Sines et al v. Kessler et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by a group of Charlottesville, Virginia residents against the organizers of the Charlottesville August, 2017 "Unite the Right" rally in which one counter-protester was murdered.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Hannah Pearce, Jane Doe 2, Seth Wispelwey, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Jane Doe 1, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Chelsea Alvarado and Thomas Baker
Defendant: Matthew Heimbach, Nationalist Front, Augustus Sol Invictus, League of the South, Vanguard America, Loyal White Knights of The Ku Klux Klan, Elliot Kline, Jason Kessler, Robert Azzmador Ray, Andrew Anglin, Jeff Schoep, Christopher Cantwell, Fraternal Order of the Alt-Knights, Richard Spencer, Michael Tubbs, National Socialist Movement, Michael Hill, Moonbase Holdings, LLC, Michael Enoch Peinovich, James Alex Fields, Jr., Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Traditionalist Worker Party, East Coast Knights of The Ku Klux Klan, Matthew Parrott, Elliott Kline, Eli Mosely, David Matthew Parrott and East Coast Knights of The True Invisible Empire
Petitioner: David Duke, James Hart Stern, Denise Y. Lunsford, John I. Hill and John Anthony DiNucci
Case Number: 3:2017cv00072
Filed: October 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1676 ORDER of USCA as to #1639 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeff Schoep, #1640 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell, and #1648 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell: The court consolidates Case Nos. 23-1123 and 23-1125. (skm)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 ORDER of USCA as to #1639 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeff Schoep: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Melina M. Meneguin Layerenza. (skm)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1674 ORDER of USCA as to #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Melina M. Meneguin Layerenza. (skm)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1673 ORDER of USCA as to #1634 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Tubbs, Michael Hill, League of the South: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Melina M. Meneguin Layerenza. (skm)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1672 ORDER granting #1670 Motion for Indicative Ruling. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/26/2023. (Order emailed & mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(jv)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 NOTICE of Change of Address by Yotam Barkai (Barkai, Yotam)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1670 MOTION for Indicative Ruling by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Dunn, Karen) Modified on 6/21/2023 - Docket text was modified to remove referral to Magistrate Judge text. (ca)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 ORDER of USCA as to #1640 and #1648 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Jacqueline Sahlberg. (skm)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1668 ORDER of USCA as to #1639 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeff Schoep: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Jacqueline Sahlberg. (skm)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1667 ORDER of USCA as to #1634 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Tubbs, Michael Hill, League of the South: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Jacqueline Sahlberg. (skm)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 ORDER of USCA as to #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer: The court grants the motion to withdraw from further representation on appeal by attorney Jacqueline Sahlberg. (skm)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 3-3889 re #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer (slt)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1664 ORDER of USCA as to #1639 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeff Schoep; The court grants leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (ams)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1663 RULE 45 MANDATE of USCA as to #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer (jv)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute as to #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer (jv)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re #1649 Notice of Cross Appeal, [AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] (Tolentino, Raymond)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Paper supplemental documents transmitted to 4CCA re #1658 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1657 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1659 Fourth Circuit Record Request - 1 box of sealed exhibits transmitted by Fed Ex. (kld)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 ORDER granting in part #1552 Motion for Attorney Fees and #1553 Bill of Costs; adopting #1655 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/30/2023. (Order emailed and mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(jv)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Paper supplemental documents transmitted to 4CCA re #1658 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1657 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1659 Fourth Circuit Record Request. (jv)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #1658 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1657 Fourth Circuit Record Request, #1659 Fourth Circuit Record Request (tvt)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 Fourth Circuit Record Request, No. 23-1112 Sines v. Spencer , re #1635 Notice of Appeal. (kld)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1658 Fourth Circuit Record Request, No. 23-1123 Sines v. Schoep , re #1639 Notice of Appeal. (kld)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 Fourth Circuit Record Request, No. 23-1125 Sines v. Cantwell , re #1640 Notice of Appeal, #1648 Notice of Appeal. (kld)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1656 ORDER on Discovery Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 03/07/2023. (Order mailed and emailed Pro Se Parties)(dg)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 03/07/2023. (Report and Recommendations mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 300003880 re #1640 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell, #1648 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell (dg)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1654 ORDER of USCA consolidating 23-1119 and 23-1122 with 23-1154 (dg)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1649 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. USCA Case Number 23-1154. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (dg)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #1607 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/13/23. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 ORAL ORDER granting #1608 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Edward Kolenich and Elmer Woodard terminated as to only Defendant Jason Kessler. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/13/23. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1650 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1649 Notice of Cross Appeal, NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #1631 Judgment, by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AVAWDC-4125269. (Kaplan, Roberta)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1648 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1631 Judgment, by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1647 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1640 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Cantwell. USCA Case Number 23-1125. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (dg)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1639 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeff Schoep. USCA Case Number 23-1123. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (dg)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1633 Notice of Appeal filed by Nathan Damigo. USCA Case Number 23-1122. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (dg)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1634 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Tubbs, Michael Hill, League of the South. USCA Case Number 23-1119. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (slt)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1643 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #1635 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Spencer. USCA Case Number 23-1112. Case Manager: Marcy E. Beall. (dg)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1642 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1640 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1639 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1640 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1631 Judgment, by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jeff Schoep. (ReBrook, William)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1638 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1634 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1633 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #1635 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (dg)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1634 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AVAWDC-4118322. (Jones, Bryan)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1633 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1623, 1629, and as to #1631 Judgment, by Nathan Damigo. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AVAWDC-4117487. (Kolenich, James)
January 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #1623 Order by Richard Spencer. (Original Notice filed with incorrect docket event by Pro Se Defendant at dkt #1632 ) (dg)
January 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 NOTICE by Richard Spencer (Spencer, Richard)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs on Counts III, IV, V, and VI, a MISTRIAL is declared on Counts I and II, and this case is DISMISSED from the Courts active docket. Plaintiffs are further entitled to post-judgment interest under 28 U.S.C. 1961. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/09/2023. (Attachments: #1 Jury Verdict) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1630 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Dkt. 1615) Defendant Cantwell's letter filed on July 12, 2022, the Court finds Plaintiffs' position well-founded. This Court previously concluded that the Magistrate Judge's briefing schedule on the parties' post-trial motions afforded all parties, including Cantwell, "a full and fair opportunity to brief their post-trial arguments and respond to the opposing parties' arguments." Dkt. 1621 at 2. The Court concluded there was no error in the Magistrate Judge's briefing schedule. Id. Cantwell's letter, raising an argument that just "occurred to him recently," Dkt. 1614, effectively attempts to supplement his post-trial briefing well after the deadline, which is untimely and improper, especially without moving for leave to file out of time. In addition, Cantwell's arguments raised therein are "nonsensical" and little more than gratuitous abusive language to Plaintiffs, lacking in any connection to the issues in the case. See Dkt. 1615. The letter will be stricken as untimely, immaterial and vexatious. Plaintiffs' motion is granted. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/06/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(dg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1629 Amended ORDER Affirming the Jury Verdict. Order amended to correct clerical error and reflect that dkt #1549 was also denied. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/06/2023. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg) Modified on 1/6/2023 to correct docket text (dg).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1554 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/06/2023. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1627 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/06/2023. (Opinion mailed and emailed Pro Se Parties)(dg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1626 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nationalist Front (Document mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties) (dg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1625 ORAL ORDER: Upon consideration of this Court's prior order adopting the Magistrate Judge's report & recommendation that Defendant Nationalist Front be found in default, Dkt. 1136, and further upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default judgment, Dkt 1554, and noting there being no response thereto from Defendant Nationalist Front, finding it just and proper to do so and all prerequisites for entry of default having been satisfied, the Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter in default Defendant Nationalist Front. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/06/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties )(dg)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees to U.S. Magistrate for Reports & Recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 01/05/2023. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1623 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court AFFIRMS THE JURY VERDICT findings of Defendants' liability, and as to the jury's compensatory damages award; except that the Court will REDUCE the jury's punitive damages award to $350,000, as compelled by the Virginia statutory cap on punitive damages. The jury's verdict will be AFFIRMED in all other respects. Accordingly, Defendants' post-trial motions will be GRANTED IN PART, only insofar as they sought reduction of the punitive damages award in accordance with Virginia's statutory cap on punitive damages, but DENIED IN PART in all other respects. See Dkts. #1488 , #1522 , 1536, #1548 , #1550 , #1551 , #1556 , and 1557. The Court will DENY those motions which did not argue that the punitive damages award should be reduced in accordance with Virginia's statutory cap on punitive damages. Dkts. #1542 and #1543 . The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. #1595 as an outstanding motion and rename it as a reply in further support of Spencer's post-trial motion (Dkt. #1550 ). It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on December 30, 2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(ca)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1622 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on December 30, 2022. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(ca)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER denying #1546 Pro Se LETTER MOTION Seeking Review of Magistrate Judge Order Dkt. 1531 by District Judge, and Seeking Other Relief; denying #1602 Pro Se Defendant's Appeal/MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Decision re Dkt. 1584 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying #1609 Pro Se APPEAL/MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Dkt. 1606 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; and denying #1612 Pro Se APPEAL/MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Dkt. 1598 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Christopher Cantwell. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on December 30, 2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(ca)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 Pro Se Letter of July 26, 2022 from Defendant Cantwell to the Court Regarding Government Interference in This Litigation (hnw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1619 Pro Se Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' #1615 MOTION to Strike #1614 Letter/Request . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1618 Sworn Declaration Dated July 25, 2022 by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 Pro Se Sworn Declaration Regarding CMU Prohibition of Media Contacts by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance) (Seidita, Gemma)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 MOTION to Strike #1614 Letter/Request by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1614 STRICKEN ON 01/06/2023 PURSUANT TO ORDER 1630 - Letter - July 3, 2022 Letter from Defendant Cantwell to the Court by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw) Modified on 1/6/2023 (dg).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1613 Sworn Declaration dated 6/10/22 by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1612 Pro Se APPEAL/MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's 1598 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1611 Pro se Sworn Declaration dated 6/14/2022 by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1610 Pro Se Response to #1605 Reply to Response to Motion . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 Pro Se APPEAL/MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's 1606 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1608 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Corrected Certificate of Service by Jason Kessler. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kolenich, James)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1607 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jason Kessler. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kolenich, James)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1606 ORAL ORDER granting #1604 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant Cantwell to file a reply to Plaintiffs' response briefs, ECF Nos. 1572, 1574, is extended to June 10, 2022. This extension will allow Cantwell more than three weeks from the date he alleges he received the second of Plaintiffs' opposition briefs. No additional extension will be allowed for Cantwell to file either reply brief. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/31/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(JCH)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Kaplan, Roberta)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1604 Pro se MOTION for Extension of Time for 7 months to File Response/Reply as to #1572 Opposition by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1603 Declaration by Christopher Cantwell Dated 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1600 ORAL ORDER granting #1599 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Emily Carrie Cole terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/17/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 Pro Se Defendant's Appeal/ MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate's Decision re #1584 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1601 Pro Se Defendant's Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1599 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Emily C. Cole by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Tenzer, Gabrielle)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 ORAL ORDER denying #1597 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The court previously granted Defendant Cantwell an extension to file a reply to Plaintiffs' omnibus brief in opposition. In his latest filing, Cantwell has not shown good cause for a further extension to file his reply brief. Accordingly, his motion is denied. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/13/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(JCH)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 Pro se MOTION for 8 months to reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition, or in the alternative, said reply by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 Pro Se Declaration by Christopher Cantwell "Dated 4/28/2022" (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 REPLY in further support re #1550 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Richard Spencer. (Spencer, Richard) Modified on 12/30/2022 - Motion terminated and docket text modified to reflect this filing as a Reply, as directed in #1623 ORDER. (ca)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1594 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1542 MOTION to Alter Judgment . filed by Jeff Schoep. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(ReBrook, William)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1593 Reply re #1572 Response,,, . