Weber v. Quisonberry et al
Plaintiff: Robert T. Weber
Defendant: JSRS, Inc. and Paul L. Quisonberry
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2020 01:30 PM by conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 11/30/2020. (rb)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by JSRS, Inc. (Workowski, Sean)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by JSRS, Inc., Paul L. Quisonberry.(Workowski, Sean)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Workowski on behalf of JSRS, Inc., Paul L. Quisonberry (Workowski, Sean)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Michelle DeCoster on behalf of JSRS, Inc., Paul L. Quisonberry (DeCoster, Katherine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Paul L. Quisonberry NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ejs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to JSRS, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ejs)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt # 0423-3501445.), filed by Robert T. Weber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ejs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Quisonberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Weber
Represented By: Jason Howard Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSRS, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Michelle DeCoster
Represented By: Sean C. Workowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Quisonberry
Represented By: Katherine Michelle DeCoster
Represented By: Sean C. Workowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?