Beller v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janie Mae Beller
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wayne Scott Simpson for CMH Homes, Inc. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/30/19. (ejs)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Judge James P. Jones no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/30/2019. (flc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for W. Scott Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3060133. by CMH Homes, Inc..Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Jessee, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (ar).
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Records received from Washington County Circuit Court, CL18-2415 (ar)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/18/2019. (lml)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint by CMH Homes, Inc..(Jessee, Roy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clayton Homes, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Capital, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for CMH Homes, Inc.. (Jessee, Roy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (lml)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 18-2415. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt #0423-3052427),filed by CMH Homes, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process and Complaint #2 Exhibit B - Service Documents and Complaint #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Existence #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beller v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Mae Beller
Represented By: David L. Scyphers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Mark Jessee
Represented By: Wayne Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?