Thornhill v. Aylor et al
Case Number: 3:2015cv00024
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/18/17. (jcj)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/18/17. (jcj)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/25/17. (hnw)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/19/16. (hnw)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 61 Motion to Strike the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/20/2016. (mab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornhill v. Aylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?