)
February 27, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for Protective Order for Its Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by EQT Production Company.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Massie, Wade)
February 7, 2012 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2012 re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Court Reporter Ella Surber, FTR.) (ejs)
February 2, 2012 Filing 131 Notice of Correction: Document #129 Affidavit in Support deleted; Incorrect event selected; Document refiled at #130 as Brief / Memorandum in Support re #97 MOTION (lmh)
February 2, 2012 Filing 130 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Garden Realty case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Swords Creek case)(Moffett, Larry)
February 1, 2012 Filing 128 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY) #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing reset for 2/7/2012 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to EQT'S Response to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complait. Responses due by 2/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/31/12. (ejs)
January 31, 2012 Filing 126 Notice of Correction - Docket entry 125 docketed incorrectly by attorney. Entry deleted and redocketed by Clerk using correct event code. (ejs)
January 30, 2012 Filing 125 ANSWER to #103 Counterclaim and Crossclaim for Interpleader by Eva Mae Adkins.(ejs)
January 30, 2012 Filing 124 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #116 Response to Motion by Eva Mae Adkins.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (McMullan, David)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #114 Motion to File Amicus Curia Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/26/12. (ejs)
January 25, 2012 Filing 122 Response re #114 MOTION to File Amicus Curia Brief. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (McMullan, David)
January 25, 2012 Filing 121 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACIN LLC re #119 Response to Defendant EQT's Crossclaim for Interpleader (Gardner, Blair)
January 24, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ACIN LLC.Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. (Gardner, Blair)
January 24, 2012 Filing 119 Response to Defendant EQT's Crossclaim for Interpleader. filed by ACIN LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
January 24, 2012 Filing 118 Notice of Correction - Docket Entry 113 - Motion to Withdraw as counsel - deleted at request of counsel to be redocketed. (ejs)
January 24, 2012 Filing 117 Notice of Correction - Docket Entry 110 deleted by Clerk as it was a duplicate entry to docket entry 112. (ejs)
January 23, 2012 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Lambert Land LLC. (Thiessen, Eric)
January 23, 2012 Filing 115 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #114 MOTION to File Amicus Curia Brief. filed by Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Harrison-Wyatt Circuit Court Final Opinion)(Gardner, Blair)
January 23, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION to File Amicus Curia Brief by Commonwealth Coal Corporation, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
January 23, 2012 Filing 112 ANSWER to #103 Counterclaim,, ANSWER to #103 Counterclaim, by Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.(Waskom, Thomas)
January 23, 2012 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
January 23, 2012 Filing 109 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #108 Response to Motion, #98 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by LBR Holdings LLC. (Moore, Harris)
January 18, 2012 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. filed by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC. (Scott, Thomas)
January 11, 2012 Filing 107 Notice of Correction - Docket Entry 104 - Minute Entry - deleted by Clerk as the hearing did not apply to this case. (ejs)
January 10, 2012 Filing 106 Receipt for deposit of funds in the amount of $25,751.49 in re: #105 Order and #103 Counterclaim and Crossclaim for Interpleader (lmh)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER directing the deposit of $25,751.49 and any future royalties into the registry of this Court. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/10/2012. (lmh)
January 9, 2012 Filing 103 COUNTERCLAIM and Crossclaim for Interpleader against Eva Mae Adkins, filed by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
January 9, 2012 Filing 102 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by EQT Production Company.(Massie, Wade)
January 6, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2012 02:00 PM in Abingdon before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ejs)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER setting response Deadlines as to #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint (Defendant's Responses due by 1/23/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/6/12. (ejs)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORAL ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eva Mae Adkins Motions referred to Pamela Meade Sargent. Entered by Judge James P. Jones on 1/5/2012. (lmh)
January 5, 2012 Filing 98 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Moffett, Larry)
January 5, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit -Exhibits A-D to Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit -Exhibits E-G to Amended Class Action Complaint)(Moffett, Larry)
December 19, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Hodges on behalf of EQT Production Company (Hodges, Stephen)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer EQT Production Company answer due 1/10/2012.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/16/11. (ejs)
December 16, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER denying #41 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #86 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/13/2011. (lmh)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/13/2011. (lmh)
October 24, 2011 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder. filed by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gardner, Blair)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's rebuttal due by 10/24/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/19/11. (ejs)
October 18, 2011 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 Response in Opposition to Motion by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Blair)
October 13, 2011 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Report of VA G&O Board)(Herrington, Brian)
October 6, 2011 Filing 87 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #86 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder. filed by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Deed, #2 Deed)(Gardner, Blair)
October 6, 2011 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Misjoinder by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gardner, Blair)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Minute Order. It appearing that Plaintiff has now voluntarily dismissed Defendant Alpha Natural Resources, Inc. as a party hereto, the prior Order of the court (ECF No. 83) directing the clerk to enter a default as to said defendant is VACATED. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/4/2011. (JPJ)
