Von Bremen et al v. Lamie
Appellant: Robert W. Von Bremen, Charles R. Collins, Bobby Johnson, Janet Von Bremen Shatto and Barbara Von Bremen Lokos
Appellee: John M. Lamie
Debtor: Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00043
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Bobby Johnson, Robert W. Von Bremen. (Copeland, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) : Oral Argument Hearing set for 2/22/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the clerk to schedule an oral argument hearing before the court after consultation with counsel, allowing adequate time for filing of briefs. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/17/2018. (lml)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70882. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement) (Campbell, Pamela)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 11/15/18; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70882; Adversary Number - N/A (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Memorandum Opinion, #3 Order, #4 Docket Sheet)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Bremen et al v. Lamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert W. Von Bremen
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Charles R. Collins
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bobby Johnson
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Janet Von Bremen Shatto
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Von Bremen Lokos
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John M. Lamie
Represented By: John M Lamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?