Pack v. Crabtree et al
Plaintiff: Donna Crabtree Pack
Defendant: Kenneth L. Pope, First Community Bank, B&H Lending Services, LLC and H. Keith Crabtree
Case Number: 1:2020cv00003
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Donna Crabtree Pack by Kenneth L. Pope.(Austin, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Donna Crabtree Pack by H. Keith Crabtree.(Hodges, Stephen)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and continuing deadline for the defendants' filing of responsive pleadings to 4/13/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/18/20. (PMS)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Kenneth L. Pope. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Austin, Robert)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Hodges on behalf of H. Keith Crabtree (Hodges, Stephen)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wayne Austin on behalf of Kenneth L. Pope (Austin, Robert)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Crabtree Pack. First Community Bank served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020.(Hobbs, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint,, by B&H Lending Services, LLC.(Bieger, Daniel)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Crabtree Pack. H. Keith Crabtree served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020.(Hobbs, Robert)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donna Crabtree Pack. B&H Lending Services, LLC waiver sent on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Hobbs, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donna Crabtree Pack (lml)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued)(lml)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&H Lending Services, LLC, H. Keith Crabtree, First Community Bank, Kenneth L. Pope (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt#100004264 ), filed by Donna Crabtree Pack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Operating Agreement)#3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Credit Line Deed of Trust, #5 Exhibit D - Easement and Right of Way, #6 Exhibit E - Report of Trustee of the Crabtree Living Trust) #7 Exhibit F - Check, #8 Exhibit G - The Crabtree Living Trust) (lml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pack v. Crabtree et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Pope
Represented By: Robert Wayne Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&H Lending Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Robert Bieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Keith Crabtree
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Crabtree Pack
Represented By: Robert Lucas Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?