October 4, 2011 Filing 84 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., by Alpha Natural Resources, Inc.. (Jackson, J.)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER directing the clerk to enter default against Alpha Natural Resources, Inc.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/3/2011. (lmh) VACATED BY ORDER ENTERED 10/4/11 (DE 85)
August 25, 2011 Filing 82 Defendant Range Resources Pine Mountain, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.(Waskom, Thomas)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.; Answer due 8/26/2011.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/11/2011. (lmh)
August 10, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waskom, Thomas)
August 9, 2011 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Alpha Natural Resources, Inc. served on 8/5/2011, answer due 8/26/2011.(Glubiak, Peter)
July 26, 2011 Filing 78 Brief/Memorandum Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. filed by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Blair)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on July 26, 2011. (aec)
July 26, 2011 Filing 76 Notice of Correction Document # 74 deleted Brief/Memorandum in Opposition; Incorrect event selected; Document refiled at same number as Motion (lmh)
July 26, 2011 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC re #74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Gardner, Blair)
July 26, 2011 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Blair)
July 25, 2011 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
July 22, 2011 Filing 72 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Banner Coal Corporation. (Harris, Elsey)
July 22, 2011 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Standard Banner Coal Corporation.(Harris, Elsey)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Dismiss; Replies due by 7/25/2011 for EQT Production Company. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on July 13, 2011. (aec)
July 12, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Dismiss by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frye, Mark)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc; Answer due 8/11/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on July 12, 2011. (aec)
July 11, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waskom, Thomas)
July 11, 2011 Filing 66 Response re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum In Response To EQT Production Company, LLCs Motion To Dismiss. filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
July 1, 2011 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Lambert Land LLC.(Thiessen, Eric)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #56 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 7/11/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/28/2011. (JPJ)
June 28, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION to Dismiss by Eva Mae Adkins. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 27, 2011 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011.(Barrett, Charles)
June 27, 2011 Filing 61 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent United Coal Company, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Metinvest U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent Wellmore Coal Company, LLC for Black Diamond Coal Company LLC.. (Scott, Thomas)
June 24, 2011 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by LBR Holdings LLC.(Moore, Harris)
June 24, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eva Mae Adkins (Seltz, Daniel)
June 21, 2011 Filing 58 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
June 21, 2011 Filing 57 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by EQT Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Massie, Wade)
June 21, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss by EQT Production Company. (Massie, Wade)
June 17, 2011 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7). filed by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wade opinion)(Herrington, Brian)
June 17, 2011 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Harrison-Wyatt LLC served on 6/13/2011, answer due 7/5/2011.(Barrett, Charles)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Lambert Land LLC to File Responsive Pleadings; Response due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on June 17, 2011. (aec)
June 16, 2011 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Lambert Land LLC to File Responsive Pleadings by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fineman, Steven)
June 16, 2011 Filing 51 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Trevor L. Earl by LBR Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Moore, Harris)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Lambert Land LLC; Answer due 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on June 10, 2011. (aec)
June 10, 2011 Filing 49 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lambert Land LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thiessen, Eric)
June 9, 2011 Filing 48 Summons Reissued as to Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.(lmh)
June 8, 2011 Filing 47 Proposed Summons by Eva Mae Adkins as toRange Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.(Barrett, Charles)
June 8, 2011 Filing 46 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Eva Mae Adkins as to Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc.(Barrett, Charles)
June 8, 2011 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Standard Banner Coal Corporation waiver sent on 5/26/2011, answer due 7/25/2011.(Barrett, Charles)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER resetting deadline for Levisa Coal Company to file responsive pleadings. Answer due 6/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/7/11. (ejs)
June 6, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Street on behalf of Levisa Coal Company (Street, Benjamin)
June 3, 2011 Filing 42 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procdure 12(b)(6) and 12 (b)(7). filed by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
June 3, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
June 3, 2011 Filing 40 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Gardner, Blair)
June 3, 2011 Filing 39 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP identifying Corporate Parent Suntrust Banks, Inc. for Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP.. (Gardner, Blair)
June 3, 2011 Filing 38 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACIN LLC identifying Corporate Parent Natural Resource Partners L.P. for ACIN LLC.. (Gardner, Blair)
June 2, 2011 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. EQT Production Company served on 5/31/2011, answer due 6/21/2011.(Barrett, Charles)
May 27, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Correction: Incorrect event selected - docket entry #30 deleted; event refiled at docket entry #34 (lmh)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LBR Holdings LLC answer due 6/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/27/11. (lmh)
