Goodie v. CONSOL Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Perry Goodie
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00004
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants answer due 6/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/19/20. (ejs)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laurent, David)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 03/10/2020. (ar)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David J. Laurent for CONSOL Energy, Inc.,David J. Laurent for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 03/10/2020. (ar)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Amended Complaint by CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Amy)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for David J. Laurent to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3349169. by CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Amy) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add receipt# provided by Erica Foster (mzc).
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Miller on behalf of CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Miller, Amy)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Perry Goodie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Collins, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(ar)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston by David Perry Goodie (Collins, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for CONSOL Energy, Inc. by David Perry Goodie (Collins, Christopher)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOL Energy, Inc., Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3332051.), filed by David Perry Goodie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodie v. CONSOL Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Perry Goodie
Represented By: Christopher Earl Collins
Represented By: Paul Graham Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: David J. Laurent
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Laurent
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?