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1592 Reply re #1574 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition,, . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #1588 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document; finding as moot #1588 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/27/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(JCH)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORAL ORDER granting #1589 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No later than May 31, 2022, Plaintiffs shall file any reply to Defendants' oppositions to Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees, ECF No. 1552, and Plaintiffs' bill of costs, ECF No. 1553. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/27/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(JCH)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1589 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #1553 Bill of Costs Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #1553 Bill of Costs by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kaplan, Roberta)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORAL ORDER granting #1586 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allegra Flamm terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/26/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Flamm, Allegra)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 Letter re Post-Trial Filing Deadlines by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Kaplan, Roberta)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER granting in part #1578 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting in part #1581 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting Spencer's #1582 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for all Defendants to file replies to Plaintiffs' Omnibus response brief is extended to May 5, 2022. Additionally, the Court finds good cause because of the apparent mail delay in delivery of the motions to Cantwell and GRANTS Cantwell's motions, ECF Nos. 1578, 1581, but for a shorter period than the excessively lengthy period that Cantwell requested. Cantwell shall respond to Plaintiffs motion for attorneys' fees and bill of costs by May 23, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/21/2022. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 Response re #1582 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Omnibus Oppositions to Defendants Rule 50(b) and Rule 59(a) Post-trial Motions . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Kaplan, Roberta)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Omnibus Oppositions to Defendants Rule 50(b) and Rule 59(a) Post-trial Motions by Richard Spencer. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Spencer, Richard)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 ORAL ORDER granting #1576 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas Butto terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/18/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Nicholas Butto by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Butto, Nicholas)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time for 9 months to File Response/Reply as to #1553 Bill of Costs by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 Pro Se 3rd Supplement to #1488 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1579 Pro se Sworn Declaration dated 3/24/2022 by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time for 9 months to File Response/Reply as to #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw) Modified on 4/18/2022 to correct filing date (hnw).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Joshua)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #1550 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , #1488 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial, #1522 MOTION for Directed Verdict and for other Relief pursuant to FRCP 50 and 59, #1549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' RULE 50(b) and RULE 59(a) POST-TRIAL MOTIONS]. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Dunn, Karen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1573 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by James Alex Fields, Jr. (Campbell, David)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 Response re #1550 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , #1551 MOTION to Alter Judgment - Remittitur, #1536 Additional Evidence, #1488 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial, #1522 MOTION for Directed Verdict and for other Relief pursuant to FRCP 50 and 59, #1542 MOTION to Alter Judgment , #1555 Notice (Other), #1548 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION MOTION for New Trial , #1543 MOTION to Alter Judgment , #1556 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Reduction of Punitive Damages in Accord with Statutory and Constitutional Limitations), #1557 Additional Evidence . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Kaplan, Roberta)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Jones, Bryan)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Declaration in Support)(Kolenich, James)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1569 ORAL ORDER granting #1568 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' omnibus response to Defendants' post-trial motions may exceed the page limit set forth in the scheduling order and may be not more than 55 pages. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/13/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(JCH)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Omnibus Response to Defendants' Rule 50 and Rule 59 Post-Trial Motions by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Dunn, Karen)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1567 ORAL ORDER; Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition post-trial briefs, and noting consent of opposing counsel and no objections thereto having been filed, the Court finds good cause shown to grant the motion. Dkt. 1566. The Court's post-trial briefing scheduling order (Dkt. 1531) is modified to that extent, such that opposition memoranda will now be due by April 13, 2022, and a comparable extension be afforded for reply memoranda such that they shall be due by April 27, 2022. It is so ORDERED Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/6/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties(hnw)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Smith, Joshua)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER ADOPTING #1485 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety, Granting in Part for #985 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Hannah Pearce, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, #1059 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Thomas Baker, to the extent recommended in the R & R. Plaintiffs are AWARDED a total of $18,567.50 in reasonable attorney's fees from Defendant Robert Azzmador Ray.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/30/22. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1564 Docket entry 1564-non-disclosure order (previous) deleted-docketed to wrong case. (hnw)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORAL ORDER granting #1562 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Makiko Hiromi terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/25/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Makiko Hiromi by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Hiromi, Makiko)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1561 Pro Se Declaration dated 3/7/2022 by Christopher Cantwell (hnw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2022: #1 Declaration) (hnw).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (14 calendar days Service) by James Loeffler for Jury Trial held on 10/25/2021 through 11/23/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1559 ORAL ORDER granting #1544 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan R. Kay terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/11/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 ORAL ORDER granting #1539 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Daniel White terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/11/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 Pro Se Second Supplement re #1488 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial and/or Remittitur by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1556 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Reduction of Punitive Damages in Accord with Statutory and Constitutional Limitations) by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. (Smith, Joshua)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler re #1522 Supplement to Defendants' Post Trial Motions (Kolenich, James)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Andrew Anglin, Augustus Sol Invictus, East Coast Knights of The Ku Klux Klan, Fraternal Order of the Alt-Knights, Loyal White Knights of The Ku Klux Klan, Moonbase Holdings, LLC, Nationalist Front by Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, John Doe, Marissa Blair. (Mills, David)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 BILL OF COSTS in the amount of $1,812,439.30; by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Kaplan, Roberta)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1552 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support Yotam Barkai, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Declaration in Support Karen Dunn, #25 Exhibit A, #26 Declaration in Support Alan Levine, #27 Exhibit A, #28 Declaration in Support Jessica Phillips, #29 Exhibit A, #30 Declaration in Support David Dinielli)(Kaplan, Roberta)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 MOTION to Alter Judgment - Remittitur by James Alex Fields, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Campbell, David)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 First MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Richard Spencer. (Spencer, Richard)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Jones, Bryan)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1548 MOTION to Alter Judgment , MOTION to Amend/Correct , MOTION , MOTION for New Trial by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Jones, Bryan) Modified on 4/12/2022 motion no longer referred to Judge Hoppe (dg).
March 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1540 Transcript Request, (lmb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (3 Days Service) re #1540 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 3/7/2022. (lmb)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kay, Jonathan)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 MOTION to Alter Judgment by National Socialist Movement. (ReBrook, William)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1542 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Jeff Schoep. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ReBrook, William)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 Pro Se LETTER MOTION Seeking Review of Magistrate Judge Order Docket 1531 by District Judge, and Seeking Other Relief by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 Pro se Letter of 2/15/2022 from Defendant Cantwell to the Court regarding electronic filing and deadlines by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3 Day Service) by Richard Spencer for 3:17-cv-00072-NKM-JCH held on 10/25/21-11/23/21 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blaire before Judge Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Spencer, Richard)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (White, Benjamin)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 Pro se Declaration by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1537 Pro Se Declaration by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hnw)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1536 Pro se Supplement to #1488 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law MOTION for New Trial and/or Remittitur by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1533 Transcript Request, (lmb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1534 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #1533 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 3/11/2022. (lmb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Patricia Roberts-Miller for Opening statement of Richard Spencer 10/28/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 Mail Returned as Undeliverable : regarding Richard Spencer; (No forwarding address given-Box Closed) all from May 2021. Mr. Spencer having been approved for e-filing and setting up his account in this time frame. (hnw)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1528 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend all Post Trial Deadlines by 12 Months. The deadlines provided in the Court's Order of January 10, 2022, ECF No. 1523, are hereby MODIFIED as follows: March 9, 2022, Motions and supporting memoranda due; April 6, 2022 Opposition memoranda due; April 20, 2022 Reply memoranda due, and further such relief as set forth in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/2/22. (hnw)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1528 MOTION for Extension of Time to File . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Kaplan, Roberta)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 Pro Se Sworn Declaration of January 25, 2022 with exhibits by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 Pro Se MOTION for Extend all Post Trial Deadlines by 12 Months by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 Letter / Petition received on behalf of Jeff Schoep by non party filer ( Daryl Davis ) (hnw)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 Transcript Copy Delivered on 12/29/2021 re #1498 Transcript Request,, (lmb)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1525 Financial arrangements made on 12/28/2021 (Copy) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #1498 Transcript Request,, Transcript due by 2/14/2022. (lmb)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 Pro se Letter of January 11th, 2022 by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 ORDER; This matter is before the Court on Defendant Christopher Cantwell's pro se"Motion to Extend Post Trial Deadlines by 60 Days and Provide Documents," ECF No. 1508. Plaintiffs do not oppose giving all parties additional time to complete post-trial briefing. ECF No. 1509. Accordingly, the deadlines provided in the post-trial Scheduling Order, ECF No. 1496, are hereby MODIFIED as follows: February 7, 2022 - Motions and supporting memoranda due; March 7, 2022 - Opposition memoranda due; March 21, 2022 - Reply memoranda due; Any party that filed a post-trial motion and supporting memorandum on or before January 7, 2022, may, but is not required to, supplement its filing by the extended deadline. Defendant Cantwell's motion, ECF No. 1508, is GRANTED in part to the extent consistent with this Order and DENIED without prejudice in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/10/2022. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 MOTION for Directed Verdict and for other Relief pursuant to FRCP 50 and 59 by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 Pro se Sworn Declaration of 1/5/22 Regarding Conditions at USP Marion's CMU by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 Pro Se Letter of January 5, 2022 to the Court by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 ORAL ORDER granting #1518 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Low Bloch terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/4/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Bloch, Michael)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1515 Transcript Request, (lmb)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1515 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 1/3/2022. (lmb)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Jeff Schoep for Jury Trial held on 11/12/21 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (ReBrook, William)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Jeff Schoep for Jury Trial held on 11/12/21 & 11/15/21 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (ReBrook, William) Amended transcript request filed at #1515 . Modified on 1/4/2022 (sad).
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1513 ORAL NOTICE. The Court intends to extend by 30 days each deadline in the Posttrial Scheduling Order, ECF No. 1496, entered on December 8, 2021. An appropriate written order will follow. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Notice to counsel of record, pro se parties, and Defendant Cantwell's counselor at USP Marion. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 Pro se Sworn Declaration Regarding Transport and Quarantine dated 12/28/2021 by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1511 Pro se Objections by Defendant Christopher Cantwell re 1497 Scheduling Order (hnw)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1510 Pro se Declaration of December 18th by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 Response re #1508 MOTION for Extension of Time to File . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 Pro se MOTION for Extension of Post Trial Deadlines by 60 days and to Provide Documents with attached Declaration by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Cantwell to Inmate #00991-509, USP Marion, 4500 Prison Road, P.O. Box 2000, Marion IL 62959 (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER denying as moot #1502 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1505 ORAL ORDER granting #1495 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Agbeko Petty terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/21/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 ORAL ORDER granting #1484 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Giovanni Sanchez terminated. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/21/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 Pro Se Sworn Declaration by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 Pro Se MOTION to Compel the Central Virginia Regional Jail to Provide Law Library Access by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (dg)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 Letter dated December 13th by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: regarding Christopher Cantwell; (No forwarding address given) Mail was forwarded from USP Marion to Mr. Cantwell at CVRJ. CVRJ marked mail return to sender, Not deliverable as addressed. USMS advised Mr. Cantwell will be on way back to USP Marion in next day or two. (hnw)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 Pro Se Letter of December 9th by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Deborah Baker for Jury Trial held on 10/25/2021-11/30/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad) Requestor contacted by CR and transcript request is for Jury Trial held on 10/28/2021, 11/18/2021, and 11/23/2021. Modified on 1/14/2022 (sad).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1497 ORAL ORDER - Upon inquiry from counsel for Plaintiffs concerning their deadline to respond to Defendant Cantwell's motion for judgment as a matter of law (Dkt. 1488), the Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file any response to Cantwell's motion no later than February 7, 2022, the deadline provided by this Courts scheduling order (Dkt. 1496) for parties to file oppositions to any post-trial motions. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/10/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 SCHEDULING ORDER on Post Trial Motions. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/8/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties )(hnw)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Petty, Agbeko)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1494 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1492 Transcript Request, (lmb)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (3 Days Service) re #1492 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 12/11/2021. (lmb) Correction made to due date. Modified on 12/8/2021 (sad).