May 27, 2011 Filing 34 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LBR Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Harris)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ACIN LLC answer due 6/3/2011; Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP answer due 6/3/2011; Harrison-Wyatt LLC answer due 6/3/2011.. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/26/11. (lmh)
May 27, 2011 Filing 32 Notice of Correction; Incorrect events selected - docket entries #18,19,20,21 and 25 deleted; events refiled at docket entries #26,27,28,29 and 31. (lmh)
May 27, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Gardner, Blair)
May 26, 2011 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Paramont Coal Corporation served on 5/12/2011, answer due 6/2/2011.(Glubiak, Peter)
May 26, 2011 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Motivation Coal Company served on 5/12/2011, answer due 6/2/2011.(Glubiak, Peter)
May 26, 2011 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Black Diamond Coal Company LLC served on 5/12/2011, answer due 6/2/2011.(Glubiak, Peter)
May 26, 2011 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eva Mae Adkins. Clinchfield Coal Comany served on 5/12/2011, answer due 6/2/2011.(Glubiak, Peter)
May 25, 2011 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to EQT Production Company.(lmh)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/25/11. (lmh)
May 25, 2011 Filing 22 Proposed Summons by Eva Mae Adkins as toEQT Production Company.(Barrett, Charles)
May 24, 2011 Filing 17 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ACIN LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Harrison-Wyatt LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitesell, Eric)
May 24, 2011 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Harrison-Wyatt LLC.(lmh)
May 24, 2011 Filing 15 Proposed Summons by Eva Mae Adkins as toHarrison-Wyatt LLC.(Moffett, Larry)
May 24, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eva Mae Adkins (Barrett, Don (John)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Lambert Land LLC; Answer due 6/10/2011. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on May 23, 2011. (aec)
May 20, 2011 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Class Action Complaint by Lambert Land LLC. (Thiessen, Eric)
May 19, 2011 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC re #9 Answer to Complaint (Scott, Thomas)
May 19, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC re #8 Notice of Appearance (Scott, Thomas)
May 18, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Black Diamond Coal Company LLC.(Scott, Thomas)
May 18, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr on behalf of Black Diamond Coal Company LLC (Scott, Thomas)
May 17, 2011 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Complaint served on LBR Holdings, Registered Agent on 5/5/2011, filed by Eva Mae Adkins.(Barrett, Charles)
May 17, 2011 Filing 6 RETURN of service of Summons with Complaint on 5/9/2011 upon Lambert Land, Registered Agent(Barrett, Charles)
May 17, 2011 Filing 5 RETURN of service of Summons with Complaint on 5/5/2011 upon Defendant Buckhorn Coal Co, through Agent(Barrett, Charles)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/3/11. (lmh)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry D. Moffett, Don Barrett, Brian Herrington, Katherine B. Riley, David M. McMullan, Jr., Elizabeth J. Cabraser, David S. Stellings, Steven E. Fineman, Daniel E. Seltz, Jennifer Gross, Elizabeth A. Alexander, Richard R. Barrett and Charles F. Barrett by Eva Mae Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glubiak, Peter)
May 2, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACIN LLC, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Black Diamond Coal Company LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Clinchfield Coal Comany, EQT Production Company, Harrison-Wyatt LLC, LBR Holdings LLC, Lambert Land LLC, Levisa Coal Company, Motivation Coal Company, Paramont Coal Corporation, Pyxis Resources Company, Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc, Standard Banner Coal Corporation.(lmh)
April 20, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQT Production Company, ACIN LLC, Alpha Natural Resources, Inc., Black Diamond Coal Company LLC, Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP, Clinchfield Coal Comany, Harrison-Wyatt LLC, John Does A-Z, LBR Holdings LLC, Lambert Land LLC, Levisa Coal Company, Motivation Coal Company, Paramont Coal Corporation, Pyxis Resources Company, Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc, Standard Banner Coal Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt #0423-1293343), filed by Eva Mae Adkins. 100 Day Notice due by 7/29/2011 120 Day Service due by 8/18/2011 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(lmh) Modified on 4/21/2011 to correct filing date (lmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiser v. EQT Production Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Mae Adkins
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Jackson Stuart White, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsey Shaver
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A Kiser
Represented By: Brian Herrington
Represented By: Charles F. Barrett
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: David Malcom McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Don (John) William Barrett
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Alexander
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Jackson Stuart White, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer Gross
Represented By: Jennifer Lindsey Shaver
Represented By: Larry D. Moffett
Represented By: Peter Gerard Glubiak
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Sara Katherine Riley
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQT Production Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Represented By: Mark E. Frye
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACIN LLC
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Natural Resources, Inc.
Represented By: J. Brian Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Diamond Coal Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckhorn Coal Company LLLP
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinchfield Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison-Wyatt LLC
Represented By: Eric Dwight Whitesell
Represented By: Blair Martin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambert Land LLC
Represented By: Eric Roger Thiessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBR Holdings LLC
Represented By: Harris Keith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levisa Coal Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motivation Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramont Coal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyxis Resources Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Range Resources-Pine Mountain Inc
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Banner Coal Corporation
Represented By: Elsey Allen Harris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?