Buchanan v. Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC
Plaintiff: John T. Buchanan
Defendant: Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00006
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 22 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiff John T. Buchanan (Ratliff, Bradley)
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure (Zurbuch, Alex)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/2/21. (ejs)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission (Zurbuch, Alex)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission (Zurbuch, Alex)
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Zurbuch, Alex)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 through 3/11/2022 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 through 3/11/2022 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/9/21. (ejs)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Ratliff, Stone and Zurbuch on 2/9/2021. Jury trial set in AB before USDJ Jones on 3/7-11/22. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alex J. Zurbuch ; granting #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher S. Burnside Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/8/2021. (flc)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. (Stone, Paula)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. (Stone, Paula)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC (Stone, Paula)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Christopher S. Burnside to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3620117. by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stone, Paula)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Alex J. Zurbuch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3620113. by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stone, Paula)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Santek Holdings, Inc. for Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. (Stone, Paula)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2021 03:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 02/08/2021. (rb)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/25/2021. (flc)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Tazewell County Circuit Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/25/2021. (flc)
January 22, 2021 Bradley Ratcliff, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (flc)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (flc)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (flc)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tazewell County Circuit Court, case number CL20-2129. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402; Receipt: AVAWDC-3607103), filed by Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Service of Process Transmittal Form, #3 Organization of Santek Environmental of Virginia LLC, #4 Tennessee Department of State Filing Information for Santek Environmental, #5 Tennessee Department of State Filing Information for Santek Water, #6 Tennessee Department of State Fiing Information for Santek Holdings, #7 State Court Filings)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Buchanan
Represented By: Bradley Claude Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santek Environmental of Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Paula Danielle Stone
Represented By: Alex Jeffrey Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?