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3 Day Service) By Matthew Hellman and Charlotte Cooper for Jury Trial held on 11/11/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1487 Transcript Request, (lmb)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #1487 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 1/6/2022. (lmb)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 Pro se Sworn Declaration by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 Pro Se MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, MOTION for New Trial and/or Remittitur by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by Nora Neus for Jury Trial - hearings on days 5, 6, 8, 12, 13, and 15 held on 10/29/2021, 11/1/2021, 11/3/2021, 11/9/2021, 11/10/2021, and 11/12/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1486 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part #929 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/01/2021. (Opinion and Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #985 MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Hannah Pearce, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, #1059 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Thomas Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/01/2021. (Report & Recommendations mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Sanchez, Giovanni)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 Jury Questions: Sealed Jury Questions and Attachment #1 Jury Questions (Unsealed except pre-deliberation notes w/ personal information and protected by Dkts. 1204, 1471). (Entered at direction from Chambers: 3/9/2022) (hnw).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1359 Transcript Request, Transcript copies delivered from October 28, 2021 through November 23, 2021 (lmb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1402 Transcript Request, Transcript copies delivered for October 29, 2021 through November 23, 2021 (lmb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1225 Transcript Request, for October 25, 2021 through November 23, 2021 (lmb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 22 held on 11/23/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2022. (lmb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 Jury Verdict.(hnw)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 Witness List for trial Oct 25-Nov 23, 2021.(hnw)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 Exhibit List for Trial Oct 25-Nov 23, 2021. Due to the volume, size, audio and visual nature of the exhibits in this case, the exhibits are stored on a Thumb Drive located in the clerk's office (hnw)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TWENTY-TWO held on 11/23/2021. Jury returns with verdict. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1474 ORAL ORDER; Upon consideration of a request from news organizations granted Courthouse press credentials for access of two pool reporters to the Courtroom and a courtroom sketch artist, for when the jury returns any verdict, the Court grants such request. Such pool reporters shall be chosen by the news organizations themselves. The courtroom sketch artist has agreed that no jurors will be drawn or depicted. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/23/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TWENTY-ONE held on 11/22/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 21 held on 11/22/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2022. (lmb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 ORAL ORDER that the Court's prior order empaneling a semi-anonymous jury, Dkt. 1204, be continued indefinitely. The Court had found and continues to find that the requirements set out in United States v. Dinkins, 691 F.3d 358, 372 (4th Cir. 2012), have been met. First, there is strong reason to conclude that the jury needs protection from interference or harm, given the highly publicized nature of this trial. Second, the Court has taken reasonable safeguards to minimize the risk that the parties' rights will be infringed, because the Court has still permitted the parties and their counseljust not the general publicaccess to the jury's identifying information. The Court has overruled Defendant Cantwell's objection to its prior order empaneling a semi-anonymous jury, Dkt. 1296; see also Dkt. 1290 at 20-21 (Final Pretrial Hr'g Tr.). The parties and their counsel are ordered not to disclose any personally identifying information pertaining to any juror in this case, and are ordered to continue to comply with their obligations in Dkt. 1204.. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/22/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 Letter re Parrott Testimony by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - 20 held on 11/19/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2022. (lmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TWENTY held on 11/19/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1460 Transcript Request, (lmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1466 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1460 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/19/2021. (lmb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 ORDER Regarding Permissive Adverse Inference Jury Instruction. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/19/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORAL ORDER; The Court considered the Rule 50 motions raised by Defendants Cantwell and Spencer raised in argument on November 16, 2021, and in Defendant Spencer's subsequently-filed Rule 50 motion (Dkt. 1451). For the reasons set forth on the record, the Court concluded that neither Defendant Cantwell's nor Spencer's motion had established that a reasonable jury would not have a legally sufficient evidentiary basis to find for the Plaintiffs on the issues raised. Rather, Plaintiffs' evidence had raised a jury issue whether Defendants Cantwell and Spencer had conspired to engage in racially motivated violence. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a)(1); see also Dkt. 1443 (Nov. 16, 2021 Hr'g Tr.) at 46-49. The Court further denies Defendant Cantwell's motion for judgment as a matter of law under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) to the extent that his motion re-incorporates already resolved issues. Mr. Cantwell reasserted his claim that "Antifa" is not a protected class under 42 U.S.C. 1985(3), which he first raised at Dkt. 1066, and his claim that Plaintiffs' claims arose "ex turpi causa" and thus that they are barred "in pari delicto," which he first raised at Dkt. 1090. The Court has already denied both of those claims at Dkt. 1344. The Court has not since changed that holding. In addition, these motions appear to ask the Court rule against Plaintiffs based upon assertions by Cantwell that are either contrary to the evidence at trial, or as would require the Court to construe the evidence in a light most favorable to Cantwell, and disregarding contrary evidence or facts, or make credibility determinations in favor of Cantwellnone of which the Court can do on a Rule 50 motion. Therefore, the Court DENIES Cantwell's motion for judgment as a matter of law with respect to his already-asserted dispositive claims as well. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/19/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and email to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORAL ORDER; The Court considered the written Rule 50 motions raised by Defendants League of the South, Michael Hill, and Michael Tubbs (Dt. 1441), Defendants Kessler, Damigo, and Identity Evropa (Dkt. 1455), and Defendant Jeff Schoep (Dkt. 1444), and those raised in argument on November 16 and 17, 2021. For the reasons set forth on the record and as so stated herein, the Court has concluded that none of the movants established that a reasonable jury would not have a legally sufficient evidentiary basis to find for the Plaintiffs on the issues so raised. Rather, the evidence presented raised a triable issue for the jury on the issue whether the movant Defendants had conspired to commit racially-motivated violence at the Unite the Right rally on August 11 and 12, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a)(1); see also Dkt. 1454 (Nov. 17, 2021 Hr'g) at 104-110; Dkt. 1443 (Nov. 16, 2021 Hrg Tr.) at 46-49 Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/19/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(Corrected to remove reference to Cantwell motion) (hnw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM.(hnw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2021: #1 Instruction #39) (hnw). Page added, inadvertently omitted from docket entry, having been read into the record
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Daniel Barnes for Jury Trial held on 11/18/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY NINETEEN held on 11/18/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 19 held on 11/18/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (lmb)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 Jury Instructions.(hnw)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY EIGHTEEN held on 11/17/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 18 held on 11/17/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2022. (lmb)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 ORAL ORDER; On October 29, 2021, the Court denied without prejudice Plaintiffs' request for a jury instruction explaining that Defendant James Fields was precluded from testifying on his own behalf by court sanction. Dkt. 1358. On November 17, 2021, the Plaintiffs renewed their request for this instruction, arguing that the jury was informed of the sanctions imposed against other defendants and the jury was entitled to hear the specific sanction imposed as to Fields. After hearing argument, the Court found it necessary and appropriate to grant Plaintiffs' request so as to inform the jury concerning the fuller circumstances that precluded James Fields' testimony and to mitigate any risk of juror confusion on the issue. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/17/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 Pro se MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Richard Spencer. (hnw)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 Letter re Revised Proposed Verdict Form by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Verdict Form, #2 Redline of Revised Proposed Verdict Form)(Bloch, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 NOTICE of Anticipated General Closing Jury Instructions (hnw)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 ORAL ORDER; Upon notice from Plaintiffs' counsel requesting that, for the closing statements only, the number of persons on Plaintiffs' side be increased from nine to, at a maximum, fourteen, to accommodate any Plaintiffs who wished to view the closing statement, and finding good cause shown, the Court will grant the request. See Dkt. 1277 (Oral Order granting similar request for opening statement). Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/17/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions (Kolenich, James)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1445 Letter re Recalling Witnesses Romero and Willis by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Jeff Schoep. (ReBrook, William)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORAL Pro Se MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1447 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY SEVENTEEN held on 11/16/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 17 held on 11/16/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022. (lmb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions (Kolenich, James)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Jones, Bryan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 Letter Deandre Harris video by Michael Tubbs, Michael Hill, League of the South (Jones, Bryan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1439 Letter re Revised Proposed Jury Instructions by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Redline - Revised Proposed Jury Instructions)(Bloch, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 Letter re UVA 2017 Fire Policies by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bloch, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1437 ORDER regarding Facts Deemed Found re: Memorandum Opinion, #1106 , Order on Motion for Sanctions #910 , Letter, #1310 filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/16/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 Letter to preclude defense exhibit and related testimony by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Levine, Alan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1433 Letter re: Defendant Richard Spencer calling Undisclosed Witness by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Mills, David)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 Letter re Defendant Christopher Cantwell re-calling Plaintiffs by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY SIXTEEN held on 11/15/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 NOTICE of Anticipated Modified Instruction to the Jury re: Sanctions (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1431 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 16 held on 11/15/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022. (lmb) Main Document 1431 replaced with corrections made on 11/19/2021(sad).
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 Letter re: Defendant Schoep's Anticipated Testimony Regarding His Current Beliefs by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Isaacson, William)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY FIFTEEN held on 11/12/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 15 held on 11/12/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/3/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2022. (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 Letter re Plaintiffs' Witness Order and Case in Chief by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1423 Transcript Request, (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1423 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/15/2021. (lmb)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY FOURTEEN held on 11/12/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Hourly Service) by Tricia McKinney for Jury Trial proceeding held on 11/1/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 14 held on 11/11/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2022. (lmb)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 Letter re Proposed Jury Instruction by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY THIRTEEN held on 11/10/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 13 held on 11/10/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 12/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2022. (lmb)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 Pro se Objections by Defendant Christopher Cantwell re #1406 Letter, (hnw)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 ORAL ORDER This matter is before the Court on a letter filed by Joshua Smith, Esq., counsel of record for Defendants Matthew Heimbach, David Matthew Parrott, and Traditionalist Worker Party. ECF No. 1395. Mr. Smith seeks monetary sanctions against Plaintiffs' counsel for allegedly violating my Settlement Conference Order directing the parties and their lead counsel to appear before me via videoconference on August 20, 2021, "for the purpose of conducting discussions, in good faith, towards a compromise resolution of this case." ECF No. 989. This Order contained my standard language cautioning all parties and attorneys that if a party "fails to negotiate in good faith at the settlement conference," then I "may assess against the non-complying party, attorney, or both, a monetary sanction, which may include the fees and expenses incurred by the other parties in attending the settlement conference." Id. In support of his request for monetary sanctions, Mr. Smith cites a recent National Law Journal article in which Plaintiffs counsel Michael Bloch, Esq., recalled discussing this litigation with co-counsel Roberta Kaplan, Esq., while he was interviewing with her law firm in late 2018. Mr. Bloch asked Ms. Kaplan "whether she was confident the case was going to go to trial and wouldnt settle." He recalled that Ms. Kaplan responded with "a powerful look and was like, 'We dont settle with Nazis.'" Mr. Bloch has been one of Plaintiffs' lead attorneys since February 6, 2019. ECF No. 404. "A request for a court order must be made by motion," Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(b)(1), and not by letter or other paper. See W.D. Va. Civ. R. 11(c)(1). Accordingly, Mr. Smiths request is improper and could be denied on those procedural grounds alone. On the merits, Ms. Kaplan's comment to Mr. Bloch during a job interview in late 2018 preceded the settlement conference by nearly three years, which is too remote to establish any ill intent. More importantly, Plaintiffs' counsel spent considerable time negotiating with opposing counsel and made good-faith offers to resolve the matters at issue both before and during the day-long settlement conference on August 20, 2021. Nothing during the settlement conference or in the period leading up to it suggests that Plaintiffs counsel violated the court's order. Accordingly, Mr. Smith's requested relief, ECF No. 1395, is DENIED.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/10/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TWELVE held on 11/9/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1412 Transcript Request, (lmb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1412 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/10/2021. (lmb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 12 held on 11/09/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2022. (lmb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) for Jury Trial held on 11/8/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad) Main Document 1412 replaced on 11/9/2021 with corrected PDF (sad).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 Letter regarding consent to streamline trial by Christopher Cantwell (hnw) Documents extra pages/blank pages cleaned up
