Keitz v. Unnamed Sponsors of Cocaine Research Study et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Keitz
Defendant: Unnamed Director of UVA Center for Addiction Research, Unnamed Sponsors of Cocaine Research Study, Commonwealth Of Virginia, UVA Center for Addiction Research, University of Virginia and Medical Center, Unnamed #1 Male Nurse, UVA Care, Unnamed #2 Male Doctor, UVA Care, Unnamed #4, 5, 6 Male E.R. Doctors, UVA Medical Center and Unnamed #3 Female Research Assistant, UVA Care
Case Number: 3:2011cv00054
Filed: August 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/31/2013. (ssm)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/01/2013. (ssm)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/19/2013. (ssm) Modified on 7/22/2013 to reflect correct signature date (ssm).
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER dismissing Amended Complaint, 17 filed by Michael James Keitz, Memorandum Opinion 19 . Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/16/2011. (mab)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/1/2011. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keitz v. Unnamed Sponsors of Cocaine Research Study et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Director of UVA Center for Addiction Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Sponsors of Cocaine Research Study
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UVA Center for Addiction Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia and Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed #1 Male Nurse, UVA Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed #2 Male Doctor, UVA Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed #4, 5, 6 Male E.R. Doctors, UVA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed #3 Female Research Assistant, UVA Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Keitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?