Southern Environmental Law Center v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: Southern Environmental Law Center
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Office of the General Counsel and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 3:2018cv00106
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of United States Government Cessation by Office of the General Counsel, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winn, Sara)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 7/20/2017, #2 Exhibit 2, 6/22/2018, #3 Exhibit 3, 1/3/2018, #4 Exhibit 4, 7/5/2018, #5 Exhibit 5, 10/26/18)(Hunter, Kimberley)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberley Claire Hunter for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/1/18. (hnw)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Sam Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel Edward Evans for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/2/2018. (hnw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3009803. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(Butler, Morgan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Sam Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3009669. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(Butler, Morgan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of the General Counsel NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (hnw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Office of the General Counsel, United States Department of Agriculture (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3008890.), filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Environmental Law Center v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Environmental Law Center
Represented By: Kimberley Claire Hunter
Represented By: Samuel Edward Evans
Represented By: Morgan Wyatt Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?