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY ELEVEN held on 11/8/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 Letter Reply re: Violation by Plaintiffs' Counsel of the Court's July 9, 2021 Settlement Conference Order (ECF No. 989) by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (Smith, Joshua)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 11 held on 11/8/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2022. (lmb)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 Letter re Fed. R. Evid. 703 and Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2777 by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bloch, Michael)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 Financial arrangements made on 10/28/2021 (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1335 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/29/2021. (lmb)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 Transcript Copy Delivered for 10/29/21, 11/1/21, 11/2/21, 11/3/21, 11/4/21 and 11/5/21 re #1402 Transcript Request, (lmb)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1402 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/9/2021. (lmb)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Integrity First for America for Jury Trial held on 10/29/2021 through duration of trial reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TEN held on 11/5/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 10 held on 11/5/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2022. (lmb)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 Jury List.(hnw)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 Letter Response to November 4, 2021 Letter from Joshua Smith (ECF No. 1395) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 Letter notifying the Court of Plaintiffs' efforts to streamline trial by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Dunn, Karen)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 9 held on 11/04/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2022. (lmb) Main Document 1397 replaced on 11/5/2021. Correction made to exhibit numbers. (sad)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY NINE held on 11/4/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 Letter re: Violation by Plaintiffs' Counsel of the Court's July 9, 2021 Settlement Conference Order (ECF No. 989) by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Joshua)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY EIGHT held on 11/3/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 8 held on 11/03/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2022. (lmb)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler re #1381 Defendants Objections and Counter Designations regarding deposition of Elliott Kline (Kolenich, James)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY SEVEN held on 11/2/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1386 Transcript Request, (lmb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 7 held on 11/2/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2022. (lmb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1386 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/3/2021. (lmb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 Letter concerning depositions of Dillon Hopper by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Levine, Alan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party for Sines v. Kessler held on 11/2/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Smith, Joshua) Main Document 1386 replaced with flattened PDF on 11/2/2021. NEF regenerated. (sad).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 ORDER regarding Proposed Pretrial Order - Moon #1258 filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. Upon consideration of certain parties' proposed integrated pretrial order, the Court states that it has resolved all outstanding motions identified therein as requiring a resolution, Dkt. 1258 at 2-5, and the integrated pretrial order is hereby ADOPTED as to those parties.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/2/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 Letter re Deposition of Samantha Froelich by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bloch, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY SIX held on 11/1/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial, Day 6 held on 11/1/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2022. (lmb)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 Deposition Designation by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey.(Mills, David)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1374 Transcript Request, (lmb)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury trial - Day 5 held on 10/29/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022. (lmb) Main Document 1378 replaced on 11/1/2021 with correction made to attorney names. (sad)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY FIVE held on 10/29/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw) (Main Document 1376 replaced on 11/1/2021 to correct typographical error) (hnw).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1374 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/1/2021. (lmb)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party for Trial - Days 4 & 5 held on 10/28/21, 10/29/21 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Smith, Joshua) Main Document 1374 replaced with flattened PDF on 11/1/2021 (sad).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 Deposition Designation by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party.(Smith, Joshua)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORAL ORDER; Upon consideration of a request from news organizations granted Courthouse press credentials for a modified procedure for a pool reporter to be afforded Courtroom access, the Court hereby finds good cause shown and GRANTS the request. The daily pool reporter in the Courtroom designated by the organizations may be switched during lunch break. Any pool reporter in the Courtroom shall abide by all prior requirements. The Courts orders at Dkt. 1146, 1202, and 1337 are modified in this respect.. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/29/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORAL ORDER denying as moot Defendant Cantwell's motions to extend trial schedule and pretrial dates at Dkt. 1099, 1162, and 1262. On Monday, October 25, Defendant Cantwell objected to Plaintiffs' motion to sever his case, and consented to proceed with the trial as scheduled. Dkt. 1317 at 7. Therefore, the Court will deny his prior motions to extend the pretrial and trial dates as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/29/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 Letter regarding Limiting Jury Instruction by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mills, David)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 Letter re: Opening Statements and Curative Jury Instructions by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curative Jury Instructions)(Dunn, Karen)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 Transcript Copy Delivered 10/28/21 - Day 4 of jury trial re #1225 Transcript Request, (lmb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury trial - Day 4 held on 10/28/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2022. (lmb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re 1332 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/29/2021. (lmb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1359 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/20/2021. (lmb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 Financial arrangements made on 10/27/21 (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1322 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/28/2021. (lmb)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY FOUR held on 10/28/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORAL ORDER. This matter is before the Court on two discovery motions filed by pro se Defendant Christopher Cantwell. ECF Nos. 1096, 1098. Citing Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Cantwell seeks significant evidentiary sanctions against Plaintiffs for their "failure to timely disclose the 'Discord Production,'" ECF No. 1098, and Thomas Baker's initial disclosures, ECF No. 1096. Cantwell states that he received this discovery in August and September 2021. Plaintiffs respond that most of their evidence from Discord was provided to Cantwell in three separate productions on November 30, 2018, February 7, 2019, and August 19, 2019, while he was still represented by counsel. See ECF No. 1108. A smaller fourth production, provided to represented defendants in early February 2020, could not be produced directly to Cantwell under the terms of the stipulated protective order because he was proceeding pro se. Id. (citing ECF No. 167). Plaintiffs notified Cantwell of this fact by letter sent on February 5, 2020. Id. Plaintiffs further explain that Cantwell was not served with Thomas Baker's initial disclosures in June 2020, id., due to an inadvertent clerical mistake, see Order of May 14, 2021 (denying Cantwell's "motion to sanction Plaintiffs for their occasional failure to properly serve him with documents [while]... he has been incarcerated, ECF No. 939"), ECF No. 951. Cantwell received the disclosures more than a month before trial. Accordingly, the Court FINDS that Plaintiffs did not "fail[] to timely disclose the 'Discord Production,'" and that the delay in Cantwell receiving Thomas Baker's initial disclosures is harmless. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c)(1); Order of May 14, 2021, at 2 ("Cantwell has had an opportunity to respond to those papers and has not suffered any prejudice because of Plaintiffs' mistake."). Cantwell's motion for sanctions, ECF Nos. 1096, 1098, are hereby DENIED. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 ORAL ORDER; Defendant Christopher Cantwell's unopposed motion for leave to supplement his exhibit list and disclose transcript is granted, Dkt. 1126, subject to any admissibility objections as may be raised at trial. The attached transcript shall be filed under seal but available to the parties, subject to the Court's further consideration of any confidentiality issues. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) A, Chris Gajilan for Jury Trial held on 10/28/2021 through the duration of the trial reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 ORDER denying without prejudice #1266 Motion to modify Magistrate Judge Hoppe's Sanctions Order Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 ORAL ORDER DENYING Defendant Cantwell's Motion for Leave to File Instanter at Dkt. 1062. Cantwell seeks leave to file untimely objections to the Memorandum Opinion & Order of Judge Hoppe, Dkt. 982, which recommended that evidentiary sanctions be entered against Defendants Kline, Vanguard America, and Nationalist Socialist Movement. Even as a pro se litigant, Cantwell still must abide by the Court's procedural deadlines. Judge Hoppe's order was mailed to Cantwell at USP Marion, and he was aware of the deadline to object to the recommendations. See Skt. 982. There is no indication on the docket that he did not receive it. Regardless, the Court intends to give the jury a limiting instruction specifying that sanctions are only applicable as against sanctioned parties and Plaintiffs' retain the burden of proof with respect to each Defendant individually. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORAL ORDER. This matter is before the Court on pro se Defendant Christopher Cantwell's motion to compel his Co-Defendants to produce their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and to compel Plaintiffs to produce paper copies of Cantwell's deposition transcript and of all filings and discovery previously provided in electronic format. ECF No. 1084. The motion is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Cantwell's request for his co-defendants to produce paper copies of their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures is granted with respect to Defendants who have appeared for the jury trial in this case. Counsel for these Defendants shall produce one paper copy of their clients or clients Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures to Cantwell on Thursday, October 28, 2021. Cantwell's motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(f)(3). Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORAL ORDER; The Court DENIES without prejudice as not yet ripe the portion of Defendant Tubbs' motion at Dkt. 1147 pertaining to his felony conviction for the reasons stated on the record at the pretrial conference on Oct. 20, 2021. See Dkt. 1273 at 46-48. The Court will take up the issue if or when Plaintiffs cross-examine Tubbs at trial.. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 ORAL ORDER; Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' 'Motion to Preclude Argumentative File Names and to Exceed File Size of 50MB,' Dkt. 1243, the Court rules as follows. Such motion is GRANTED in PART, as to the referenced argumentative file names, such that file names, including, but not limited to, those referenced on page 1 of Plaintiffs' motion, are argumentative and improper for transmission to the jury. File name descriptions should be brief and non-argumentative, so as to assist the jury in accessing such file. Each Defendant shall be responsible for renaming any such exhibits by the end of the day on November 2, 2021, and may contact the Clerk's Office to facilitate use of Box.com to conduct such renaming. After November 2, 2021, if any argumentative file names on Box.com are not renamed, Plaintiffs may bring that to the Court's attention. File names on Box.com would not be visible to jurors until the close of trial, in any event. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED, in PART, to the extent that Plaintiffs seek an increase of the file size limit. The Courts use of such program does not permit the Court to accommodate such request. However, if Plaintiffs possess certain files that are problematic to submit on Box.com, Plaintiffs may submit files of greater size onto a USB drive or other device, but must ensure through coordination with the Clerks Office that any such files so submitted would be equally accessible to the jury during deliberations. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1124 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/28/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Denying #1114 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Temporarily Restricting Extrajudicial Statements by Parties, Their Counsel, and Any Organization Funding This Litigation filed by Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party, Matthew Heimbach.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/28/2021. (Opinion and Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 ORAL ORDER; Defendants' Jason Kessler, Nathan Damigo, and Identity Evropa's Motion in Limine and Request for Judicial Notice (Movant-Defendants), contained in Dkt. 1148, is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part for the reasons set forth by the Court in the hearing of October 18, 2021. The Court will not take judicial notice of the search warrants and affidavits proffered by Movant- Defendants. See Dkt. 1259 at 1218. A limiting instruction will be offered to mitigate against application of adverse inference instructions against unsanctioned Defendants. See id. at 13. A non-party may not testify about their own emotional distress. See id. at 1617. Counsel may not refer to Defendants as racist or conspirators in opening statement or in their questioning of witnesses, but they can indicate their expectation of proving that Defendants engaged in a conspiracy and that racial animus was a motivating factor. See id. at 1819. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORAL ORDER DENYING Defendant Cantwell's motion at Dkt. 1298, which reiterates arguments made in his motions at Dkt. 1158 and 1160 relating to Plaintiffs' expert reports, and is denied on the same grounds stated in the Court's Order pertaining to those motions. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 ORAL ORDER; Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude Certain Evidence Concerning Defendant James Fields' Communications, Dkt. 1153, is GRANTED in accordance with the reasoning offered by the Court at the hearing held on October 18, 2021. See Dkt. 1259 at 26-31. Defendants are ordered not to discuss the possible testimony of Detective Young in opening statements, and may only call him to testify after laying a proper foundation and securing permission from the Court. Additionally, the fact that only Defendant Fields has been charged with a crime in relation to the events of August 2017 is inadmissible. See id. at 29-31. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 ORDER denying #1158 Motion in Limine; denying #1160 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/27/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 Anticipated Preliminary Jury Instructions.(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER denying #1119 Motion in Limine; denying #1132 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 ORDER denying #1066 Motion in Limine; denying #1077 Motion in Limine; denying #1090 Motion in Limine; denying #1121 Motion in Limine; denying #1123 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 ORAL ORDER; Defendant Cantwell's Motion in Limine, Dkt. 1157, is DENIED for the reasons stated by the Court at the hearing held on October 20, 2021. See Dkt. 1273 at 16. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 ORAL ORDER; Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Daryl Davis and to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence About Jeffrey Schoep's Alleged De-Radicalization, Dkt. 1242, is GRANTED in accordance with the Court's reasoning at the hearing held on October 22, 2021. See Dkt. 1290 at 79. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORAL ORDER TERMINATING Plaintiffs' motion at Dkt. 1152 as not yet ripe for the reasons stated on the record at the pretrial conference on Oct. 20, 2021. See Dkt. 1273 at 31-33. Plaintiffs will be permitted to renew their motion at trial if Defendant Cantwell attempts to call any of the witnesses named in the motion. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1225 Transcript Request, (lmb)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial held on 10/27/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2022. (lmb)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion to Exclude #1102 Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 ORAL ORDER; Upon consideration of a request from news organizations granted Courthouse press credentials for limited access of one pool reporter to the Courtroom, to be chosen on a rotating basis amongst the organizations granted such credentials, the Court GRANTS such request, provided that: (1) such pool reporter shall be advised that continued adherence is required to the standing orders of this Court prohibiting any photography, or broadcasting (video or audio) of court proceedings; (2) that the Clerk's Office and Chambers (moon.ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov) be informed by 2:00 p.m. the day preceding their anticipated attendance in the Courtroom, of the pool reporter covering the trial for that day; (3) that any such pool reporter shall complete and submit therewith a completed COVID-19 attestation form as required by this Court's COVID-19 Health Precautions Order, Dkt. 1146; and (4) such pool reporter shall have no communications with any juror. The Clerk of Court shall direct the pool reporter to their designated location in the Courtroom. The Court's Orders (Dkts. 1146 and 1202), are amended in this respect only. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/27/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY THREE held on 10/27/2021. Jury Selection continues (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Hourly Service) by Tricia McKinney for Jury Trial - Opening statements held on 10/28/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 Pro Se Declaration Regarding Juror Racial Discrimination Allegations by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 Pro se Declaration of October 27th by Christopher Cantwell Regarding Conditions at the Central Virginia Regional Jail (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 Letter in support of their Batson Challenge by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY TWO held on 10/26/2021. Jury Selection Continues. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 Pro Se Letter by Christopher Cantwell, "October 6th Letter to the Court" (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 Pro Se Sworn Declaration by Christopher Cantwell regarding "Ghostwriting" (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 Pro Se Sworn Declaration by Christopher Cantwell Regarding Data and Documents (hnw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 Pro Se Defendants Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Argumentative filenames and to Exceed file size of 50MB. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw) Modified on 10/27/2021 to correct file date(hnw).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 Letter re Batson Remedy by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Dunn, Karen)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 Transcript Copy Delivered re #1225 Transcript Request, (lmb)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 10/26/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2022. (lmb)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 Transcript Copy Delivered 10/25/2021 re #1225 Transcript Request, (lmb)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Hourly Service) by Brian Vitagliano for Jury Trial - Opening statements for plaintiffs and defendants held on 10/27/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (sad)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 Proposed Jury Instructions by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Instruction)(Jones, Bryan)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 Financial arrangements made on 10/18/2021 for both daily copy and realtime/rough draft (Original) (Daily Service) re #1227 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/26/2021. (lmb)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 Financial arrangements made on 10/12/2021 (Copy) (Daily Service) re #1225 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/26/2021. (lmb)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Jury Trial, Day 1 held on 10/25/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2022. (lmb)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Jury Trial DAY ONE-Jury Selection held on 10/25/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw) (Main Document 1316 replaced on 10/27/2021 to correct typographical errors only) .
