Mullins v. Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab
Plaintiff: Joshua Mullins
Defendant: Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab
Case Number: 1:2020cv00020
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab.(Marshall, Alexander)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab, filed by Joshua Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of plaintiff)(Johnson, Hilary)
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 through 4/15/2021 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 through 4/15/2021 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/27/20. (ejs)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 5/27/20. (ejs)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Joshua Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support P Declaration)(Johnson, Hilary)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joshua Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration in Support P Declaration)(Johnson, Hilary) Modified on 5/27/2020 to remove referral(ar).
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Alexander)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2020 11:00 AM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 05/26/2020.(Bordwine, Robin)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Russell County, CL20-404, consisting of Complaint, Summons, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, Agreed Order, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ar)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab. (Marshall, Alexander)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab. (Marshall, Alexander)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ar)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Russell County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 05/06/2020. (ar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab (ar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Tevis Marshall on behalf of Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab (ar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Russell County Circuit Court, case number CL20-404. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt No. 0423-3387474), filed by Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Complaint, Summons, Motion for Extension of Time, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Pressure Vessel Group / Steel Fab
Represented By: Alexander Tevis Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mullins
Represented By: Hilary K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?