Singleton v. Target Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Candy Singleton
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00024
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 08:142
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Target Stores, Inc. (Giroux, Danielle)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/8-9/2021 09:30 AM in Abingdon before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.,Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/23/20. (mka)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/23/2020. (mka)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2020 03:30 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (ssm)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court for Washington County, CL20-387, consisting of 2 Complaint, 10 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ar)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 Scheduling Letter (mka)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Target Stores, Inc..(Giroux, Danielle)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ar)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 06/03/2020. (ar)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation for Target Stores, Inc. (ar)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit, case number CL20-387. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt No. 0423-3405459), filed by Target Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ar).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Target Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Singleton
Represented By: David Benjamin Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Deanna Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?