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 Pro se Sworn Declaration Regarding Exclusion from Jury Selection Preparations by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 Pro Se Sworn Declaration Regarding Plaintiffs' Weekend Service of their Motion to Sever by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 Pro Se Defendant's Opposition re #1305 Letter to Sever . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 ORAL ORDER granting #1281 MOTION for Renato C. Stabile to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/25/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 ORDER denying #957 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/25/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 Letter regarding Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Preliminary Instructions)(Dunn, Karen)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 Letter in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Eleventh Hour Severance Request by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (Smith, Joshua)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 TRIAL BRIEF re Voir Dire and Prospective Juror Excusals for Cause by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey.(Dunn, Karen)
October 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 Letter opposing severance of Cantwell by Nathan Damigo, Jason Kessler, Identity Evropa (Kolenich, James)
October 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Amendment to #1305 Letter re Severance (Bloch, Michael)
October 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 Letter re Severance by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/22/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 Pro Se Sworn Declaration by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 Pro Se Letter Brief / Memorandum in Support re #1132 MOTION in Limine, #1119 MOTION in Limine. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 Supplement to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Witnesses by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 Pro Se Letter Brief / Memorandum in Support re #1121 MOTION in Limine. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 Pro Se Defendant's Second and Distinct Objection to Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 Pro Se MOTION to Exclude by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 Pro se Additional Evidence to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Experts dated 10/17/21 by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 Pro se Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Submission and Proposed Order Regarding their request for a Partially Anonymous Jury . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw) Modified on 10/24/2021 To correct Title of Document/clerical error (hnw).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER regarding MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Elliot Kline a/k/a Eli Mosley and Matthew Heimbach #457 filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Tyler Magill, Marissa Blair, Hannah Pearce, Chelsea Alvarado, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Response in Support of Motion #1006 filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Thomas Baker; Plaintiffs' request for evidentiary sanctions against Defendant Matthew Heimbach under Rule 37(e)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ECF No. 1006, is hereby GRANTED in part. Subject the presiding District Judge's final approval, Plaintiffs' request for adverse inferences against Heimbach under Rule 37(e)(2) will be granted as modified to the extent consistent with their proposed jury instruction relating to Defendants Kline, Ray, National Socialist Movement, and Vanguard America. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/22/2021. (Opinion mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 ORDER granting #1215 Motion de-designate; denying #1216 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER denying #1269 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 ORDER granting #1149 Motion in Limine.Dkt. 1149 requesting that the Court "deem" authentic certain photographs and videos depicting Defendant Robert 'Azzmador' Ray. The Court will deem authenticated Dkts. 2071, 2738, 2761, 2805, 2810, 2820, 2880, 3244, and portions of 1991 (7:30-8:43), subject to rebuttal by any Defendant, for purposes of Rule 901 of the Federal Rulesof Evidence. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emaile to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER granting #1238 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to voluntarily dismiss Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint. Dkt. 1238. Count IV shall be dismissed, without prejudice. This dismissal only applies as to Count IV. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Partiesl)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Final pretrial motion held on 10/22/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2022. (lmb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 RESPONSE to Motion re #1266 MOTION Motion to Modify Magistrate Judge Hoppe's Order on Sanctions Against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. re #1237 Memorandum Opinion,, Order,, Terminate Motions, . filed by James Alex Fields, Jr. (Campbell, David)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Daily Service) re #1287 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/23/2021. (lmb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Final Pretrial Conference held on October 22, 2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1161 Motion in Limine to Permit Cantwell Court Clothes and Bar Evidence, Testimony or Argument of his Current Incarceration Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER denying #1265 Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Established Certain Facts Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 ORDER denying #1085 Motion in Limine; denying #1088 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Third Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1269 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1231 Order on Motion in Limine, Regarding the Heaphy Report . filed by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. (Smith, Joshua)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 MOTION for Renato C. Stabile to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3816306. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Bloch, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 ORAL ORDER ; The Court's prior orders governing access by the parties to the redacted juror questionnaires and juror occupation lists are modified such that Plaintiffs, and represented Defendants, may each designate two (2) additional persons, for a total of eight (8) persons for each side, being either counsel of record in this case or third parties working under their direction as described in Dkt. 1260, who shall be permitted access to the jury questionnaires and occupation lists. Dkts. 1172, 1204 and 1260 are modified in this respect only, and shall remain in force in all other respects. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 NOTICE of Voir Dire Remarks by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. (Notice mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1269 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1231 Order on Motion in Limine, Regarding the Heaphy Report . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORAL ORDER; At the status conference on October 20, 2021, Plaintiffs' counsel has requested that, for the opening statement only, the number of persons on Plaintiffs' side be increased from nine to, at a maximum, fourteen, to accommodate any Plaintiffs who wish to view the opening statement. Finding good cause shown, the Court will grant the request. The Court's COVID-19 Health Precautions Order (Dkt. 1146) is amended in this respect only. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw) Modified on 10/21/2021 to correct typographical error(hnw).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 ORDER Concerning COVID 19 Health Precautions at Pretrial Conference on 10/22/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ORDER Permitting Certain Personal electronic Devices for Media with Press Credentials. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER Directing Meet and Confer between Plaintffs and Mr. Cantwell on 10/21/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/21/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Pretrial Conference via Zoom held on 10/20/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2022. (lmb)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Daily Service) re #1271 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/22/2021. (lmb)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Status Conference held on October 20, 2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Video Motion and Status Conference held on 10/20/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1231 Order on Motion in Limine, Regarding the Heaphy Report by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. (Smith, Joshua)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) previously set for 10/20/2021 at 1:00 pm before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) VTC Status Conference and Motion Hearing reset for 10/20/2021 03:00 PM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Notice and zoom link emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1242 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Daryl Davis and to Preclude Defendants' from Introducing Evidence About Jeffrey Schoep's Alleged De-Radicalization . filed by Jeff Schoep. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ReBrook, William)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge Hoppe's Order on Sanctions Against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. re #1237 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions no longer referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Bloch, Michael) Modified on 10/20/2021 to remove referral reference (hnw).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 MOTION to Deem Established that Defendants Kline and Ray Committed Certain Specific Overt Acts by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 0727, #3 Exhibit 1987)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) VTC Status Conference set for 10/20/2021 01:00 PM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Zoom information emailed to pro se parties ) (Notice emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 Pro Se Letter from Cantwell with Temporary Contact Information Update (hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to all motions by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 Pro Se Second Sworn Declaration Regarding Conditions at The Grady County Jail by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 Order to Amending in Part #1172 Pretrial Order and Order #1204 . Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/19/72. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Pretrial conference via Zoom held on 10/18/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, email: Lisa_Blair@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022. (lmb) Court reporter contact email added. Modified on 1/18/2022 (sad).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 Proposed Pretrial Order - Moon Integrated Pretrial Order by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Mills, David)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 Pro se Declaration by Christopher Cantwell (with envelope) (hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 Pro Se Objections by Defendant Christopher Cantwell to Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 Pro Se Supplement to Defendant's #1099 MOTION to Continue Trial, Reopen Discovery and Extend Deadlines by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 Pro Se Objections to Confidentiality Designations by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 Pro Se Request for Documents by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and Envelope)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORAL ORDER; In its Order of October 7, 2021, the Court directed counsel of record for Plaintiffs and Defendants to designate a limited number of counsel of record who would be provided electronic access by the Clerk to receive and review copies of the jury questionnaires, as well as a list of their names and occupations. Dkt. 1172; see also Dkt. 1204 (further specifying confidentiality and procedures for access to information about prospective jurors). Chambers inquired with the parties as of this date and neither side has informed the Clerk's Office of the limited number of attorneys of record who would be given access to the redacted questionnaires and the list of names and occupations. No pro se party has thus far sought access to these materials either. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel of record forthwith to designate for the Clerk's Office such attorneys who would have access to review such materials under the terms of this Courts Orders, Dkts. 1172, 1204. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/18/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 Order that Counsel for Defendant Fields is ADVISED to File a submission by 10/21/2021 supporting the admissibility of the presentence investigation report in this civil case. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/18/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER granting #1038 Motion to Compel. The Warden of MCFP Springfield is REQUESTED to have JAMES ALEX FIELDS JR. #22239-084 available via one-way videoconference so that he may listen to and observe proceedings in open court beginning on October 25, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. ET and continuing through the close of trial. Signed by Magistrate Joel C. Hoppe on 10/18/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw) Modified on 10/18/2021 to correct Judge in Docket Text (hnw).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Daily Service) re #1248 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/19/2021. (lmb)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Motion Hearing held on October 18, 2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 Sealed Exhibits to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Cantwell's Objections to Plaintiffs' Witness List pursuant to Order #1244 entered this date (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2, #2 Exhibit #3, #3 Exhibit #4, #4 Exhibit #5, #5 Exhibit #6, #6 Exhibit #8, #7 Exhibit #12)(hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2021 re #1148 MOTION in Limine seeking exclusion or limitation of evidence and judicial notice filed by Jason Kessler, Identity Evropa, Nathan Damigo, #1149 MOTION in Limine for the Court to Deem Authentic Certain Photographs and Videos Depicting Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker, #1153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Evidence Concerning Defendant James Fieldss Communications filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Thomas Baker. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Patrick Tolentino on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Tolentino, Raymond)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 ORDER granting #1155 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 MOTION to Preclude Argumentative File Names and to Exceed File Size of 50MB by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Testimony of Daryl Davis and to Preclude Defendants' from Introducing Evidence About Jeffrey Schoep's Alleged De-Radicalization by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Isaacson, William)
October 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Amendment to #1047 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, #1100 Response, (Bloch, Michael)
October 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. Amendment to #1142 Amended Document (Kolenich, James)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss (Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Granting in Part and Denying in Part #1003 Second MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/2021. (Opinion mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORAL ORDER granting #1208 MOTION for Noel R. Leon to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 ORAL ORDER granting #1207 MOTION for Andrew G. Celli, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 ORAL ORDER granting #1168 MOTION for Raymond P. Tolentino to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/15/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 ORDER on Motion for issuance of subpoenas denying #1133 without prejudice Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 ORDER granting #1144 Motion in Limine to exclude Defendants from introducing collateral source evidence Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 ORDER granting in part, without prejudice to resubmission #1145 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice #1147 Motion in Limine Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER to USMS Directing Cantwell's Appearance at Motions Hearing and Pretrial Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and email to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 Order directing the clerk to provide meals to jurors at Court Expense. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1122 Motion in Limine for access to the discovery and necessary legal materials at trial. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/14/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Realtime Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Jury Trial held on 10/25/2021-11/19/2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Bloch, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 ORDER Directing Submission of Evidence via Box. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Box Instruction Sheet) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw) Modified on 10/14/2021 for mailing instructions (hnw).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler for Jury Trial held on 10/25/21-11/19/21 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Kolenich, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 Proposed Jury Instructions by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey.(Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler Proposed Verdict Form (Kolenich, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 Proposed Jury Instructions by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler.(Kolenich, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1145 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Heaphy Report and the Testimony of Timothy J. Heaphy at Trial . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Evidence Concerning Defendant James Fieldss Communications . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Steven Young)(Kolenich, James)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Proposed Verdict Form) (Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1148 MOTION in Limine seeking exclusion or limitation of evidence and judicial notice . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1132 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CANTWELLS MOTION IN LIMINE TO INTRODUCE STATEMENTS AGAINST INTEREST OF UNAVAILABLE WITNESS EMILY GORCENSKI PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 804(b)(3) AND 807. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 MOTION to Seal CERTAIN DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL OR HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL THAT PLAINTIFFS WISH TO DE-DESIGNATE (ECF NO. 1215) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL OR HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 RESPONSE in Support re #1147 MOTION in Limine . filed by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Jones, Bryan)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1147 MOTION in Limine . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1119 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CANTWELLS MOTION IN LIMINE TO INTRODUCE STATEMENTS AGAINST INTEREST OF UNAVAILABLE WITNESS DWAYNE DIXON PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 804(b)(3) AND 807. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #1114 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Temporarily Restricting Extrajudicial Statements by Parties, Their Counsel, and Any Organization Funding This Litigation . filed by Integrity First for America. (Evans, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey of Plaintiffs' Submission and Proposed Order Regarding Protocols for Public and Press Access (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunn, Karen)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 Proposed Jury Instructions by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs.(Jones, Bryan)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 MOTION for Noel R. Len to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3809174. by Integrity First for America. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Evans, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 MOTION for Andrew G. Celli, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3809155. by Integrity First for America. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Evans, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 Proposed Pretrial Order - Moon Submission re Anonymous Jury and Proposed Order by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 Pro se Objection to Co-Defendant's Undisclosed and Unqualified "Expert-Witness" by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER Modifying in Part Pretrial Order, Dkt 1172.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/12/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 NOTICE of Appearance by Matteo Godi on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Godi, Matteo)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 ORDER Concerning Public and Media Access at Trial. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application for Courthouse Press Credentials) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 Proposed Jury Instructions by James Alex Fields, Jr.(Campbell, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 Proposed Jury Instructions by James Alex Fields, Jr.(Campbell, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1157 MOTION in Limine, #1160 MOTION in Limine, #1158 MOTION in Limine . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 Response re #1159 Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Makiko Hiromi, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Alexandra K. Conlon)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Amendment to #1182 Amended Document, PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1162 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Second and Emergency Motion to Extend all Trial and Pretrial Schedule Dates by Twelve Months and to Reopen Discovery. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 RESPONSE to Motion re #1122 MOTION in Limine to provide Cantwell with Access to the Discovery and Necessary Legal Materials at Trial, RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1133 Motion for issuance of subpoenas by Defendant Christopher Cantwell . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Mills, David)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1124 MOTION in Limine, #1161 MOTION in Limine . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1123 MOTION in Limine, #1121 MOTION in Limine . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 NOTICE of Appearance by Gemma Seidita on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Seidita, Gemma)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 NOTICE of Appearance by Allegra Flamm on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Flamm, Allegra)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORAL ORDER granting #1186 MOTION for Matteo Godi to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/12/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 NOTICE of Appearance by Khary Anderson on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Anderson, Khary)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 RESPONSE to Motion re #1126 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Defendant's Exhibit Lis and Disclosure of the Transcript of the August 11, 2017, Leadershp Meeting . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 MOTION for Matteo Godi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3807985. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
