Davis et al v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Plaintiff: Rick Davis and Mary Davis
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00043
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Settlement Conference Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:00 AM to 2:00 PM in Roanoke before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Conference Preparation)(lml)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Stay Case Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/23/20. (ejs)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines for All Substantive, Procedural, and Jurisdictional Pleadings by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Pritts, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou for Mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/16/20. (mka)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 First Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 First MOTION to Remand . filed by Mary Davis, Rick Davis. (Scott, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand by Mary Davis, Rick Davis. (Scott, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 First Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by Mary Davis, Rick Davis. (Scott, Thomas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Pritts, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Pritts, Matthew)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ar)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Buchanan County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 09/03/2020. (ar)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation (ar)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Corporation. (ar)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buchanan County Circuit Court, case number CL20-587. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt #0423-3478405), filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, Motion for Non-Suit)(ar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Warren Pritts
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Warren Pritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Davis
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Davis
Represented By: Thomas Ralph Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?