Menerick et al v. Salem Heritage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Menerick and Amy Menerick
Defendant: Salem Heritage, LLC, Greg Hunter and Matt McFatter
Case Number: 1:2023cv00010
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Salem Heritage, LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Electronic Summons Re-Issued as to Greg Hunter NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(flc)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Proposed Summons for Greg Hunter by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick (Stallard, William)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick. (Stallard, William)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Salem Heritage, LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Salem Heritage, LLC. (Voyles, Shawn)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Salem Heritage, LLC.(Voyles, Shawn)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matt McFatter. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(flc)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Matt McFatter by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick (Stallard, William)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Salem Heritage, LLC on 3/28/23, filed by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick.(Stallard, William)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued (Summons - Salem Heritage, LLC) as to Greg Hunter, Matt McFatter, Salem Heritage, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Greg Hunter, #2 Summons - Matt McFatter)(flc)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Matt McFatter by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick (Stallard, William)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Greg Hunter by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick (Stallard, William)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Salem Heritage, LLC by Amy Menerick, Christopher Menerick (Stallard, William)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amy Menerick (flc)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Menerick (flc)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greg Hunter, Matt McFatter, Salem Heritage, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4147106.), filed by Christopher Menerick, Amy Menerick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(flc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menerick et al v. Salem Heritage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Menerick
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Menerick
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Heritage, LLC
Represented By: Paul Robert Schmeding
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt McFatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?