October 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 Supplemental Response re #1108 Response,,, #1134 Response,,,, Response re 1064 Response to Motion, 1089 Response, 1078 Response, 1084 MOTION to Compel, 1063 MOTION to Order the US to Appear and to Provide Cantewll and Lay Counsel with Adequate Access to the Electronic Materials and Cantwell Adequate Printing Capability, 1066 MOTION in Limine, 1088 MOTION in Limine, 1099 MOTION to Amend/Correct, 1090 MOTION in Limine, 1065 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, 1097 Objections, 1098 MOTION for Sanctions, 1085 MOT ION in Limine, 1086 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, 1096 MOTION for Sanctions, 1062 MOTION Leave to File Instanter, 1087 Response to Motion, 1102 MOTION to Exclude, 1077 MOTION in Limine, 1103 Affidavit . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) IN PERSON Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2021 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. FOR THOSE UNABLE TO BE ONSITE, PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 Additional copies of documents previously filed received by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Amendment to #1151 Deposition Designation PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED AND CORRECTED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Mills, David)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER denying as moot #1063 Motion to provide adequate access denying as moot #1109 Motion to provide reasonable access to case-related materials Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/8/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #1148 MOTION in Limine seeking exclusion or limitation of evidence and judicial notice, #1145 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Heaphy Report and the Testimony of Timothy J. Heaphy at Trial, #1149 MOTION in Limine for the Court to Deem Authentic Certain Photographs and Videos Depicting Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray, #1153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Evidence Concerning Defendant James Fieldss Communications, #1152 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Trial Witnesses Not Previously Disclosed in Discovery, #1144 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants from Introducing Collateral Source Evidence, #1147 MOTION in Limine : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2021 09:30 AM before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Notice mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: In Chambers Conference held on 10/8/2021. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (hnw)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Telephonic status conference held on 10/8/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 10/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2022. (lmb)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Daily Service) re #1176 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 10/9/2021. (lmb)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Status Hearing held on 10/8/2021 before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 ORAL ORDER granting #1171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Edward Kolenich and Elmer Woodard terminated as to Defendants Matthew Parrott and Traditionalist Workers Party. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/8/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey concerning Defendant Christopher Cantwell (Cahill, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER Requesting the USMS to have Christopher Cantwell available for a phone call or videoconference October 8, 2021 at 9:00 and 10:00. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/7/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/8/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Kolenich, James)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)Video Court Hearing set for 10/8/2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (CR) Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/8/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Parties to receive dial in information by email prior to hearing (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 MOTION for Raymond P. Tolentino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3806643. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER Filing Blank Jury Questionnaire. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Questionnaire) (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ORAL ORDER granting #1139 MOTION for Allegra K. Flamm to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 ORAL ORDER granting #1138 MOTION for Gemma Seidita to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 ORAL ORDER granting #1137 MOTION for Khary J. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/6/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 NOTICE by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs Service of Subpoena (Jones, Bryan)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 MOTION to Seal :Plaintiffs Motion To Seal Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, and 12 of Their Response to Defendant Cantwells Objections to Plaintiffs Witness List ECF #1154 by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 Response re #1097 Objections . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-SEALED, #2 Exhibit 2-SEALED, #3 Exhibit 3-SEALED, #4 Exhibit 4-SEALED, #5 Exhibit 5-SEALED, #6 Exhibit 6-SEALED, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8-SEALED, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12-SEALED, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Mills, David)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Evidence Concerning Defendant James Fieldss Communications by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Young Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fields Response to RFAs)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 Second AND Emergency PRO SE MOTION for Extension of all Trial and Pretrial Schedule dates by Twelve Months to reopen Discovery by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cantwell, #2 Envelope)(hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 Pro se MOTION in Limine to Permit Cantwell Court Clothes and Bar Evidence, Testimony or Argument of his Current Incarceration by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 Pro se MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony that is Undisclosed or Derived from Undisclosed and/or Hearsay Material by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cantwell)(hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 Pro Se Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)Document added Modified on 10/5/2021 (hnw).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 Pro Se MOTION in Limine to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts Peter Simi and Kathleen Blee and to Bar Argument and Testimony by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 Pro se MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiffs from Introducing Evidence about the Supposed Holocaust as Irrelevant and Inflammatory by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 Additional copies of documents previously filed at 1120, 1089 and 1090 by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Trial Witnesses Not Previously Disclosed in Discovery by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael L. Bloch in Support, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jessica Phillips in Support, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 26(a) Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Initial Disclosures)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 Deposition Designation by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey.(Mills, David)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1102 MOTION to Exclude . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-19-08-01_Depo Notice Re Hopper, #2 Exhibit 2-19-09-11_Rousseau Depo subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3-19-10-01_Rousseau Depo subpoena, #4 Exhibit 4-19-10-08_Depo Notice Re Rousseau, #5 Exhibit 5-20-06-01_Hopper Notice, #6 Exhibit 6-20-06-15_Hopper Deposition Notice, #7 Exhibit 7-20-05-28_Notice of Isaacs and Griffin, #8 Exhibit 8-20-06-04_Depo Notice Re Rousseau, #9 Exhibit 9-20-06-10_Depo Notice Re Rousseau, #10 Exhibit 10-20-06-16_Rousseau Deposition Notice, #11 Exhibit 11-20-07-20_Rousseau Deposition Notice)(Mills, David)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 MOTION in Limine for the Court to Deem Authentic Certain Photographs and Videos Depicting Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1991, #2 Exhibit 2071, #3 Exhibit 2112, #4 Exhibit 2643, #5 Exhibit 2738, #6 Exhibit 2761, #7 Exhibit 2769, #8 Exhibit 2805, #9 Exhibit 2810, #10 Exhibit 2820, #11 Exhibit 2880, #12 Exhibit 3234, #13 Exhibit 3244, #14 Exhibit 3253, #15 Exhibit 3340)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 MOTION in Limine seeking exclusion or limitation of evidence and judicial notice by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Jason Kessler)(Kolenich, James)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 MOTION in Limine by Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Heaphy Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Kessler Order)(Jones, Bryan)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 COVID-19 Health Precautions ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 COVID19 Attestation) (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Heaphy Report and the Testimony of Timothy J. Heaphy at Trial by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants from Introducing Collateral Source Evidence by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. Second Amended Exhibit List (Kolenich, James)
October 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. Amendment to #1070 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures Amended Exhibit List (Kolenich, James)
October 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. Amendment to #1043 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures Amended Witness List (Kolenich, James)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Corrected and Amended Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Corrected and Amended Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 MOTION for Allegra K. Flamm to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3802542. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 MOTION for Gemma Seidita to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3802534. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 MOTION for Khary J. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3802527. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting #918 Motion for Entry of Default; adopting #967 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/30/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 Additional copies of documents previously filed received by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 Supplemental Response re #1108 Response,,, Response re 1064 Response to Motion, 1089 Response, 1078 Response, 1084 MOTION to Compel, 1063 MOTION to Order the US to Appear and to Provide Cantewll and Lay Counsel with Adequate Access to the Electronic Materials and Cantwell Adequate Printing Capability, 1066 MOTION in Limine, 1088 MOTION in Limine, 1099 MOTION to Amend/Correct, 1090 MOTION in Limine, 1065 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, 1097 Objections, 1098 MOTION for Sanctions, 1085 MOT ION in Limine, 1086 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, 1096 MOTION for Sanctions, 1062 MOTION Leave to File Instanter, 1087 Response to Motion, 1102 MOTION to Exclude, 1077 MOTION in Limine, 1103 Affidavit. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 Pro Se Motion for issuance of subpoenas by US Marshals Service by Defendant Christopher Cantwell by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw) Modified on 9/30/2021 filed date corrected to fix clerical error (hnw).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 Pro Se MOTION in Limine and Notice of Intent to Introduce Statements Against Interest and Prior Testimony of Unavailable Witness Emily Gorcenski by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 Additional Copies of documents previously filed ( docs 1109 and 110) by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 Supplemental Response re #1058 Order Directing Meet and Confer . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanni Sanchez on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Sanchez, Giovanni)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 NOTICE of Appearance by Agbeko Petty on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Petty, Agbeko)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 Response to Defendant's Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 Objections by Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr re #1074 Letter, (Campbell, David)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORAL ORDER granting #1112 MOTION for Giovanni J. Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/28/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 ORAL ORDER granting #1111 MOTION for Agbeko C. Petty to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/28/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 Additional copies of Documents previous filed/received by by Christopher Cantwell Declaration (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Motion)(hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 Pro se MOTION for Leave to Supplement Defendant's Exhibit List and Disclosure of the Transcript of the August 11, 2017, Leadership Meeting by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2021: #1 Exhibit Transcript) (hnw).Transcript added to entry under seal pursuant to Order 1360 entered 10/28/2021
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 Pro Se Reply re #1080 . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 Pro Se MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Cantwell's Prior Alleged Felonious Conduct by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 Pro se MOTION in Limine for a Determination that no Private Right of Action Lies for Conspiracy to Violate a Virginia State Statue Absent Enforcement Provisions, to bar Plaintiffs from Arguing the Same, and, to Clarify Whether Plaintiffs have Pled a Valid Claim for Conspiracy to Commit False Imprisonment by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 Pro se MOTION in Limine to Provide Cantwell with Access to the Discovery and Necessary Legal Materials at Trial by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 Pro Se MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiffs from Arguing or Presenting Evidence in Support of Theories of Aiding or Abetting or Contributory Negligence Towards Violations of Va Ann Code 8.01.-42.1. Assault, or any other Tort by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 Pro Se Objections by Defendant Christopher Cantwell to the Magistrate's Order 1106 (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 PRO SE MOTION in Limine and Notice of Intent to Introduce Statement Against Interest of Unavailable Witness Dwayne Dixon by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Temporarily Restricting Extrajudicial Statements by Parties, Their Counsel, and Any Organization Funding This Litigation by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Joshua)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 Response re #1110 Letter . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 MOTION for Giovanni J. Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3797189. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 MOTION for Agbeko C. Petty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3797181. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 Defendant Christopher Cantwell's September 22nd 2021 Letter to the Court by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Pro Se MOTION to Order the US to Provide Cantwell with Reasonable Access to the Court and the Record by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cantwell)(hnw)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 Response re #1064 Response to Motion, #1089 Response, #1078 Response, #1084 MOTION to Compel, #1063 MOTION to Order the US to Appear and to Provide Cantewll and Lay Counsel with Adequate Access to the Electronic Materials and Cantwell Adequate Printing Capability, #1066 MOTION in Limine, #1088 MOTION in Limine, #1099 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #1090 MOTION in Limine, #1065 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, #1097 Objections, #1098 MOTION for Sanctions, #1085 MOTION in Limine, #1086 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, #1096 MOTION for Sanctions, #1062 MOTION Leave to File Instanter, #1087 Response to Motion, #1102 MOTION to Exclude, #1077 MOTION in Limine, #1103 Affidavit . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendant Jeff Schoep.(ReBrook, William)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER, Granting in Part and Denying in Part without perjudice #1028 Second MOTION for Sanctions (Evidentiary Sanctions against Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray) filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/22/2021. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Parties via email and mail)(hnw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER Directing Cantwell Transportation Costs be borne by the US Government. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/21/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via email and mail)(hnw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 Order Directing the Warden at USP Marion to transport Christopher Cantwell #00991-509 to the United States District Court, Charlottesville, VA for the Jury Trial on October 25 through close of trial beginning at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/21/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via email and mail)(hnw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 Pro se FIRST SWORN DECLARATION of Christopher Cantwell regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Notice Depositions. (hnw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Pro Se Supplemental MOTION to Exclude the Deposition Testimonies of Robert Isaacs Baker, Bradley Griffin, Dillon Hopper Izarry and Thomas Rosseau by Christopher Cantwell. Motions no longer referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw) Modified on 9/22/2021 (hnw).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 Additional Copies received in the mail this date of Documents 1062, 1063, 1064, 1065, 1066, and 1077 from Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 Response Correcting Plaintiffs' Response #1091 to Order Directing Meet and Confer #1058 . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Amended Witness List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email from J. Phillips to E. Kline)(Bloch, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 Pro se Motion to Amend Discovery, Pretrial, and Trial Schedules and to Extend Filing Deadlines by Christopher Cantwell (hnw) (Main Document 1099 replaced on 9/21/2021 and Additional attachment(s) added #1 Exhibit Sworn Declaration) (hnw) Corrected for clerical error. Declaration docketed with motion following as one document. Corrected to show pending motion with declaration as exhibit
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 Pro se MOTION for Discovery Sanctions against Plaintiffs for Failure to Timely Disclose the "Discord Production" by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 Objections re #1047 Rule 26(a)(3)Pretrial Disclosures, Plaintiff's Witness Lits by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 Pro Se MOTION for Discovery Sanctions against Plaintiff Thomas Baker by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 Additional copy of document #1078 Response to the Court's Order on Transportation Costs by Christopher Cantwell received by email along with additional filings by Christopher Cantwell, the Clerk having received both mail and email filings this date. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 Additional copy of document #1077 MOTION in Limine for a determination that simple assault, simple batter, and/or, any other act incapable of causing bodily harm but involving the use of force is not a "Badge or Incident of Slavery" proscribed by US Const Amend XIII received by email along with additional filings by Christopher Cantwell, the Clerk having received both mail and email filings this date. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 Additional copy of document #1084 MOTION to Compel Co-Defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) Disclosures to Compel Plaintiffs' Disclosure of the Deposition of Christopher Cantwell and to Compel Plaintiffs to provide paper copies of all filings and discovery previously provid ed in electronic format received by email along with additional filings by Christopher Cantwell, the Clerk having received both mail and email filings this date(hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 Additional copy of document #1085 MOTION in Limine for a determination that bias against those who identify as "Jews" is not a form of "Class based invidiously discriminatory animus" prohibited by 42 USC 1958 (3 ) received by email along with additional filings by Christopher Cantwell, the Clerk having received both mail and email filings this date. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 Response re #1058 Order Directing Meet and Confer . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Amended Witness List)(Bloch, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 Pro Se MOTION in Limine for a determination that plaintiffs' claims arose ex turpi causa and thus are barred in pari delicto by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 Pro Se Response re #1058 Order . filed by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Witness Exhibit List previously received by mail and filed this date) These documents received by email (hnw) Modified on 10/29/2021 typographical error (hnw).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 Pro Se MOTION in Limine to exclude all evidence of Defendants' perceived biases against those who identify as "Jews" pursuant to Fed.R.Evid. 401, 402 and 403 by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 Pro Se RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion #457 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Elliot Kline a/k/a Eli Mosley and Matthew Heimbach (Doc 457, 539, 1006). filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 Pro Se List of Witnesses by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 Pro Se MOTION in Limine for a determination that bias against those who identify as "Jews" is not a form of "Class based invidiously discriminatory animus" prohibited by 42 USC 1958 (3) by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 Pro Se MOTION to Compel Co-Defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) Disclosures to Compel Plaintiffs' Disclosure of the Deposition of Christopher Cantwell and to Compel Plaintiffs to provide paper copies of all filings and discovery previously provided in electronic format by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(hnw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 Letter re: Correction of Error in ECF No. 1054 by Matthew Heimbach (Smith, Joshua)
