University of Virginia Patent Foundation v. General Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00051
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/6/19. (hnw)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/29/16. (jcj)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/20/15. (jcj)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER limiting the number of claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/10/15. (kld)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 75 Defendant's Motion to Compel; stricken as improperly filed 82 GE's reply brief and denying 83 Motion for Leave to File for UVAPF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/14/15. (jcj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University of Virginia Patent Foundation v. General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?