Hileman v. Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Christina Hileman
Defendant: Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00025
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; and the Defendant's answer filed on July 12, 2019 is accepted and deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/15/19. (ejs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Margaret)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION and ORDER denying #5 Motion for default and #6 Motion for entry of default. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 8/14/19. (ejs)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC, #6 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment . filed by Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Margaret)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint by Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC.(Ward, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by Christina Hileman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Entry for Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Large, Michael) Modified on 7/12/2019 to remove referral text: Motion not referred (lml).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC by Christina Hileman. (Large, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court, Washington County Virginia, 19-1125, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ejs)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court Washington County, Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/2/19. (ejs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC (ejs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit court, case number 191CL19001125-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; receipt # 0423-3174542), filed by Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hileman v. Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Lawn Investments, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Hileman
Represented By: Michael Emory Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?