September 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 Response re #1080 Response, plaintiffs' submission regarding transportation of Christopher Cantwell for Trial . filed by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler. (Kolenich, James)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs.(Jones, Bryan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 Response re #1075 Order Directing Submissions on Payment for Cantwell Transportation and directing Meet and Confer as soon as possible . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 REPLY to Response to Motion re #457 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Elliot Kline a/k/a Eli Mosley and Matthew Heimbach . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 Pro se Response re #1031 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Christopher Cantwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(hnw)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 Pro Se MOTION in Limine by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 First Brief/Memorandum Exhibit. filed by Richard Spencer. (Spencer, Richard)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER Directing Submissions on Payment for Cantwell Transportation and directing Meet and Confer as soon as possible. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/15/2021. (hnw)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 Letter Enclosing Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs' Exhibit List)(Phillips, Jessica)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 Oral ORDER granting #1072 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk shall maintain under seal the letter and exhibit list filed at ECF No. 1071. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/15/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(JCH)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 MOTION to Seal Document 1071 Letter, by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Jessica)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler.(Kolenich, James)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendant Jeff Schoep.(ReBrook, William)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs.(Jones, Bryan)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER denying as moot #1056 Motion To Enjoin Non-Party Entity U.S. Bureau of Prisons from Obstructing Defendant's Time Sensitive Communications with the Court Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/14/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr.(Campbell, David)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 MOTION in Limine for a Determination that Animus against the Domestic Terror Organization Antifa and other Members of the Woke Progressive Left is not a form of "Class Based Invidiously Discriminatroy Animus" Prohibited by 42 USC 1985(3) by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 Defendant Christopher Cantwell's Partial Exhibits List (Pretrial Disclosures) by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 RESPONSE to the Motion re #1003 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr.. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 MOTION to Order the US to Appear and to Provide Cantwell and Lay Counsel with Adequate Access to the Electronic Materials and Cantwell Adequate Printing Capability by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cantwell, #2 Exhibit Declaration of White)(hnw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 MOTION for Leave to File Instanter by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cantwell's Objections)(hnw)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re #1059 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray (Amended Certificate of Service) (Phillips, Jessica)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration in Support - Jessica Phillips)(Phillips, Jessica)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER Directing Meet and Confer. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/10/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #1028 Second MOTION for Sanctions (Evidentiary Sanctions against Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray). filed by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 Pro Se MOTION to Enjoin Non-Party Entity U.S. Bureau of Prisons from obstructing Defendant's Time Sensitive Communications with the Court by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (dg)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #1003 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (dg) Modified on 9/10/2021 to correct docket text (dg).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 RESPONSE to Motion re #457 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Elliot Kline a/k/a Eli Mosley and Matthew Heimbach . filed by Matthew Heimbach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Heimbach Deposition (Compressed, Redacted), #2 Exhibit Brooke Heimbach Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Bloch Declaration)(Smith, Joshua)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 Oral ORDER; Upon consideration of one plaintiff, Ms. Chelsea Alvarado's unopposed motion to voluntarily with draw her claims without prejudice against Defendant Fields, for the reasons set forth in said motion and otherwise finding good cause shown, and there being no opposition thereto, the Court hereby GRANTS said motion. Dkt. 893. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). This Order does not impact any other claims by Ms. Alvarado against any other Defendant, or by any other Plaintiff against any Defendant. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/9/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 Response re #1038 MOTION to Compel Permit Virtual Observation of Trial . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 NOTICE of Appearance by Makiko Hiromi on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Hiromi, Makiko)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Butto on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Butto, Nicholas)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpine Lawyer on behalf of Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Lawyer, Arpine)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 Oral ORDER granting #1044 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Matthew Heimbach's response to plaintiffs' motion for sanctions is due by September 9, 2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/8/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiffs Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey.(Bloch, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendant Jeff Schoep.(ReBrook, William)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants Michael Hill, League of the South, Michael Tubbs.(Jones, Bryan)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1006 Response in Support of Motion,,, by Matthew Heimbach. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Smith, Joshua)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendants Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler.(Kolenich, James)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr.(Campbell, David)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER - Cantwell is afforded leave to file any submission with the Clerks Office in this action by electronic means. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/07/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/03/2021. (Opinion mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ORAL ORDER Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Monetary Sanctions against Defendant Robert 'Azzmador' Ray, Dkt. 898, the Court FINDS that Plaintiffs have established an entitlement to seek monetary sanctions against Mr. Ray in the form of their reasonable fees and expenses directly caused by Mr. Ray's failure to attend his depositions on July 29, 2020, and September 14, 2020, as well as those incurred in preparation for Mr. Ray's civil contempt hearing on September 14, 2020. The Court has already made findings regarding Mr. Ray's failure to attend his depositions as well as failure to attend his civil contempt hearing, in this Court's Order Finding Robert 'Azzmador' Ray in Civil Contempt. Dkt. 877. Those findings further support Plaintiffs' Motion here. Dkt. 898. In addition, Mr. Ray has not taken any steps to purge himself of contempt. Plaintiffs are entitled to seek such reasonable fees and expenses from Mr. Ray. See also Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(d)(3).Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall file within ten (10) days a petition for reasonable fees and expenses incurred in connection with Mr. Ray's failure to attend his depositions and incurred in preparation for Mr. Ray's civil contempt hearing. The propriety and reasonableness of any specific requested sums shall be determined upon consideration of Plaintiffs' petition. Plaintiffs' Motion for Monetary Sanctions against Robert 'Azzmador' Ray is GRANTED to this extent. Dkt. 898. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 09/03/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg) Modified on 9/10/2021 To correct docket text (dg).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 MOTION to Compel Permit Virtual Observation of Trial by James Alex Fields, Jr. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Campbell, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1003 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25)(Mills, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 Letter re Plaintiffs' Expert by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER: that the jurors be escorted each day to and from the U.S. Courthouse in Charlottesville, by a U.S. Marshal in a vehicle to be provided at Court expense.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/27/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw) (Main Document 1035 replaced on 8/27/2021 with dated copy ) (hnw).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 Oral ORDER granting #1030 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Matthew Heimbach shall respond to plaintiff's brief, ECF No. 1006, no later than September 7, 2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/27/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER denying #1002 Motion for Writ. Following Fields's counsel's consultation with, at minimum, Fields's case manager at MCFP Springfield, Fields's counsel may within seven (7) days file any motion requesting measures to facilitate Fields's remote access for trial and means of communication with counsel during trial. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/26/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 Order Requesting the Warden at USP Marion to transport Christopher Cantwell #00991-509 to the United States District Court, Charlottesville, VA for the Jury Trial starting on October 25, 2021 beginning at 9:30 a.m.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/26/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER granting #1015 Motion requesting transportation to Charlottesville for trial, as to Christopher Cantwell. A Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum will issue in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 2241(c)(5), requesting that the Bureau of Prisons transport him from USP Marion, where he is now incarcerated, to Charlottesville, Virginia, for his trial. The U.S. Marshal's Service is directed to transport Christopher Cantwell to Charlottesville for trial, which is scheduled for October 25 to November 19, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/26/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1006 Response in Support of Motion,,, by Matthew Heimbach. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Smith, Joshua)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey Plaintiffs' Proposed Juror Questionnaire (Bloch, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 Second MOTION for Sanctions (Evidentiary Sanctions against Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Phillips, Jessica)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 NOTICE by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler Defendants' Proposed Questions to be Included in the Jury Questionnaire (Kolenich, James)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 RESPONSE to Motion re #1015 MOTION Requesting Transport for Trial of Incarcerated Defendant re #1001 Order . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 Defendant Christopher Cantwell's August 11th 2021 Letter to the Court by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 Defendant Christopher Cantwell's August 12th 2021 Letter to the Court by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Settlement Conference held on 8/20/2021. (kld)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #1003 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. . filed by James Alex Fields, Jr. (Campbell, David)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Smith on behalf of Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (Smith, Joshua)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 Oral ORDER granting #1019 MOTION for Joshua Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/20/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MOTION for Joshua Smith, ESQ to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3770870. by Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (ReBrook, William)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward ReBrook, IV on behalf of Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (ReBrook, William)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 Order to Respond re #1015 Pro se MOTION Requesting Transport for Trial of Incarcerated Defendant Responses due by 8/23/2021 at Noon. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/19/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 Order Vacating 1009 Oral Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Denying #1008 First MOTION for Joshua Smith, ESQ to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling in compliance with Local Rule 6(d). Accordingly, Smith's Notice of Appearance, ECF No. 1014, is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/19/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 Pro Se MOTION Requesting Transport for Trial of Incarcerated Defendant in response to #1001 Order by Christopher Cantwell. Motion no longer referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Smith on behalf of Matthew Heimbach, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party (Smith, Joshua) Modified on 8/19/2021 (hnw). STRICKEN from the Docket pursuant to Order 1016 entered 8/19/2021
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 Sealed Document- Exhibt 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 17) To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Matthew Heimbach filed under seal pursuant to Order #1012 (hnw)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER granting #1007 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/17/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 Sealed Document-Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant James A. Fields Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix B, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24) Sealed pursuant to Order #1010 (hnw) .
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER granting #1004 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Their Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant James Fields Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/17/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties) (hnw)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 Oral ORDER granting #1008 MOTION for Joshua Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/17/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)VACATED pursuant to Order 1016, Entered 8/16/2021 Modified on 8/19/2021 (hnw).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 First MOTION for Joshua Smith, ESQ to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3766433. by Willam Rebrook. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (ReBrook, William) Modified on 10/7/2021 To correct filer (hnw).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 MOTION to Seal Documents 1006-2, 1006-7, 1006-18 by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 Supplemental RESPONSE in Support re #457 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants Elliot Kline a/k/a Eli Mosley and Matthew Heimbach . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael L. Bloch, #2 Exhibit Ex. 01, #3 Exhibit Ex. 02, #4 Exhibit Ex. 03, #5 Exhibit Ex. 04, #6 Exhibit Ex. 05, #7 Exhibit Ex. 06, #8 Exhibit Ex. 07, #9 Exhibit Ex. 08, #10 Exhibit Ex. 09, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17)(Bloch, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 RESPONSE to Motion re #1002 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Mills, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 MOTION to Seal Motion for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. and Selected Supporting Exhibits by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant James Alex Fields, Jr. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24)(Mills, David)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by James Alex Fields, Jr. Motions no longer referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Campbell, David) Modified on 8/12/2021 (hnw).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER to file submissions by Aug 11, 2021 as to James Fields, Jr. and Christopher Cantwell. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 8/6/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 Oral ORDER granting #996 MOTION for Makiko Hiromi to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/29/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 999 Oral ORDER granting #997 MOTION for Arpine S. Lawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/29/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 998 Oral ORDER granting #995 MOTION for Nicholas A. Butto to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/29/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(JCH)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 MOTION for Arpine S. Lawyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3755528. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 996 MOTION for Makiko Hiromi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3755526. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MOTION for Nicholas A. Butto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3755517. by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Cahill, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 994 Notice of Cancellation of Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 7/23/21 at 3:00 PM (No Interpreter requested). Notice of hearing docketed in incorrect case. (kld)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 993 CANCELLED - NOTICE of Hearing: (FTR) Discovery Hearing set for 7/23/2021 03:00 PM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Dial in information emailed all counsel and to Pro Se Parties)(kld) Notice of hearing docketed in incorrect case - Modified on 7/22/2021 (kld).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 992 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call re: mediation held on 7/22/2021. (kld)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 991 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 990 NOTICE of Hearing: (FTR) Status Conference Call re: mediation set for 7/22/2021 10:00 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel and pro se parties. (Notice emailed to Pro Se Parties)(kld)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 989 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2021 11:00 AM in via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/9/21. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(kld)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 986 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re #985 MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray (Phillips, Jessica)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Defendant Cantwell's Brief in Support of Venue Change. filed by Christopher Cantwell. (hnw)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 987 Defendant Cantwell's Objection to Plaintiffs' "Joint" Proposed Amended Pretrial Schedule by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MOTION for Attorney Fees recoverable from Robert "Azzmador" Ray by Chelsea Alvarado, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration in Support - Jessica Phillips)(Phillips, Jessica)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 984 Supplemental Response re #951 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion to Stay,, . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 983 STIPULATION of Fact and Authentication of Documents by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Mills, David)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 982 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER; Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant National Socialist Movement, ECF No. 894, is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for a permissive adverse-inference instruction against Defendant National Socialist Movement is GRANTED subject to the presiding District Judge's final approval. Plaintiffs should submit their proposed language to the presiding District Judge in their proposed jury instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/23/2021. (Opinion mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 981 Letter Joint Proposed Amended Pretrial Schedule by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Bloch, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 980 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER For the reasons set forth, the Court concludes that the trial shall remain in Charlottesville, both because there is no venue in another division of the District, and because the factors relevant to such requests to transfer venue weigh in favor of holding the trial in Charlottesville. The Court will therefore DENY Defendants' motions to transfer venue. See Dkts. 973, 974, 975, 976, and 977. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/18/2021. (Opinion and Order emailed and mailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Pro Se Orginial, of previously filed document #973 by Matthew Heimbach, accepted by the court- See 972 , received this date. (hnw)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 978 Response re 972 Order,,, Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Venue for Trial and Trial Logistics . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas Baker, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of April Muniz, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Natalie Romero, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Marcus Martin, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Devin Willis, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Elizabeth Sines, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Amy Spitalnick, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Michael Bloch, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Jesse W. Stevenson, #10 Exhibit J - Declaration of Herman Weisberg, #11 Exhibit K - Declaration of Oren Segal, #12 Exhibit L - Declaration of Marissa Blair, #13 Exhibit M - Declaration of Seth Wispelwey, #14 Exhibit N - Other Lawsuits in Federal Court Relating to Unite the Right)(Bloch, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 977 First MOTION to Change Venue by Jeff Schoep. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (ReBrook, William)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 976 First MOTION to Transfer Case by Richard Spencer. (Spencer, Richard)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 975 Brief/Memorandum Regarding Trial Feasibility. filed by James Alex Fields, Jr. (Campbell, David)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Court Request for Briefing by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party. (Kolenich, James)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 973 Pro Se MOTION to Change Venue by Matthew Heimbach. (hnw)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Oral ORDER; In view of the period for supplemental submissions directed by the Court at the June 4, 2021 status conference, the Court deems the letter from pro se Defendant Matthew Heimbach timely filed and will construe it as a motion to change venue. Heimbach emailed said motion to the Clerk's Office on June 9, 2021 and represented that it was mailed on that date. Heimbach and all other pro se parties are advised that, unless e-filing privileges have been granted, the Clerk's Office shall not accept email submissions. Rather, all filings must be timely mailed to the Court. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/11/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 971 RESPONSE in Opposition re #957 MOTION for Reconsideration re #952 Order on Motion to Strike, . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORAL ORDER: The Court will grant Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages. Dkt. 969. Plaintiffs shall have up to twenty-five (25) pages for their brief filed pursuant to this Court's briefing order. Dkt. 966. If any Defendant shall seek leave to file a modest number of excess pages, they may file any such request with their brief. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/8/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 969 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Bloch, Michael)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 968 Pro Se Letter regarding change of address by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 967 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #918 Consent MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/7/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 966 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/7/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Status Conference held on 6/4/2021 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Blair, Telephone number 434.409.4575. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 6/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (lmb)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 964 Order Referring Case to Hon. Joel C. Hoppe for Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/7/2021. Order Mailed and emailed to pro se parties.(hnw)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 963 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Daily Service) re #962 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 6/8/2021. (lmb)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 962 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Daily Service) (Amended) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Status Conference held on June 4, 2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Supplemental Response re #951 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion to Stay,, . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 960 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3 Day Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Status Conference held on June 4, 2021 reported by Court Reporter Lisa Blair before Judge Norman K. Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Status Conference held on 6/4/2021 via Zoom. (Court Reporter: Lisa Blair) (ca)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 958 Response re #951 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion to Stay,, . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C. Cantwell Deposition Notice)(Bloch, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 957 MOTION for Reconsideration (Objection) re #952 Order on Motion to Strike, by Richard Spencer. (dg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 956 Pro Se Letter requesting copies by Christopher Cantwell. (dg)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 955 NOTICE of Videoconference Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Status Conference set for June 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Notice and Zoom dial-in information emailed and mailed to Pro Se Parties)(ca)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER Scheduling Status Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 05/26/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(dg)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 953 Mailing received this date. This document has previously been filed at #939 . This document was lost in the mail ( see Post Mark of 3/29/2021 ) and Party, Mr. Cantwell, discovered it had not been received when trying to arrange for signature page to be included. The replacement document was then sent to the Court in April and filed on 4/12/21. (hnw) Modified on 5/21/2021 to correct filed date(hnw).
