Doe v. Russell County School Board et al

Case Number: 1:2016cv00045
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Presiding Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1681 - Title IX of the Education Amendment of 1972
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion in Limine and Brief in Support to Exclude New Expert Reports and Testimony. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 3/1/18. (ejs)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION and ORDER that the court will treat current employees of the School Board and former employees who had involvement with the events in question in the case as adverse witnesses under Rule 611(c)(2) and permit leading questions on direct examin ation. However, with respect to former employees who had little to no such involvement, the court will wait until trial to determine on an individual basis if such a witness seems hostile or uncooperative. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/28/18. (ejs)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION and ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendant Bobby Gobble; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; defendants Henley and Hooker are dismissed; and defendant's designated as John Roes 1-10 are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 2/13/18. (ejs)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 4/13/17. (ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Russell County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?