Davis v. Dewilde et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Davis
Defendant: Michael Dewilde, County Of Bland, Bland County Board of Supervisors, Micheal Dewilde, Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated and Nationwide
Case Number: 1:2021cv00009
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated (Objections to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents) (Daniel, James)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde. (Dadak, Christopher)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Reply re #22 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. filed by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated. (Daniel, James)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 4/14/2021. (rb)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Motion Hearing via Video Conference set for 5/4/21 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge James P. Jones (Cancel Court Reporter) (flc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing via Video Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (flc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss , #21 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 Brief / Memorandum in Support "Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss". filed by Cheryl Davis. (McKelvey, David)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde. (Dadak, Christopher)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde. (Dadak, Christopher)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated.(Daniel, James)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated. (Daniel, James)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated. (Daniel, James)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (McKelvey, David)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants County Of Bland and Dewilde answers due 3/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/24/21. (PMS)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Dadak, Christopher)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Stanislaw Dadak on behalf of County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde (Dadak, Christopher)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated answer due 3/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/22/21. (PMS)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Daniel, James)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha G. White Medley on behalf of Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated (Medley, Martha)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. L. Daniel on behalf of Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated (Daniel, James)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Defendant Nationwide (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Spence, Phyllis) Modified on 3/18/2021 - Document restricted to Court only at the direction of Judge James P. Jones and event text changed from Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures; Counsel advised via e-mail. (lml).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Spence, Phyllis)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Davis Nationwide Mutual Ins. Co. (McKelvey, David)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Davis Nationwide Mutual Fire Ins. Co. (McKelvey, David)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN of service of Nationwide Mutual Ins. Co. on 2/16/21 upon Renee Norquist of Corporation Service Company(McKelvey, David)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RETURN of service of Nationwide Mutual Fire Ins. Co. on 02/16/21 upon Renee Norquist of Corporation Service Company(McKelvey, David)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated, County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #5 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued)(lml)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated, County Of Bland, Michael Dewilde (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402.00; Receipt #AVAWDC-3625359 Receipt #), filed by Cheryl Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Dewilde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dewilde
Represented By: Christopher Stanislaw Dadak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Bland
Represented By: Christopher Stanislaw Dadak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Christopher Stanislaw Dadak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Dewilde
Represented By: Christopher Stanislaw Dadak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bland County Volunteer Fire Department, Incorporated
Represented By: James A. L. Daniel
Represented By: Martha G. White Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide
Represented By: Phyllis Carrison Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Davis
Represented By: David Adam McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?