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER granting #896 Motion to Strike. Defendant Richard Spencer's motion for summary judgment, ECF No. #895 , is STRICKEN from the docket as untimely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 05/19/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(dg)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 951 ORDER; Cantwell's motion to sanction Plaintiffs for their occasional "failure to properly serve him with documents [while]... he has been incarcerated," ECF No. 939, is DENIED; Cantwell's motion to "submit motions, responses, and other necessary correspondence in this case by faxing documents to the Clerk," ECF No. 942, is DENIED ; Cantwell's objection to Plaintiffs' notice of deposition, ECF Nos. 930, 950, is OVERRULED Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 5/14/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties )(hnw)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Pro se MOTION to Stay Deposition by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Response re #946 Additional Evidence, #947 Additional Evidence Defendant Cantwell's "Supplemental" Motion to Sanction Plaintiffs . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from A. Conlon to L. Noseworthy, K. Chadbourne)(Bloch, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Letter Updating Court on current situation and address by Christopher Cantwell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hnw)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 947 Pro Se Second Supplemental to Defendant's #939 MOTION to Sanction Plaintiffs by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 946 Pro se Supplemental to Defendant's #939 MOTION to Sanction Plaintiffs by Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 945 RESPONSE in Opposition re #939 MOTION for Sanctions . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from J. Kolenich to Judge Hoppe, #2 Exhibit B - Email from J. Kolenich to M. Bloch, #3 Exhibit C - Email from C. Cantwell to M. Bloch, #4 Exhibit D - C. Cantwell Deposition Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Michael L. Bloch)(Bloch, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re #943 Response to Motion, (Bloch, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 943 RESPONSE to Motion re #942 MOTION to file by Fax . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 942 Pro Se MOTION to file by Fax by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 941 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/15/2021. (Opinion mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Letter, which was received on April 5th, with last page/signature page for Motion #939 by Christopher Cantwell. The Motion having finally been received in Clerk's office April 12th, to be docketed and joined with signature page. (hnw)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 939 Pro Se MOTION to Sanction Plaintiffs by Christopher Cantwell. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER denying #823 Motion for Summary Judgment. There are material conflicts in evidence, to be set forth more fully in a forthcoming Memorandum Opinion, that preclude an award of summary judgment to League of the South Defendants. Accordingly, their motion for summary judgment will be and hereby is DENIED. Dkt. 823. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/30/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER denying Motion to Exclude #826 . However, Defendants may later raise specific objections in the course of the experts' testimony. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/31/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Vanguard America, ECF No. 713. Plaintiffs' request for a permissive adverse-inference instruction against Defendant Vanguard America is hereby GRANTED subject to the presiding District Judges final approval. Plaintiffs should submit their proposed language to the presiding District Judge in their proposed jury instructions.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/30/2021. (Opinion and Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 935 NOTICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re withdraw of attorney Scott Stemetzki (Cahill, Robert)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 934 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey re #932 Response, Supplemental Response re 931 Response, In Opposition to Defendant Cantwell's Objection to Deposition (Bloch, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 933 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER; Plaintiffs' "Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Against Defendant Robert 'Azzmador' Ray and for an Order Directing Ray to Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court," ECF No. 750, is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' request for a permissive adverse-inference instruction against Defendant Robert "Azzmador" Ray is GRANTED subject to the presiding District Judge's final approval. Plaintiffs should submit their proposed language to the presiding District Judge in their proposed jury instructions. 2. Plaintiffs' request for an order directing Ray to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of court for violating the May 18, 2020 discovery order, ECF No. 728, is DENIED without prejudice, and further such relief as set forth in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/24/2021. (Opinion and Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 932 Supplemental Response re #931 Response, In Opposition to Defendant Cantwell's Objection to Deposition . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Deposition of Christopher Cantwell)(Bloch, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 931 Response re #930 Objections to Deposition . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Tyler Magill, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Bloch, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 930 Pro Se Objections to Notice of Deposition by Defendant Christopher Cantwell (hnw)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 929 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Chelsea Alvarado, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Hannah Pearce, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support - Jessica Phillips, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Phillips, Jessica) Modified on 3/8/2021 To correct Errata C to read "EXHIBIT C" (hnw).
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER denying #926 Motion to Stay Case or to appoint a GAL Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/2/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw) (Main Document 928 replaced on 3/2/2021 to correct header in order ) (hnw).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 927 RESPONSE in Opposition re #926 MOTION to Stay Deposition and Appoint a Guardian Ad Litem. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Mills, David)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 926 MOTION to Stay Deposition by James Alex Fields, Jr. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Campbell, David)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 925 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) previously set for April 26-May 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville Jury Trial reset for October 25-November 19, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (Notice mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER; The trial in this matter shall be continued until October 25 to November 19, 2021, the dates previously set aside on the Courts calendar and by the parties for this trial. Signed by Senior Judge (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)Norman K. Moon on 2/3/2021. (hnw)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 923 Letter re Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. v. Hassan - Kohlmann Report, #2 Exhibit Far-Right Symbols Seen at the U.S. Capitol Riot - Washington Post)(Bloch, Michael)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #918 Consent MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Doe, Marcus Martin, Seth Wispelwey, April Muniz, Marissa Blair, Chelsea Alvarado, Elizabeth Sines, Natalie Romero, Thomas Baker Motions referred to Joel C. Hoppe. for a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Sealed Document-Pursuant to Order #92 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default (hnw)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER granting #919 Motion to Seal Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/15/2021. (Order mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties)(hnw)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 919 MOTION to Seal Document 918-4 by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Jessica)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 918 Consent MOTION for Entry of Default by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Corrected First Set of Document Requests, #2 Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Nationalist Front's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production and Interrogatories, #4 Under Seal, #5 Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Entity Defendants, #6 Nationalist Front's Response to Second Set of Interrogatories, #7 Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition to Nationalist Front, #8 Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition to Jeff Schoep, #9 Jeff Schoep Deposition Transcript, #10 Edward ReBrook Email, #11 Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition to Nationalist Front, #12 Edward ReBrook Email, #13 Statement re Nonappearance of Nationalist Front)(Phillips, Jessica)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 917 Transcript Copy Delivered re #913 Transcript Request, (mb)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 916 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary J. Butenschoen, Telephone number 540-857-5100 Ext 5312. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 1/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2021. (mb)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Financial arrangements made (Copy) (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #913 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 12/28/2020. (mb)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #912 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 12/28/2020. (mb)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 913 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by Nathan Damigo, Identity Evropa, Jason Kessler, Matthew Parrott, Traditionalist Worker Party for Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 reported by Court Reporter Mary Butenschoen before Judge Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Kolenich, James)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 912 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Motion Hearing held on December 17, 2020 reported by Court Reporter Butenschoen before Judge Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 911 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 re #826 MOTION to Exclude certain Expert Witnesses filed by Jason Kessler, Matthew Parrott, Identity Evropa, Traditionalist Worker Party, Nathan Damigo. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (hnw)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 910 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part #601 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 11/30/2020. (Opinion and Order mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(jv)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Supplemental Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #801 Response, in Further Opposition to Third Parties Hill and Lunsford Request for Cost-Shifting. filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mills, David)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 908 Reply re #906 Response in Opposition to Motion . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bloch, Michael)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 907 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #826 MOTION to Exclude certain Expert Witnesses : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via ZoomVIDEO Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw) Modified on 11/13/2020 to Correct TIME of hearing to 10:00 AM(hnw).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 906 RESPONSE in Opposition re #896 MOTION to Strike #895 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Richard Spencer. (hnw)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 905 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions held on 10/30/2020 before Judge Moon. Court Reporter/Transcriber JoRita Meyer, Telephone number 540.857.5100, ext. 5311, JoRitaM@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 11/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2021. (jm)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 904 Reply re #899 Response in Opposition to Motion, #894 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant National Socialist Movement . filed by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. (Phillips, Jessica)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 903 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Jury Trial RESET for Four Weeks; April 26-30, May 3-7, May 10-14, and May 17-21, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (Notice mailed and emailed to Pro Se Parties via US Mail)(hnw) Modified on 11/5/2020 to correct Month to "May" (hnw).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Financial arrangements made (Original) (3 Days Service) re #901 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 11/5/2020. (jm)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 901 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3 Day Service) by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey for Summary Judgment Hearing held on October 30, 2020 reported by Court Reporter JoRita Meyer before Judge Norman Moon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Cahill, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2020 re #823 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Exhibits attached filed by Michael Tubbs, Michael Hill, League of the South. (Court Reporter: JoRita Meyer) (hnw)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 899 First RESPONSE in Opposition re #894 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant National Socialist Movement . filed by Jeff Schoep. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(ReBrook, William)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 898 MOTION for Sanctions Against Robert "Azzmador" Ray by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Phillips, Jessica)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Sealed Document-Plaintiffs' Unredacted Response in Opposition to Defendants Michaal Hill, Michael Tubbs and League of the South's Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting Exhibits Filed under seal pursuant to Order #879 (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 24, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit 30, #27 Exhibit 31, #28 Exhibit 32, #29 Exhibit 33, #30 Exhibit 34, #31 Exhibit 35, #32 Exhibit 36, #33 Exhibit 37, #34 Exhibit 38, #35 Exhibit 39, #36 Exhibit 40, #37 Exhibit 41, #38 Exhibit 42, #39 Exhibit 43, #40 Exhibit 44, #41 Exhibit 46, #42 Exhibit 47, #43 Exhibit 48, #44 Exhibit 49, #45 Exhibit 50, #46 Exhibit 51, #47 Exhibit 52, #48 Exhibit 53, #49 Exhibit 54, #50 Exhibit 55, #51 Exhibit 56, #52 Exhibit 57, #53 Exhibit 58, #54 Exhibit 59, #55 Exhibit 60, #56 Exhibit 61, #57 Exhibit 65, #58 Exhibit 68, #59 Exhibit 72, #60 Exhibit 73, #61 Exhibit 74, #62 Exhibit 75, #63 Exhibit 76, #64 Exhibit 77, #65 Exhibit 78, #66 Exhibit 79, #67 Exhibit 80, #68 Exhibit 81, #69 Exhibit 105, #70 Exhibit 106, #71 Exhibit 107, #72 Exhibit 108, #73 Exhibit 110, #74 Exhibit 112, #75 Exhibit 113, #76 Exhibit 114, #77 Exhibit 115, #78 Exhibit 116, #79 Exhibit 118, #80 Exhibit 119, #81 Exhibit 120, #82 Exhibit 121, #83 Exhibit 122, #84 Exhibit 123, #85 Exhibit 125, #86 Exhibit 126, #87 Exhibit 127, #88 Exhibit 128, #89 Exhibit 129, #90 Exhibit 131, #91 Exhibit 132, #92 Exhibit 133, #93 Exhibit 134, #94 Exhibit 135, #95 Exhibit 136, #96 Exhibit 137, #97 Exhibit 140, #98 Exhibit 117, #99 Exhibit 124) All Video Exhibits lodged in the clerks office on thumb drive. (hnw)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 896 MOTION to Strike #895 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chelsea Alvarado, Thomas Baker, Marissa Blair, John Doe, Marcus Martin, April Muniz, Natalie Romero, Elizabeth Sines, Seth Wispelwey. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bloch, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 895 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits)(hnw)Motion Stricken from docket pursuant to ORDER #952 . Modified on 5/20/2021 (dg).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 894 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant National Socialist Movement by Chelsea Alvarado,