Yellow Popular Lumber Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00037
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER Referring case to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Virginia; Administratively terminating the case from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/28/2017. (lml)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION and ORDER appointing John Lamie as trustee for Yellow Poplar Lumber Company; trustee must file responsive pleadings within 14 days from the date of entry of this order; and directing the clerk to schedule a hearing on all pending motions. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/24/15. (flc)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 1 MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Yellow Popular Lumber Company. The Clerk is directed to transfer Debtor's case in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Abingdon Division, for docketing in that court. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/20/2015. (abuc) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/21/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellow Popular Lumber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?