Copeland v. Lamie
Debtor: Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc.
Appellee: Esquire John M. Lamie
Appellant: Robert T. Copeland
Case Number: 1:2019cv00029
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Robert T. Copeland. (Copeland, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 9/21/2019. Appellee Brief due by 10/21/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/4/2019. (lml)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70882. (Wood, Chad)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 7/26/2019; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-70882 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Appeal to the U. S. District Court, #3 USBC Docket Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Lamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Yellow Poplar Lumber Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Esquire John M. Lamie
Represented By: John M Lamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert T. Copeland
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?