Hill v. Abdumuxtorov et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Hill
Defendant: Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Khamidillo Abdumuxturov, Asirdin Bozorov, Global Transport LLC and Global Transportation LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00004
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand . filed by Sonya Hill. (Hurt, Mark)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Reply re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Asirdin Bozorov. (Lewis, Lindsey)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Global Transportation LLC. (Lewis, Lindsey)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand . filed by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Asirdin Bozorov, Global Transportation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Lindsey)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 through 6/9/2023 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Senior Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/7/22. (ejs)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE Order to Respond re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' reply due by 3/11/2022. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/4/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(PMS)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE Order to Respond re #14 MOTION to Remand Responses due by 3/11/2022. Plaintiff's reply due 3/18/22.. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 3/4/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(PMS)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Hurt and Lewis on 3/4/2022. Jury trial set before J. Jones in AB on 6/5-9/23. Orders forthcoming. (PMS)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2022 01:30 PM by telephone conference call before US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (rb)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Lewis, Lindsey)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by Sonya Hill. (Hurt, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by Sonya Hill. (Hurt, Mark)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Sonya Hill. (Hurt, Mark)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss due by 3/2/2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/15/22. (ejs)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #10 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Brief / Memorandum in Support by Sonya Hill. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hurt, Mark)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Certified True Paper Copies of State Court Record(s) received from Smyth County Circuit Court, case number(s) CL21-115 consisting of 2 Complaint, 8 Summons, 13 Demurrer, Answer & Affrmative Defenses, 21 Motion to Compel, 26 Notice of Hearing, 29 Demurrer, Answer & Affirmative Defenses, 34 Demurrer, Answer & Affirmative Defenses, 39 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (am)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Asirdin Bozorov. (Lewis, Lindsey)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Asirdin Bozorov. (Lewis, Lindsey)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Global Transportation LLC. (Lewis, Lindsey)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Global Transportation LLC. (Lewis, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Transportation LLC (Lewis, Lindsey)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Lindsey Anne Lewis on behalf of Global Transportation LLC (Lewis, Lindsey)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (am)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Smyth County Circuit Court. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 01/27/2022. (am)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Smyth Coiunty Circuit Court, case number CL21-115, filed by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Asirdin Bozorov. (Attorney corrected defendant names in signature block). (am)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Smyth County Circuit Court, case number CL21-115. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3876417), filed by Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov, Asirdin Bozorov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Demurrer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Police Crash Report, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Abdumuxtorov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khamidillo Abdumuxtorov
Represented By: Elena Georgiev Patarinski
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khamidillo Abdumuxturov
Represented By: Elena Georgiev Patarinski
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asirdin Bozorov
Represented By: Elena Georgiev Patarinski
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Transportation LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Hill
Represented By: Mark T. Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?