Rothy's Inc. v. JKM Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rothy's Inc.
Defendant: Dr. Casey Kerrigan and JKM Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00067
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by JKM Technologies, LLC, Casey Kerrigan. (Evans, Nathan)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Case transferred to Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad no longer assigned to case. Telephone Conference 11/6/2018 and Jury Trial taken off Judge Conrad's docket. Scheduling Clerk for Judge Urbanski will be in touch to advise parties as to whether the dates/times scheduled for those hearings work with Judge Urbanski's schedule. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/11/2018. (ssm)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rothy's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finberg, Dana)
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Telephonic Motions Hearing set for 11/6/2018 02:00 PM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. (2-3 hours) Dial in Instructions to follow.(ssm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 10/7-10/18/2019/2019 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 8/28/2019 Jury Trial set for 10/7-10/18/2019/2019 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 09/20/2018. (ssm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 21 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by JKM Technologies, LLC. and Casey Kerrigan, M.D. (Evans, Nathan) Modified on 9/17/2018 to reflect both defendants and regenerated to all (ssm).
September 14, 2018 Filing 19 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JKM Technologies, LLC. and Casey Kerrigan, MD. (Evans, Nathan) Modified on 9/17/2018 to reflect both defts and regenerated to all (ssm).
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Arthur Evans on behalf of All Defendants (Evans, Nathan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis H. Casola on behalf of All Defendants (Casola, Francis)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Jesse Dickenson on behalf of All Defendants (Dickenson, Charles)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; AO 120 Report; Motions for Pro Hac Vice; served on Dr. Casey Kerrigan on 8/24/2018, filed by Rothy's Inc..(Finberg, Dana)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; AO 120 Report; Motions for Pro Hac Vice; served on JKM Technologies, LLC on 8/24/2018, filed by Rothy's Inc..(Finberg, Dana)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Paul C. Maier, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/20/2018. (ssm)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Brian Stevens, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian J. Stevens for Rothy's Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/17/2018. (ssm)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Michelle Mancino Marsh, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michelle Mancino Marsh for Rothy's Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/17/2018. (ssm)
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Casey Kerrigan NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to JKM Technologies, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk (hnw)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Brian J. Stevens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Rothy's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finberg, Dana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Paul C. Maier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Rothy's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finberg, Dana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Michelle Mancino Marsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Rothy's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finberg, Dana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rothy's Inc. Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Finberg, Dana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Rothy's Inc. as to Casey Kerrigan.(Finberg, Dana)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Rothy's Inc. as to JKM Technologies, LLC.(Finberg, Dana)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JKM Technologies, LLC, Casey Kerrigan (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00 paid by e-receipt 0423-2958864.), filed by Rothy's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent 768,366, #2 Exhibit Patent 804,156, #3 Exhibit Patent 805,276, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothy's Inc. v. JKM Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Casey Kerrigan
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Represented By: Nathan Arthur Evans
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKM Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Represented By: Nathan Arthur Evans
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothy's Inc.
Represented By: Dana Johannes Finberg
Represented By: Brian J. Stevens
Represented By: Michelle Mancino Marsh
Represented By: Paul C Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?