Alexander v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: Glenna Alexander
Defendant: Ashaben Patel and Kartik Patel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2020 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties . filed by Glenna Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4)(Large, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order to Respond; Plaintiff must file within 14 days a memorandum setting forth the justification for the addition of the proposed parties; Plt's response due by 1/27/2020; Defendants may file a response to the plaintiff's memorandum within 14 days. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/13/20. (flc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Parties by Glenna Alexander. (Large, Michael) Modified on 1/9/2020 - Removed text referring motion to Judge Sargent (ejs).
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 & 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 & 11/3/2020 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 12/12/19. (ejs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Large and Stallard on 12/11/2019. Jury trial set for 11/2-3/20 before J. Jones in Abingdon. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel (Stallard, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bordwine, Robin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (flc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashaben Patel (flc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kartik Patel (flc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bristol City Circuit Court, case number CL19000371. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt #: 0423-3276786), filed by Ashaben Patel, Kartik Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashaben Patel
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kartik Patel
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Alexander
Represented By: Michael Emory Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?