James v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rentz James
Defendant: Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc., Denso International America, Inc. and Subaru of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 through 10/9/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 through 10/9/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/9/19. (ejs) (Main Document 27 replaced on 7/9/2019) (ejs). Modified on 7/9/2019 - Document replaced with corrected document (ejs).
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Casola, Milam, Spencer, Shuford, Webber and Jones on 7/9/2019. Jury trial set for 9 a.m. 9/28- 10/9/20 before USDJ Jones in AB. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jones, Belinda)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Shuford, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Denso International America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Belinda)
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 09:30 AM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 7/8/2019.(Bordwine, Robin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rebecca Rentz James. (Casola, Francis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Rebecca Rentz James. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Walton Milam III)(Milam, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ashlet Catherine Webber for Denso International America, Inc.,Ashlet Catherine Webber for Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/14/19. (ejs)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bradford C. Marsh for Denso International America, Inc.,Bradford C. Marsh for Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/14/19. (ejs)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION for C. Bradford Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3162722. . filed by Denso International America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Jones, Belinda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for C. Bradford Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3162722. by Denso International America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Jones, Belinda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION for Ashley C. Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3162720. . filed by Denso International America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Jones, Belinda)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Ashley C. Webber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3162720. by Denso International America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Jones, Belinda)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Shuford, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Shuford, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Certified State Court Records received via e-mail from Tazewell County Circuit Court, CL19000931-00 (lml)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Belinda)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Jones, Belinda)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Denso International America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Belinda)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Denso International America, Inc.. (Jones, Belinda)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Denso International America, Inc. on May 20, 2019, filed by Rebecca Rentz James.(Milam, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Denso Manufacturing Tennessee on May 24, 2019, filed by Rebecca Rentz James.(Milam, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Subaru of America, Inc. on May 21, 2019, filed by Rebecca Rentz James.(Milam, Joseph)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Walton Milam, III on behalf of Rebecca Rentz James (Milam, Joseph)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court Tazewell County, Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/3/19. (ejs)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Tazewell County, case number CL19-931. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; receipt number 0423-3154368), filed by Denso International America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Subaru of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso Manufacturing Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Warren David Harless
Represented By: Bradford C. Marsh
Represented By: Ashley Catherine Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso International America, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Warren David Harless
Represented By: Bradford C. Marsh
Represented By: Ashley Catherine Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Channing Spencer
Represented By: Mark Campbell Shuford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rentz James
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Joseph Walton Milam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?