Hodzic v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ekrem Hodzic
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Coleman World Group, LLC, Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC, Eagle Leasing, Inc. and Stephen Burns
Case Number: 1:2022cv00026
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 10/11/2023 through 10/20/2023 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Senior Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ejs)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/11/2023 through 10/20/23 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Senior Judge James P. Jones. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/11/22. (ejs)
August 11, 2022 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent: Scheduling Conference held by telephone conference call with Counsel Byrne, Montgomery and Davoli on 8/11/2022. Jury trial set before J. Jones in AB on 10/11-13, 16-20/23. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (PMS)
August 10, 2022 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Byrne, Robert)
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE TO COUNSEL REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (N) Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2022 11:00 AM by telephone conference call before US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. Counsel is directed to confer regarding discovery and to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report with the court by or before 08/10/2022.(rb)
August 1, 2022 Filing 21 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (flc)
July 28, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Montgomery on behalf of All Defendants (Montgomery, Michael)
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Stephen Burns.(Davoli, Ashley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Eagle Leasing, Inc..(Davoli, Ashley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC.(Davoli, Ashley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Coleman World Group, LLC.(Davoli, Ashley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Coleman American Moving Services, Inc..(Davoli, Ashley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Allied Van Lines, Inc..(Davoli, Ashley)
July 21, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE (Coleman World Group, LLC) by Ekrem Hodzic (flc)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE (Eagle Leasing, Inc.) by Ekrem Hodzic (flc)
July 12, 2022 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued (Summons - Allied Van Lines, Inc.) as to Allied Van Lines, Inc., Stephen Burns, Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Coleman World Group, LLC, Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC, Eagle Leasing, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., #2 Summons - Coleman World Group, LLC, #3 Summons - Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC, #4 Summons - Eagle Leasing, Inc., #5 Summons - Stephen Burns)(flc)
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Summons for Stephen Burns, Administrator of the Estate of Orlando Craig, Deceased by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Eagle Leasing, Inc. by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Coleman World Group, LLC by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Coleman American Moving Services, Inc. by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 11, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Allied Van Lines, Inc. by Ekrem Hodzic (Byrne, Robert)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Van Lines, Inc., Stephen Burns, Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Coleman World Group, LLC, Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC, Eagle Leasing, Inc., filed by Ekrem Hodzic.(flc)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Amended Complaint shall be filed upon the docket. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/7/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(PMS)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Ekrem Hodzic. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -- Amended Complaint)(Byrne, Robert)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Van Lines, Inc., Stephen Burns, Coleman American Moving Services, Inc., Coleman World Group, LLC, Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC, Eagle Leasing, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402; receipt number BVAWDC-3983240.), filed by Ekrem Hodzic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodzic v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekrem Hodzic
Represented By: Jonathan T. Wren
Represented By: Robert Emmet Byrne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman American Moving Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman World Group, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Worldwide Moving, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Burns
Represented By: Ashley Ann Davoli
Represented By: Michael Anthony Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?