Latson v. Clarke et al
Case Number: 1:2016cv00039
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Presiding Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 OPINION and ORDER granting 261 Motion to Review and Reverse the Clerk's Taxation of Costs; denying 256 Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/5/19. (flc)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 OPINION and ORDER granting 180 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/6/18. (flc)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 OPINION and ORDER denying 151 Motion to Strike ; denying 174 Motion to Strike ; granting 183 Motion to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Aradhana Bela Sood; granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Exclude or Limit Certain Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/16/18. (flc)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 OPINION and ORDER denying 156 Motion to Use Deposition Testimony of Unavailable Witness at Trial. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/18/18. (flc) Modified on 5/18/2018 to add the "opinion" language to the docket text (flc).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 5/14/18. (flc)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION and ORDER denying 114 Motion to Bifurcate and 116 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/21/17. (ejs)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Commonwealth of Virginia and Marion Correctional Treatment Center are dismissed as defendants in this case. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/20/17. (flc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latson v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?