Andes et al v. The United States
Plaintiff: Roy L. Andes and Marianne M. Andes
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roy L. Andes. The United States served on 2/27/2019.(ejs)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roy L. Andes. The United States served on 2/25/2019.(ejs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The United States (Attorney General of the United States).(flc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The United States (U.S. Attorney's Office).(flc)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 02/04/2019. (ar)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The United States, filed by Roy L. Andes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Claim for Damage Injury or Death, #3 Dept of Veteran Affirm Admin, #4 FDA printout, #5 Medication guide)(ar)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy L. Andes.Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andes et al v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy L. Andes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne M. Andes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?